COVINGTON v. DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DUANE COVINGTON
Defendant: SPELL CAPITAL PARTNERS, DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC, DEACRO INDUSTRIES, XYZ ENTITIES 1-10 and ABC ENTITIES 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv20343
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/4/2021 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend the pleadings or a motion to join new parties will expire on 7/30/2021. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 9/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/25/2021. (tf, )
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO REMOVE CASE FROM THE ARBITRATION PROGRAM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/25/2021. (tf, )
February 25, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held via telephone on 2/25/2021. (sb, )
February 23, 2021 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stephen Rachlis to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LUSSKIN, ANDREW)
February 23, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by Andrew Lusskin on 2/23/2021 cannot be processed until the application fee has been paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. This message is for informational purposes only. (tf, )
February 19, 2021 NOTICE: Joint Discovery Plan due to Judge Donio's Chambers for 2/25/2021 Scheduling Conference. See Order dated 12/28/2020 and Text Order dated 1/7/2021. (sb, )
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Rachlis, Esquire; shall make a payment of $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/17/2021. (tf, )
February 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DEACRO INDUSTRIES. (Attachments: #1 Statement Statement in lieu of Brief, #2 Declaration Declaration of Andrew M. Lusskin, #3 Certification Certification of Stephen Rachlis, #4 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(LUSSKIN, ANDREW)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference shall be, and is hereby, RESET to 2/25/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket, or alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/8/2021. (slc)
February 5, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC, SPELL CAPITAL PARTNERS. (COOK, ROBERT)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: By consent of the parties, the initial scheduling conference on 2/2/2021 shall be, and is hereby, ADJOURNED until a decision has been rendered on the pending dispositive motions. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/25/2021. (slc)
January 25, 2021 Filing 20 Letter from Robert M. Cook, Esq.. (COOK, ROBERT)
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certification of Exhibits (Exhibits A & B), #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(COOK, ROBERT)
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by SPELL CAPITAL PARTNERS. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration William Spell, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MANNING, FRANCIS)
January 19, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss , #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 2/16/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
January 18, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEACRO INDUSTRIES. (LUSSKIN, ANDREW)
January 13, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPELL CAPITAL PARTNERS. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
January 12, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jason R. Asmus to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
January 12, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JASON R. ASMUS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (tf, )
January 12, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Jason R. Asmus: $ 150, receipt number CAM012060 (tf, )
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against DEACRO INDUSTRIES by DEACRO INDUSTRIES.(LUSSKIN, ANDREW)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason R. Asmus; shall pay the sum of $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/8/2021. (tf, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason R. Asmus by SPELL CAPITAL PARTNERS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jason R. Asmus, #2 Declaration Francis X. Manning, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #5 Certificate of Service)(MANNING, FRANCIS)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admitting Pro Hac Vice Jason R. Asmus for by SPELL CAPITAL PARTNERS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jason R. Asmus, #2 Declaration Francis X. Manning, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MANNING, FRANCIS)
January 8, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application for Admission of Pro Hac Vice filed by F. Manning on 1/8/2021 was submitted incorrectly as an Application/Peition. Please be advised the request for admission of Pro Hac Vice counsel shall be filed by formal motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE REQUEST USING *Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice*. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
January 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jason R. Asmus. Motion set for 2/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 2/2/2021 at 11:00 A.M. shall be conducted VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket or, alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/7/2021. (slc)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC. Amendment to #5 Order to Show Cause - Amended Notice of Removal. (COOK, ROBERT)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS X. MANNING on behalf of SPELL CAPITAL PARTNERS (MANNING, FRANCIS)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by EARYN JEDELE EDWARDS on behalf of DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC (EDWARDS, EARYN)
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
December 31, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SPELL CAPITAL PARTNERS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/18/2020. (rss, )
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Directing Defendant fifteen (15) days to amend its notice of removal, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/30/2020. (rss, )
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Initial Conference set for 2/2/2021 11:00 AM in Camden - Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/28/2020. (pr, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (COOK, ROBERT)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC. (COOK, ROBERT)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC from Burlington County Superior Court, case number BUR-L-2308-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11884767), filed by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(COOK, ROBERT)
December 28, 2020 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
December 28, 2020 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time toAnswer - Document #3 submitted by DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC on 12/28/2020 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/18/2021.(pr, )
December 28, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Jury Demand,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/28/2020. (pr, )
December 28, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (pr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COVINGTON v. DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPELL CAPITAL PARTNERS
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVIS-STANDARD, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT M. COOK
Represented By: EARYN JEDELE EDWARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEACRO INDUSTRIES
Represented By: ANDREW M. LUSSKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ ENTITIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC ENTITIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUANE COVINGTON
Represented By: MICHAEL G. DONAHUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?