GERMINARIO v. RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: JUNE GERMINARIO
Defendant: RAM Payment LLC f/k/a or d/b/a Reliant Account Management, LLC f/k/a Reliant Account Management Systems, LLC a/k/a Account Management Systems, LLC, GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (ARIZONA), ACTIVE DEBT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C., PARALEGAL SUPPORT GROUP, L.L.C., GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA), STEPHEN CHAYA, RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA), GREGORY WINTERS, WST MANAGEMENT, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (TENNESSEE), STEPHEN CHAYA TRUST AGREEMENT, GS Holdings, L.L.C., RELIANT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.L.C., ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C., Guardian Legal Center, Active Debt Solutions, Inc., JOHN DOE(S) 1-100, Paralegal Staff Support, L.L.C., SCOTT AUSTIN and AUSTIN CO. L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv12130
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Conference by phone held on 10/26/2020. (se, )
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim, in lieu of answer . (PINTO, JOSEPH)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C., SCOTT AUSTIN, AUSTIN CO. L.L.C., STEPHEN CHAYA, GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (ARIZONA), GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA), RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA), RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (TENNESSEE), RELIANT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.L.C., STEPHEN CHAYA TRUST AGREEMENT, GREGORY WINTERS, WST MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. re #19 First MOTION to Certify Class classification (EAPEN, SHAJI)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: The Court having held an initial conference by phone on October 26, 2020; and the Court having heard the arguments of counsel, it is hereby ORDERED the following schedule shall apply: Service of Rule 26 Disclosures by November 30, 2020; Service of written discovery by December 7, 2020; Service of Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order by December 31, 2021; the deadline to file motions to amend pleadings is December 31, 2020; Fact discovery deadline is March 31, 2021; Motion for class certification to be filed no later than April 20, 2021; A telephone status conference call is scheduled for March 22, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The call-in number for the call is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. Discovery dispute letters are due to the Court three (3) days prior to the scheduled conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/26/20. (Shaw, A).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #19 First MOTION to Certify Class classification, #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim, in lieu of answer. Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 First MOTION to Certify Class classification by JUNE GERMINARIO. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief, #2 Exhibit Brief Exhibits, #3 Declaration Plaintiff Declaration, #4 Declaration JMP Declaration, #5 Exhibit JMP Declaration Exhibits)(PINTO, JOSEPH)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #19 First MOTION to Certify Class classification. Motion set for 11/16/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim, in lieu of answer by ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C., SCOTT AUSTIN, AUSTIN CO. L.L.C., STEPHEN CHAYA, GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (ARIZONA), GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA), RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA), RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (TENNESSEE), RELIANT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.L.C., STEPHEN CHAYA TRUST AGREEMENT, GREGORY WINTERS, WST MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.. Responses due by 11/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief to motion dismiss failure state claim, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order, #3 Affidavit of Shaji Eapen w-exhibits, #4 Declaration Steve Chaya w-exhibits, #5 Certificate of Service of mailing)(EAPEN, SHAJI)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint for failure to state a claim, in lieu of answer. Motion set for 11/16/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Certification on behalf of JUNE GERMINARIO. (PINTO, JOSEPH)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to counsels request, the initial conference originally scheduled for October 6, 2020 is hereby moved to October 26, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The dial-in and access codes are unchanged. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/1/20. (Shaw, A).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter from RAM Payment, L.L.C. t/a Reliant Account Management; Reliant Account Management, L.L.C. (California); Reliant Account Management, L.L.C. (Tennessee); Account Management Systems, L.L.C.; Reliant Account Management Systems, L.L.C.; GS Associated Holdings, L.L.C. (California) a/k/a GS Holdings, L.L.C.; GS Associated Holdings L.L.C. (Arizona) a/k/a GS Holdings, L.L.C.; WST Management, L.L.C.; Austin Co. L.L.C.; Reliant Management Services, L.L.C.; Stephen Chaya; Gregory Winters, Scott Austin, and Stephen Chaya Trust Agreement. (EAPEN, SHAJI)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting letter request for an extension of time for Defendants to answer the Amended Complaint by 10/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/21/2020. (rss, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter from defendants, RAM Payment, L.L.C. t/a Reliant Account Management; Reliant Account Management, L.L.C. (California); Reliant Account Management, L.L.C. (Tennessee); Account Management Systems, L.L.C.; Reliant Account Management Systems, L.L.C.; GS Associated Holdings, L.L.C. (California) a/k/a GS Holdings, L.L.C.; GS Associated Holdings L.L.C. (Arizona) a/k/a GS Holdings, L.L.C.; WST Management, L.L.C.; Austin Co. L.L.C.; Reliant Management Services, L.L.C.; Stephen Chaya; Gregory Winters, Scott Austin, and Stephen Chaya Trust Agreement. (EAPEN, SHAJI)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to RAM Payment, L.L.C. t/a Reliant Account Management; Reliant Account Management, L.L.C. (California); Reliant Account Management, L.L.C. (Tennessee); Account Management Systems, L.L.C.; Reliant Account Management Systems, L.L.C.; GS Associated Holdings, L.L.C. (California) a/k/a GS Holdings, L.L.C.; GS Associated Holdings L.L.C. (Arizona) a/k/a GS Holdings, L.L.C.; WST Management, L.L.C.; Austin Co. L.L.C.; Reliant Management Services, L.L.C.; Stephen Chaya; Gregory Winters, Scott Austin, and Stephen Chaya Trust Agreement. Attorney SHAJI M. EAPEN for ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C.,SHAJI M. EAPEN for SCOTT AUSTIN,SHAJI M. EAPEN for AUSTIN CO. L.L.C.,SHAJI M. EAPEN for STEPHEN CHAYA,SHAJI M. EAPEN for GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (ARIZONA),SHAJI M. EAPEN for GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA),SHAJI M. EAPEN for RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C.,SHAJI M. EAPEN for RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C.,SHAJI M. EAPEN for RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA),SHAJI M. EAPEN for RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (TENNESSEE),SHAJI M. EAPEN for RELIANT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.L.C.,SHAJI M. EAPEN for STEPHEN CHAYA TRUST AGREEMENT,SHAJI M. EAPEN for GREGORY WINTERS,SHAJI M. EAPEN for WST MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. added. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to extend time to answer or otherwise respond)(EAPEN, SHAJI)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by SHAJI M. EAPEN on behalf of ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C., SCOTT AUSTIN, AUSTIN CO. L.L.C., STEPHEN CHAYA, GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (ARIZONA), GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA), RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA), RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (TENNESSEE), RELIANT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.L.C., STEPHEN CHAYA TRUST AGREEMENT, GREGORY WINTERS, WST MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (EAPEN, SHAJI)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The letter #12 filed by SHAJI M. EAPEN on 9/21/2020 was submitted incorrectly as an Application for Clerk's Extension. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE document USING event LETTER found under OTHER DOCUMENTS. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, )
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH MICHAEL PINTO on behalf of JUNE GERMINARIO (PINTO, JOSEPH)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED the initial conference currently scheduled for September 30, 2020 is hereby moved to October 6, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The call-in number is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/10/20.
