WELDON et al v. TYNER et al
Plaintiff: TROY SESSOMS, CARLA WELDON, D. F. J., D.F.J. and C. S.
Defendant: MICHAEL KELLY, JOHN.JANE DOE(S) LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS OF THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE 1-50, JOHN/JANE DOE(S) LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS FROM OTHER LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCIES 1-50, ABC OTHER LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCIES 1-20, DETECTIVE OLGA BRYLEVSKAYA, DAMON G. TYNER, ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2021cv04392
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that within 30 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint; if Plaintiffs do not file an amended complaint, Defendants may file their proposed Motions to Dismiss; if Plaintiffs do file an amended complaint, Defendants may file Motions to Dismiss without first filings pre-motion conference letters. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/30/2021. (tf, )
March 27, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Louis Charles Shapiro, Esquire re #9 Letter. (SHAPIRO, LOUIS)
March 27, 2021 Filing 10 Letter from Louis Charles Shapiro, Esquire re #8 Letter. (SHAPIRO, LOUIS)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from AG's Office Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. (PATEL, BARKHA)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 Letter from U.S. Attorney's Office Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. (BASIAK, JOHN)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: By consent, the initial scheduling conference on 3/30/2021 shall be, and is hereby, ADJOURNED, and will be reset at a later date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/11/2021. (slc)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from U.S. Attorney's Office Requesting Adjournment of March 30 Rule 16 Conference Until Decision on Jurisdictional Motions re #3 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden). (BASIAK, JOHN)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney BARKHA PATEL for ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE,BARKHA PATEL for OLGA BRYLEVSKAYA,BARKHA PATEL for MICHAEL KELLY,BARKHA PATEL for DAMON G. TYNER added. (PATEL, BARKHA)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BARKHA PATEL on behalf of ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, OLGA BRYLEVSKAYA, MICHAEL KELLY, DAMON G. TYNER (PATEL, BARKHA)
March 9, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by MICHAEL KELLY, DAMON G. TYNER, ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, OLGA BRYLEVSKAYA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/29/2021. (tf, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 3/30/2021 12:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/30/2021. (pr, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to United States of America.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA from Superior Court of New Jersey, Civil Part, case number ATL-L-000583-19., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN)
March 8, 2021 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
March 8, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences. RMB. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (pr, )
March 8, 2021 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time toAnswer - Document #2 submitted by DARRIN LORADY, MARK HINDLE, DANIEL GARRABRANT, SCOTT KREBS, GREGORY PENNOCK, MARCUS W. PERRY on 03/08/2021 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 03/29/2021. (pr, )
March 8, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Clerk's office entered the previous Quality Control message in error. Please disregard that message. The parties were entered correctly upon removal and the docket has been modified to reflect same. (dmw)
March 8, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information: Please match Party Information with State Court Complaint . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WELDON et al v. TYNER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY SESSOMS
Represented By: LOUIS CHARLES SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLA WELDON
Represented By: LOUIS CHARLES SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. F. J.
Represented By: LOUIS CHARLES SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.F.J.
Represented By: LOUIS CHARLES SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. S.
Represented By: LOUIS CHARLES SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL KELLY
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN.JANE DOE(S) LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS OF THE ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOE(S) LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS FROM OTHER LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCIES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC OTHER LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCIES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE OLGA BRYLEVSKAYA
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAMON G. TYNER
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOHN FRANCIS BASIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?