GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. EASTERN NEURODIAGNOSTIC ASSOCIATES, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO., GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO. and GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: EASTERN NEURODIAGNOSTIC ASSOCIATES, P.C., ALAN F. KWON, M.D., MARISSA L. SMARGIASSI, P.A., ALAN D. CARR, D.O., BRETT M. PICCIOTTI, D.O., SHIVA GOPAL VASISHTA, M.D., KISHOR K. PATIL, M.D. and MATTHEW G. MCCLURE, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2020cv13978
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JANIE BYALIK on behalf of ALAN D. CARR, DO, EASTERN NEURODIAGNOSTIC ASSOCIATES, P.C., MATTHEW G. MCCLURE, MD, KISHOR K. PATIL, MD, BRETT M. PICCIOTTI, DO, MARISSA L. SMARGIASSI, PA, SHIVA GOPAL VASISHTA, MD (BYALIK, JANIE)
November 30, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 1/18/2021 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EASTERN NEURODIAGNOSTIC ASSOCIATES, P.C.. (ROS, SVETLANA)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss . (ROS, SVETLANA)
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by ALAN D. CARR, DO, EASTERN NEURODIAGNOSTIC ASSOCIATES, P.C., MATTHEW G. MCCLURE, MD, KISHOR K. PATIL, MD, BRETT M. PICCIOTTI, DO, MARISSA L. SMARGIASSI, PA, SHIVA GOPAL VASISHTA, MD. Responses due by 12/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Svetlana Ros, Esq., #3 Exhibit A to Ros Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Ros Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Ros Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Ros Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Ros Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Ros Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Ros Declaration, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(ROS, SVETLANA)
November 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID N. CINOTTI on behalf of ALAN D. CARR, DO, EASTERN NEURODIAGNOSTIC ASSOCIATES, P.C., MATTHEW G. MCCLURE, MD, KISHOR K. PATIL, MD, BRETT M. PICCIOTTI, DO, MARISSA L. SMARGIASSI, PA, SHIVA GOPAL VASISHTA, MD (CINOTTI, DAVID)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney SVETLANA ROS terminated. Attorney GUILLERMO JAVIER BEADES for ALAN F. KWON, MD added.. (BEADES, GUILLERMO)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by 11/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/29/2020. (dmr)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION extending time to answer or otherwise plead by All Defendants. (ROS, SVETLANA)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by SVETLANA ROS on behalf of All Defendants (ROS, SVETLANA)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. ALAN F. KWON, MD served on 10/10/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. KISHOR K. PATIL, MD served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020; MARISSA L. SMARGIASSI, PA served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed on Marissa L. Smargiassi, P.A., #2 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. EASTERN NEURODIAGNOSTIC ASSOCIATES, P.C. served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020; MATTHEW G. MCCLURE, MD served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020; BRETT M. PICCIOTTI, DO served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020; SHIVA GOPAL VASISHTA, MD served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed on Matthew G. McClure, M.D., #2 Summons Returned Executed on Brett M. Picciotti D.O., #3 Summons Returned Executed on Shiva Gopal Vasishta, M.D., #4 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALAN D. CARR, DO, EASTERN NEURODIAGNOSTIC ASSOCIATES, P.C., ALAN F. KWON, MD, MATTHEW G. MCCLURE, MD, KISHOR K. PATIL, MD, BRETT M. PICCIOTTI, DO, MARISSA L. SMARGIASSI, PA, SHIVA GOPAL VASISHTA, MD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY CO., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KANG, GENE)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALAN D. CARR, D.O., EASTERN NEURODIAGNOSTIC ASSOCIATES, P.C., ALAN F. KWON, M.D., MATTHEW G. MCCLURE, M.D., KISHOR K. PATIL, M.D., BRETT M. PICCIOTTI, D.O., MARISSA L. SMARGIASSI, P.A., SHIVA GOPAL VASISHTA, M.D. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11459139) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY CO., GEICO CASUALTY CO., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KANG, GENE)
October 6, 2020 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO. et al v. EASTERN NEURODIAGNOSTIC ASSOCIATES, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTERN NEURODIAGNOSTIC ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Represented By: DAVID N. CINOTTI
Represented By: SVETLANA ROS
Represented By: JANIE BYALIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN F. KWON, M.D.
Represented By: SVETLANA ROS
Represented By: GUILLERMO JAVIER BEADES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARISSA L. SMARGIASSI, P.A.
Represented By: DAVID N. CINOTTI
Represented By: SVETLANA ROS
Represented By: JANIE BYALIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN D. CARR, D.O.
Represented By: DAVID N. CINOTTI
Represented By: SVETLANA ROS
Represented By: JANIE BYALIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRETT M. PICCIOTTI, D.O.
Represented By: DAVID N. CINOTTI
Represented By: SVETLANA ROS
Represented By: JANIE BYALIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIVA GOPAL VASISHTA, M.D.
Represented By: DAVID N. CINOTTI
Represented By: SVETLANA ROS
Represented By: JANIE BYALIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KISHOR K. PATIL, M.D.
Represented By: DAVID N. CINOTTI
Represented By: SVETLANA ROS
Represented By: JANIE BYALIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW G. MCCLURE, M.D.
Represented By: DAVID N. CINOTTI
Represented By: SVETLANA ROS
Represented By: JANIE BYALIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?