D'ANDREA et al v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Plaintiff: ROCCO J. D'ANDREA, MS. HANNELORE D'ANDREA and HANNELORE D'ANDREA
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Case Number: 1:2021cv09569
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Sharon A King
Referring Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
2 Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 46:1156
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Defendant's request for an extension of time to 8/31/2021 to answer the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/11/2021. (rtm, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from the Defendant Requesting an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(URGENT, ALLAN)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ALLAN B.K. URGENT on behalf of UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (URGENT, ALLAN)
April 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. (mmb, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, )
April 16, 2021 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12380629) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HANNELORE D'ANDREA, ROCCO J. D'ANDREA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GIANSANTE, LOUIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'ANDREA et al v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: ALLAN B.K. URGENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCCO J. D'ANDREA
Represented By: LOUIS GIANSANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MS. HANNELORE D'ANDREA
Represented By: LOUIS GIANSANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANNELORE D'ANDREA
Represented By: LOUIS GIANSANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?