MENDIOLA v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: JACINTA ANN MENDIOLA
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2021cv14206
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JACINTA ANN MENDIOLA. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 8/13/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (MAZUR, SHERYL)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, )
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Granting Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; Ordering Clerk to file the #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/2/2021. (alb, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by JACINTA ANN MENDIOLA.(alb, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(MAZUR, SHERYL)
July 27, 2021 Judge Renee Marie Bumb added. (dd, )
July 27, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences RMB. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (alb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENDIOLA v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACINTA ANN MENDIOLA
Represented By: SHERYL GANDEL MAZUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?