VAN GELDREN v. 2250 HILL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CHARLES VAN GELDREN
Defendant: 2250 HILL, INC. and SGT. SCRAP IRON & METAL, INC. doing business as SGT. SCRAP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv12347
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Sharon A King
Referring Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, PATRICIA C. COLLINS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmr)
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Patricia C. Collins, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12691600.) (DONNELLY, THOMAS)
August 5, 2021 Pro Hac Vice Fee Received as to Patricia C. Collins: $ 150, receipt number TRE120947 (jmh)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Patricia C. Collins, Esq, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 8/3/2021. (dmr)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Certification of Patricia C. Collins on behalf of CHARLES VAN GELDREN Re #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (DONNELLY, THOMAS)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patricia C. Collins, Esq. by CHARLES VAN GELDREN. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DONNELLY, THOMAS)
July 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patricia C. Collins, Esq.. Motion set for 8/16/2021 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
July 13, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of Patricia C. Collins attached to the Motion for Pro Hac Vice #4 submitted by Thomas P. Donnelly on 7/13/2021 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE using the Certification event found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/8/21. (mb, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 2250 HILL, INC., SGT. SCRAP IRON & METAL, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, )
June 10, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (alb, )
June 9, 2021 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (mmb, )
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2250 Hill, Inc., SGT. SCRAP IRON & METAL, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12534608), filed by CHARLES VAN GELDREN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DONNELLY, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VAN GELDREN v. 2250 HILL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2250 HILL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. SCRAP IRON & METAL, INC. doing business as SGT. SCRAP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES VAN GELDREN
Represented By: THOMAS P. DONNELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?