Thorn v. Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jimmie Thorn
Defendant: PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICAL INC, SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC, AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC. and AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD.
Case Number: 1:2020cv20603
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 29 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Alabama Southern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00442. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 30, 2020 Filing 28 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from New Jersey requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District. Case Closed. (srd)
November 2, 2020 Filing 27 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Status Report, #26 filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC. As previously ordered, this action is stayed pending a decision by the JPML (doc. 26). The parties are ordered to file on or before January 6, 2021, a joint report to advise the Court as to the status of the Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action, if the action is not transferred. (khc)
October 27, 2020 REFERRAL OF #26 Status Report to Judge Cassady. (srd)
October 26, 2020 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report of Plaintiff and Defendants) by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Parker, George)
September 25, 2020 REFERRAL OF #25 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Cassady. (srd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion #4 to Remand filed by Jimmie Thorn. (Brooks, Gerald)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order GRANTING #8 MOTION to Stay Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC, and this action is STAYED as set out. Parties are ORDERED to file a joint report advising the Court as to the status of the Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action on or before 10/26/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 09/24/2020. (srd)
September 23, 2020 Filing 23 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement,, #17 filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #10 filed by Jimmie Thorn, Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. Review of the corporate disclosure statements made pursuant to S.D. Ala. Civ. L.R. 7.1 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
September 22, 2020 REFERRAL OF #20 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Judge Cassady. (srd)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Mylan's answer or other response shall be due on or before October 19, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/22/2020. (khc)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 09/22/2020. (srd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #1 Consent Form) (srd).
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Parker, George)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC. (Parker, George)
September 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (srd)
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 Case re-assigned to Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade no longer assigned to the case. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (mab)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Aurolife Pharma LLC, Aurohealth LLC, Auromedics Pharma LLC, Auro Vaccines LLC, Aurologistics LLC, AuroScience LLC, Acrotech Biopharma LLC, Natrol LLC identifying Corporate Parent Aurobindo Pharma Ltd., Other Affiliate Aurolife Pharma LLC, Other Affiliate Aurohealth LLC, Other Affiliate Auromedics Pharma LLC, Other Affiliate Auro Vaccines LLC, Other Affiliate Aurologistics LLC, Other Affiliate AuroScience LLC, Other Affiliate Acrotech Biopharma LLC, Other Affiliate Natrol LLC for Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc... (Turner, Sara)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #10 filed by Jimmie Thorn, Response in Opposition to Motion #9 filed by Jimmie Thorn (Cassady, William)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #8 Motion to Stay; taking under advisement #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Any response to these motions must be filed not later than September 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/17/20. (Cassady, William)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Amaobi Joseph Enyinnia on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enyinnia, Amaobi)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ashby Pate on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Pate, Robert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Pate, Robert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Jimmie Thorn. (Brooks, Gerald)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Jimmie Thorn. (Brooks, Gerald)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Errata E, #6 Exhibit F) (Parker, George)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Radney, William)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Solco Healthcare US, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Cassady, William)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Jimmie Thorn. (Brooks, Gerald)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Solco Healthcare US, LLC. (Parker, George)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Parker, George)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number BALSDC-2674682, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Prinston Pharmaceutical, Inc., Solco Healthcare US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Parker, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorn v. Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICAL INC.
Represented By: Fred M. Haston, III
Represented By: George Robert Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By: Amaobi Joseph Enyinnia
Represented By: Robert Ashby Pate
Represented By: William Larkin Radney, IV
Represented By: Jason M. Reefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC
Represented By: Fred M. Haston, III
Represented By: George Robert Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Thorn
Represented By: Gerald Clark Brooks, Jr.
Represented By: Tiffany Toliver
Represented By: Christopher D. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?