FLORES v. CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: CARMEN FLORES
Defendant: DIRECTOR DAVID S OWENS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, SERGEANT TIFFANY DEANGELIS, CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS LLC, LIEUTENANT JOHN JONES, CORRECTIONS OFFICERS JOHN JANE DOES 1-10, CORRECTNS OFFICER HELEN STILLMAN, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, SERGEANT JOHN KAMULDA, NURSE LISA MCCREA, CORRCTNS OFFICER DAMIEN VELEZ, DEPUTY WARDEN CHRIS FOSCHINI, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, MEDICAL PROVIDERS JOHN JANE DOES 1-10, CORRCTNS OFFICER JOSEPH CARNEY, CAPTAIN LORETTA ADAMS, ADMINISTRATOR EDWARD FANELLE, WARDEN KAREN TAYLOR, CHIEF JOHANN ARNOLD, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER, CORRECTIONSS OFFICER DAMIEN VELEZ and CORRECTIONS OFFICER JOSEPH CARNEY
Case Number: 1:2021cv09120
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. MCCLAIN on behalf of CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS LLC, LISA MCCREA (MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 6/22/2021 at 10:30 A.M. shall be conducted VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket, or alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/1/2021. (slc)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Initial Conference set for 6/22/2021 10:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/21/2021. (rss, )
May 21, 2021 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS LLC. (HOLTZMAN, STEPHEN)
May 21, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Separate Defenses, Designation of Trial Counsel, Demand for Allocation and Proof of E-Filing and Service by CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS LLC, LISA MCCREA.(HOLTZMAN, STEPHEN)
April 20, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. SERGEANT WESTCOTT waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. KAREN TAYLOR waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. DAVID S OWENS waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. JOHN KAMULDA waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. JOHN JONES waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. HELEN STILLMAN waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. CHRIS FOSCHINI waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. EDWARD FANELLE waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. TIFFANY DEANGELIS waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. DAMIEN VELEZ waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. JOSEPH CARNEY waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. JOHANN ARNOLD waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JOHN JONES, EDWARD FANELLE, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, JOHN KAMULDA, JOSEPH CARNEY, JOHANN ARNOLD, DAVID S OWENS, CHRIS FOSCHINI, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, HELEN STILLMAN, DAMIEN VELEZ, LORETTA ADAMS, KAREN TAYLOR, SERGEANT WESTCOTT, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER. LORETTA ADAMS waiver sent on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW S. BROWN on behalf of LORETTA ADAMS, JOHANN ARNOLD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER, JOSEPH CARNEY, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, EDWARD FANELLE, CHRIS FOSCHINI, JOHN JONES, JOHN KAMULDA, DAVID S OWENS, HELEN STILLMAN, KAREN TAYLOR, DAMIEN VELEZ, SERGEANT WESTCOTT (BROWN, ANDREW)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI on behalf of LORETTA ADAMS, JOHANN ARNOLD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER, JOSEPH CARNEY, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, EDWARD FANELLE, CHRIS FOSCHINI, JOHN JONES, JOHN KAMULDA, DAVID S OWENS, HELEN STILLMAN, KAREN TAYLOR, DAMIEN VELEZ, SERGEANT WESTCOTT (TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM F. COOK on behalf of LORETTA ADAMS, JOHANN ARNOLD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER, JOSEPH CARNEY, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, EDWARD FANELLE, CHRIS FOSCHINI, JOHN JONES, JOHN KAMULDA, DAVID S OWENS, HELEN STILLMAN, KAREN TAYLOR, DAMIEN VELEZ, SERGEANT WESTCOTT (COOK, WILLIAM)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LORETTA ADAMS, JOHANN ARNOLD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER, JOSEPH CARNEY, CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS LLC, TIFFANY DEANGELIS, EDWARD FANELLE, CHRIS FOSCHINI, JOHN JONES, JOHN KAMULDA, LISA MCCREA, DAVID S OWENS, HELEN STILLMAN, KAREN TAYLOR, DAMIEN VELEZ, SERGEANT WESTCOTT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, )
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12367136) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CARMEN FLORES.(HETZNECKER, DANIEL)
April 13, 2021 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
April 13, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLORES v. CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTOR DAVID S OWENS
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER BAILEY
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT TIFFANY DEANGELIS
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFG HEALTH SYSTEMS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN D. HOLTZMAN
Represented By: JEFFREY S. MCCLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT JOHN JONES
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS OFFICERS JOHN JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTNS OFFICER HELEN STILLMAN
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT WESTCOTT
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERGEANT JOHN KAMULDA
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE LISA MCCREA
Represented By: STEPHEN D. HOLTZMAN
Represented By: JEFFREY S. MCCLAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRCTNS OFFICER DAMIEN VELEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPUTY WARDEN CHRIS FOSCHINI
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL PROVIDERS JOHN JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRCTNS OFFICER JOSEPH CARNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN LORETTA ADAMS
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADMINISTRATOR EDWARD FANELLE
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN KAREN TAYLOR
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF JOHANN ARNOLD
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMDEN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS JUVENILE DETENTION CENTER
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONSS OFFICER DAMIEN VELEZ
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER JOSEPH CARNEY
Represented By: ANDREW S. BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM F. COOK
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARMEN FLORES
Represented By: DANIEL J. HETZNECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?