LAROCHE v. BURKI
Plaintiff: CLAIRE LAROCHE
Counter Claimant: ANDREW BURKI
Case Number: 1:2021cv13918
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Sharon A King
2 Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/12/2022. Telephone Status Conference held on the record. Ordered that defendant shall revise Rule 26 disclosures by 1/21/22. Ordered that plaintiff's request for attorney's fees regarding discovery disputes is dismissed without prejudice. Order to be entered (Court Reporter, Court Conference Line) (dmr)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER setting a telephone conference for 2/17/2022 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/12/2022. (dmr)
January 10, 2022 Filing 38 Letter. (SUFRIN, DAVID)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference RESET for 1/12/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel shall utilize the same dial-in instructions previously provided by the Court. Defense counsel shall advise the Court in writing as to why he failed to appear for the 1/7/2022 conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/7/2022. (slc)
January 4, 2022 Filing 36 Letter from Stephanie Imbornone. (IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
December 23, 2021 Filing 35 Letter from David W. Sufrin, Esq. (defense counsel). (SUFRIN, DAVID)
December 9, 2021 Filing 34 Letter from Stephanie Imbornone. (IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's letter submission [D.I. 32] by no later than 12/13/2021. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/6/2021. (slc)
December 3, 2021 Filing 32 Letter from Stephanie Imbornone. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Agreement Establishing Discovery Protocal)(IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
October 26, 2021 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/26/2021. Telephone Status Conference held on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, Court Conference Line) (dmr)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference on 11/15/2021 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 1/7/2022 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. At least three (3) days prior to the scheduled conference, the parties shall send the Court a letter identifying all discovery disputes, if any exist. No issue will be addressed unless the parties have first conferred pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.1(a) by speaking in-person or by telephone. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/26/2021. (slc)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/21/2021. (dmr)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/26/2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/21/2021. (slc)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SEAL directing the Clerk to seal the Answer and Counterclaim [D.I. #6 ]; The Clerk shall unseal the proposed Stipulated Order [D.I. #22 ] and amended Answer and Counterclaim [D.I. #23 ] that were filed under seal, as these documents contain only the minor's initials and do not identify the minor by name. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/20/2021. (dmr)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED ORDER directing Counsel for Andrew Burki to amend the Counterclaim within 10 days of the date of this Order to substitute S.B. for the name of the minor child; The previous Answer and Counterclaim shall be sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/20/2021. (dmr)
October 20, 2021 Filing 25 Letter from STEPHANIE IMBORNONE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Establishing ESI)(IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
October 19, 2021 Filing 24 AMENDED ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against ANDREW BURKI by ANDREW BURKI. (SUFRIN, DAVID)
October 19, 2021 Filing 23 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against ANDREW BURKI by ANDREW BURKI. (SUFRIN, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 19, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION re #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim AND FILE REDACTED ANSWER by ANDREW BURKI. (SUFRIN, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 15, 2021 Filing 21 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by ANDREW BURKI. (SUFRIN, DAVID)
October 5, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Counterclaim by CLAIRE LAROCHE.(IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
October 1, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Joseph L. Meadows: $ 150, receipt number TRE122113 (abr, )
October 1, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Wesley D. Allen: $ 150, receipt number TRE122112 (abr, )
September 28, 2021 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on the record on 9/28/2021. Order to be entered. (Electronic Court Recording) (dmr)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/15/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Amended Pleadings due by 11/29/2021. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 3/28/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2022, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/28/2021. (dmr) Modified on 9/29/2021 (dmr, ).
September 22, 2021 Filing 17 Joint Discovery Plan by CLAIRE LAROCHE.(IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
September 22, 2021 Filing 16 Letter from David W. Sufrin, Esq., for Andrew Burki. (SUFRIN, DAVID)
September 22, 2021 NOTICE: Joint Discovery Plan due to Judge Donio's Chambers for 9/28/2021 Scheduling Conference. See Order dated 9/1/2021 and Text Order dated 9/9/2021. (sb, )
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Wesley D. Allen, Esquire, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/21/2021. (dmr)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph L. Meadows, Esquire, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/21/2021. (dmr)
September 16, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by CLAIRE LAROCHE re #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wesley D. Allen Certification of Wesley Allen (IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
September 16, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by CLAIRE LAROCHE re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph Meadows Certification of Joseph Meadows (IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
September 16, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of Wesley Allen and Joseph Meadows attached to he Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice submitted by Stephanie Imbornone on 9/15/2021 contain improper signatures. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENTS WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE using the Certification event found under Response and Replies. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
September 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph Meadows, #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wesley D. Allen. Motion set for 10/18/2021 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wesley D. Allen by CLAIRE LAROCHE. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Stephanie Imbornone, #2 Certification Certification of Wesley Allen, #3 Statement Statement in Lieu of Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph Meadows by CLAIRE LAROCHE. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Stephanie Imbornone, #2 Certification Certification of Joseph Meadows, #3 Statement Statement in Lieu of Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
September 10, 2021 Clerk's Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CLAIRE LAROCHE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/5/2021. (dmr)
September 10, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CLAIRE LAROCHE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/5/2021. (rtm, )
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Claire LaRoche. Attorney STEPHANIE MARIE IMBORNONE for CLAIRE LAROCHE,STEPHANIE MARIE IMBORNONE for CLAIRE LAROCHE added. (IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 9/28/2021 at 10:00 A.M. shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall either be filed on the docket, or alternatively, emailed to njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/9/2021. (slc)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Initial Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/1/2021. (dmr)
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against CLAIRE LAROCHE by ANDREW BURKI.(SUFRIN, DAVID)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by CLAIRE LAROCHE. (IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
August 17, 2021 Clerk's Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ANDREW BURKI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/1/2021. (dmr)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Andrew Burki. Attorney DAVID W. SUFRIN for ANDREW BURKI added. (SUFRIN, DAVID)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Andrew Burki on July 28, 2021, filed by CLAIRE LAROCHE. (IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
July 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King no longer assigned to case. (mmb, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANDREW BURKI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Burki ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12647885) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Claire LaRoche. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(IMBORNONE, STEPHANIE)
July 21, 2021 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAROCHE v. BURKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAIRE LAROCHE
Represented By: STEPHANIE MARIE IMBORNONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: ANDREW BURKI
Represented By: DAVID W. SUFRIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?