MEDLEY et al v. ATLANTIC EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DAVID ROLLS, MARLON GIBBS, LAMAR MEDLEY, LUIS ESTRADA, CHARLES GREENIDGE, RAFAEL FLORES, MATTHEW CHALAKEE and JOSE LUIS CARREON
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES, INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, ATLANTIC EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC. and INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS, AND ALLIED TRADES AFL-CIO CLC DISTRICT COUNCIL 711
Case Number: 1:2020cv15847
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' request for an extension [ECF 15] is granted. Plaintiffs shall file their brief opposing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by February 2, 2021, and Defendants shall file their reply brief by February 9, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Noel L. Hillman on January 7, 2021.(gn)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter from Timothy Alexander, Esq. re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. (ALEXANDER, TIMOTHY)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The letter #14 filed by TIMOTHY ALEXANDER on 12/30/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a letter rule 7.1. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE document using event LETTER found under OTHER DOCUMENTS. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rtm, )
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (ALEXANDER, TIMOTHY)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (ALEXANDER, TIMOTHY)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The letter #13 filed by on TIMOTHY ALEXANDER on 12/29/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a letter rule 7.1. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE document using event LETTER found under OTHER DOCUMENTS. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, )
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by ATLANTIC EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC.. Responses due by 1/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Emily Daher and Exhs A-E, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DAHER, EMILY)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 1/19/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RAFAEL FLORES, DAVID ROLLS, CHARLES GREENIDGE, LUIS ESTRADA, MARLON GIBBS, JOSE LUIS CARREON, LAMAR MEDLEY, MATTHEW CHALAKEE. INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES, INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN waiver sent on 11/24/2020. (ALEXANDER, TIMOTHY)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Defendant Atlantic Exposition Services, Inc.'s letter request for a 14 day extension until 12/23/2020 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/3/2020. (rss, )
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS, AND ALLIED TRADES AFL-CIO CLC DISTRICT COUNCIL 711. Responses due by 1/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification of David F. Watkins Jr., Esq., #4 Exhibit A thru Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E thru Exhibit I)(WATKINS, DAVID)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Letter from counsel for Atlantic Exposition Services, Inc. re Update Answer Due Deadline. (DAHER, EMILY)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion set for 1/4/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(DAHER, EMILY)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ATLANTIC EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC. has been DENIED due to the #5 clerk's extension being granted on 11/13/2020. Please re-file document as a plain letter. (rss, )
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID F. WATKINS, JR on behalf of INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS, AND ALLIED TRADES AFL-CIO CLC DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 (WATKINS, DAVID) Modified on 11/24/2020 (dd).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk's Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS, AND ALLIED TRADES AFL-CIO CLC DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/2/2020. (dmr)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk's Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by ATLANTIC EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/2/2020. (dmr)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint. Attorney EMILY J. DAHER for ATLANTIC EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC. added. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(DAHER, EMILY)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(JARVIS, KEVIN)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 2/11/2021 03:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/12/2020. (pr, )
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Judicial Preferences. KMW #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (pr, )
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The APPLICATION/PETITION for for Extension of Time Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1 filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS, AND ALLIED TRADES AFL-CIO CLC DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 on 11/12/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a APPLICATION/PETITION for for Extension of Time Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1. PLEASE RESUBMIT USING Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (pr, )
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION/PETITION for for Extension of Time Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1 for by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS, AND ALLIED TRADES AFL-CIO CLC DISTRICT COUNCIL 711. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(JARVIS, KEVIN)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS, AND ALLIED TRADES AFL-CIO CLC DISTRICT COUNCIL 711 from SUPERIOR COURT OF ATLANTIC COUNTY, NJ, case number ATL-L-003065-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11638059), filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS, AND ALLIED TRADES AFL-CIO CLC DISTRICT COUNCIL 711. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(JARVIS, KEVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEDLEY et al v. ATLANTIC EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID ROLLS
Represented By: TIMOTHY CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLON GIBBS
Represented By: TIMOTHY CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAMAR MEDLEY
Represented By: TIMOTHY CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUIS ESTRADA
Represented By: TIMOTHY CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES GREENIDGE
Represented By: TIMOTHY CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFAEL FLORES
Represented By: TIMOTHY CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW CHALAKEE
Represented By: TIMOTHY CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE LUIS CARREON
Represented By: TIMOTHY CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES, INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC EXPOSITION SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: EMILY J. DAHER
Represented By: STEVEN W. SUFLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS, AND ALLIED TRADES AFL-CIO CLC DISTRICT COUNCIL 711
Represented By: KEVIN DOUGLAS JARVIS
Represented By: DAVID F. WATKINS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?