STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. v. C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.
Defendant: C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR
Case Number: 1:2021cv13224
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR waiver sent on 8/9/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (DELUCA, DANIEL)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. (DELUCA, DANIEL)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, )
July 2, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences RMB. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (alb, )
July 1, 2021 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. identifying State Farm Mutual Insurance Companies as Corporate Parent.. (DELUCA, DANIEL)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12598186), filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DELUCA, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. v. C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: DANIEL J. DELUCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.J. WATSON ELECTRICAL CONTRACTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?