MOORE v. ORTIZ
Petitioner: KENTA RAYNARD MOORE
Respondent: DAVID ORTIZ
Case Number: 1:2021cv15863
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Stinson, Jr on behalf of DAVID ORTIZ (Stinson, John)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ANSWER: Respondent may file a Motion to Dismiss the Petition within forty-five (45) days of the date this Order; if Respondent does not file a Motion to Dismiss the Petition, the Respondent shall file a full and complete answer to all claims asserted in the Petition within forty-five (45) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/29/2021. (tf, n.m.)
September 29, 2021 Emailed Petition and Order to Answer to USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj; Mailed Petition and Order to Answer to Warden Fort Dix (tf, )
September 27, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number CAM013249 (dd, )
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/21/2021. (alb, )
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the Clerk to administratively terminate this case and supply Petitioner with a blank IFP application; If Petitioner wishes to reopen this case he shall notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/21/2021. (pr, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by KENTA RAYNARD MOORE. NO IFP/FF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 STATEMENT OF FACTS, #3 ENVELOPE)(pr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KENTA RAYNARD MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID ORTIZ
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: John T. Stinson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?