MORRISON v. COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SHANNA MORRISON
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5 (fictitious names describing presently unidentified individuals), DEBBIE SOVINE, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5 (fictitious names describing presently unidentified business entities), SUSAN HORVATH, COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC., JOHN DOES 1-5 and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
Case Number: 1:2020cv12716
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Settlement Conference held on 11/9/2020. (se, )
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED defendant shall file its Motion to Compel Arbitration by December 15, 2020. All discovery in the case is stayed until the motion is decided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/9/20. (Shaw, A).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER. The Court having received counsel`s recent letter, it is hereby ORDERED the November 9, 2020 initial conference is converted to a settlement conference to be held via phone. Clients with final settlement authority shall be available by phone. Prior to the conference the parties shall meet and confer and agree to exchange the core information they need to meaningfully evaluate settlement. It is further ORDERED the parties shall serve confidential settlement memos via fax or email by November 6, 2020. The call in and access numbers for the conference call have already been provided. It is further ORDERED all deadlines in the case, including the deadline to serve a responsive pleading or motion, are STAYED pending further Order of the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/2/20. (Schneider, Joel)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to counsels request, the initial conference is hereby moved from October 14, 2020 to November 9, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. The conference will take place via telephone. The call in and access numbers are 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/5/20. (Shaw, A).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; the time for Defendants Communications Test Design, Inc., Susan Horvath, and Debbie Sovine to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended for thirty (30) days, from October 6, 2020, until November 5, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/2/2020. (tf, )
October 5, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to reschedule Rule 16 Conference and attendant deadlines accordingly. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to reschedule Rule 16 Conference and attendant deadlines accordingly by COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC., SUSAN HORVATH, DEBBIE SOVINE. (SIMMONS, WILLIAM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC.. (SIMMONS, WILLIAM)
September 16, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (cry, )
September 16, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Party Information. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 10/14/2020 09:30 AM Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/16/2020. (cry, )
September 16, 2020 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time toAnswer - Document #2 submitted by DEBBIE SOVINE, SUSAN HORVATH, COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC. on 9/15/2020 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/6/2020(cry, )
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/16/2020. (cry, )
September 15, 2020 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (mmb, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint. Attorney WILLIAM JAMES SIMMONS for COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC.,WILLIAM JAMES SIMMONS for SUSAN HORVATH,WILLIAM JAMES SIMMONS for DEBBIE SOVINE added. (SIMMONS, WILLIAM)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DEBBIE SOVINE, SUSAN HORVATH, COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC. from Gloucester County, case number GLO-L-000842-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11357063), filed by DEBBIE SOVINE, SUSAN HORVATH, COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(SIMMONS, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORRISON v. COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5 (fictitious names describing presently unidentified individuals)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBBIE SOVINE
Represented By: WILLIAM JAMES SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5 (fictitious names describing presently unidentified business entities)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN HORVATH
Represented By: WILLIAM JAMES SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNICATIONS TEST DESIGN, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM JAMES SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNA MORRISON
Represented By: MATTHEW A. LUBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?