Buchanon v. Kodger
Petitioner: Anthony Buchanon
Respondent: KODGER
Case Number: 1:2021cv16125
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 9:21-cv-00842. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the petition, Dkt. No. 1, be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. ORDERED that, given the significant liberty interests at stake and the time-sensitivity of petitioner's claims, this Court waives the seven-day waiting period customarily afforded under the Local Rules and respectfully directs the Clerk to effectuate the transfer as soon as possible. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on August 26, 2021. {order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Noel L. Hillman added. (dd, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to petitioner's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and petitioner was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Petitioner has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on August 18, 2021. {text order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SYR959672 (nas, )
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter from Buchanon dated 8/8/2021 advising that the $5.00 filing fee is being sent to the Court. (nas )
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if petitioner wants to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either: (1) pay the court's filing fee of five dollars ($5.00); or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate prison official at his facility. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on July 27, 2021. {order and blank ifp form served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas )
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony Buchanon. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchanon v. Kodger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Buchanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KODGER
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ALEXANDRA TSAKOPOULOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?