SUNGBEH v. VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC et al
Plaintiff: TERRI SUNGBEH
Defendant: VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC, CHERYL THOMASON, HAMEEMAH ABDUR-RAHMAAN and JOHN DOES 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv12235
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by TERRI SUNGBEH. (DOMINGO, ERICA)
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC. (DAHER, EMILY)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC. (DAHER, EMILY)
August 2, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 filed by Emily J. Daher on 8/2/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Corporate Disclosure Statement #13 . PLEASE RESUBMIT using Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding found under Other Docuemtns. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #8 Amended Complaint by HAMEEMAH ABDUR-RAHMAAN, CHERYL THOMASON, VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC. (DAHER, EMILY)
July 22, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CHERYL THOMASON, VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on Count III of the Complaint (DAHER, EMILY)
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on Count III of the Complaint (DOMINGO, ERICA)
July 19, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 8/16/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certification, #3 Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(DOMINGO, ERICA)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by TERRI SUNGBEH.(DOMINGO, ERICA)
July 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HAMEEMAH ABDUR-RAHMAAN from Superior Court of New Jersey Burlington County, case number BUR-L-000821-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12601914), filed by HAMEEMAH ABDUR-RAHMAAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal)(DAHER, EMILY)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to L. CIV. R. 7.1.1 (eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 6/29/2021. (se, )
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Hameemah Abdur-Rahmaan on 06/07/2021, filed by TERRI SUNGBEH. (DOMINGO, ERICA)
June 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on Count III of the Complaint. Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on Count III of the Complaint by HAMEEMAH ABDUR-RAHMAAN, CHERYL THOMASON, VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC. Responses due by 7/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A to MOL - Declaration of Susan Philips, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(DAHER, EMILY)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC. (DAHER, EMILY)
June 8, 2021 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time toAnswer - Document #2 submitted by CHERYL THOMASON, VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC on 6/7/2021 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/28/2021 (pr, )
June 8, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
June 8, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (pr, )
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint.. (DAHER, EMILY)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHERYL THOMASON, VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC from Superior Court of New Jersey Burlington County, case number BUR-L-000821-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12526859), filed by CHERYL THOMASON, VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(KEYSER, DENISE)
June 7, 2021 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (mmb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUNGBEH v. VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VITAS HEALTHCARE CORPORATION ATLANTIC
Represented By: DENISE MADDALONI KEYSER
Represented By: EMILY J. DAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL THOMASON
Represented By: DENISE MADDALONI KEYSER
Represented By: EMILY J. DAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMEEMAH ABDUR-RAHMAAN
Represented By: EMILY J. DAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRI SUNGBEH
Represented By: ERICA DOMINGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?