UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KELLY et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: DONALD KELLY and AMY KELLY
Case Number: 1:2021cv14600
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by DONALD KELLY has been DENIED. (rtm, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Donald and Amy Kelly.. (NIEDELMAN, LOUIS)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. AMY KELLY served on 8/7/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (YUREKLI, GOKCE)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. DONALD KELLY served on 8/7/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (YUREKLI, GOKCE)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMY KELLY, DONALD KELLY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMY KELLY, DONALD KELLY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons Donald Kelly Summons, #2 Summons Amy Kelly Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(YUREKLI, GOKCE)
August 4, 2021 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dd, )
August 4, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences RMB. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (alb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KELLY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: GOKCE TUGCE YUREKLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMY KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?