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C., ACTIVE DEBT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C., SCOTT AUSTIN, AUSTIN CO. L.L.C., STEPHEN CHAYA, GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (ARIZONA), GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA), PARALEGAL SUPPORT GROUP, L.L.C., RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA), RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (TENNESSEE), RELIANT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.L.C., STEPHEN CHAYA TRUST AGREEMENT, GREGORY WINTERS, WST MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (rss, )
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Request for Summons to be Issued by JUNE GERMINARIO as to ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C., ACTIVE DEBT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C., SCOTT AUSTIN, AUSTIN CO. L.L.C., STEPHEN CHAYA, GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (ARIZONA), GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA), JOHN DOE(S) 1-100, PARALEGAL SUPPORT GROUP, L.L.C., RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C., RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA), RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (TENNESSEE), RELIANT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.L.C., STEPHEN CHAYA TRUST AGREEMENT, GREGORY WINTERS, WST MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.. (PINTO, JOSEPH)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Request for Summons to be Issued by JUNE GERMINARIO as to ACTIVE DEBT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C., JOHN DOE(S) 1-100, PARALEGAL SUPPORT GROUP, L.L.C., RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C.. (PINTO, JOSEPH)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please review the document attached to docket entry #6 submitted by JOSEPH MICHAEL PINTO on 9/4/2020. The document attached does not include a request for summons issue, PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CORRECT DOCUMENT. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Initial Conference set for 9/30/2020 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/3/2020. (cry, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against RAM Payment LLC f/k/a or d/b/a Reliant Account Management, LLC f/k/a Reliant Account Management Systems, LLC a/k/a Account Management Systems, LLC, filed by JUNE GERMINARIO.(PINTO, JOSEPH)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to RAM Payment, LLC, Reliant Account Management, LLC, Reliant Account Management Systems, LLC and Account Management Systems, LLC.. (EAPEN, SHAJI)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Nature of Suit,Party Information,Removal-State Court Information not added to docket, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/3/2020. (cry, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time toAnswer - Document #3 submitted by RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C. on 9/3/2020 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/22/2020. (cry, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RAM Payment LLC f/k/a or d/b/a Reliant Account Management, LLC f/k/a Reliant Account Management Systems, LLC a/k/a Account Management Systems, LLC. (EAPEN, SHAJI)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RAM Payment LLC f/k/a or d/b/a Reliant Account Management, LLC f/k/a Reliant Account Management Systems, LLC a/k/a Account Management Systems, LLC from Superior Court of Burlington County, NJ, case number BUR L 628 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11290237), filed by RAM Payment LLC f/k/a or d/b/a Reliant Account Management, LLC f/k/a Reliant Account Management Systems, LLC a/k/a Account Management Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to notice removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to notice removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to notice removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to notice removal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to notice removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet CIS, #7 Declaration Declaration S Chaya)(EAPEN, SHAJI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GERMINARIO v. RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAM Payment LLC f/k/a or d/b/a Reliant Account Management, LLC f/k/a Reliant Account Management Systems, LLC a/k/a Account Management Systems, LLC
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (ARIZONA)
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTIVE DEBT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARALEGAL SUPPORT GROUP, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS ASSOCIATED HOLDINGS, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA)
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN CHAYA
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAM PAYMENT, L.L.C.
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C.
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (CALIFORNIA)
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY WINTERS
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WST MANAGEMENT, L.L.C.
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RELIANT ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT, L.L.C. (TENNESSEE)
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN CHAYA TRUST AGREEMENT
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Holdings, L.L.C.
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RELIANT MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.L.C.
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCOUNT MANAGEMENT SYSTEMS, L.L.C.
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Legal Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Active Debt Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE(S) 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paralegal Staff Support, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT AUSTIN
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUSTIN CO. L.L.C.
Represented By: SHAJI M. EAPEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUNE GERMINARIO
Represented By: JOSEPH MICHAEL PINTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?