MERCHANTVILLE OVERHEAD DOOR CO., INC. v. NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNSEL OF CARPENTERS et al
Plaintiff: MERCHANTVILLE OVERHEAD DOOR CO., INC.
Defendant: NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS and NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNSEL OF CARPENTERS
Case Number: 1:2021cv16516
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 12/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 10/29/2021. (rtm, )
October 29, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Brian C. Darreff, Esquire. (DARREFF, BRIAN)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MERCHANTVILLE OVERHEAD DOOR CO., INC.. NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (DARREFF, BRIAN)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MERCHANTVILLE OVERHEAD DOOR CO., INC.. NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNSEL OF CARPENTERS served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (DARREFF, BRIAN)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS, NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNSEL OF CARPENTERS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, )
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merchantville Overhead Door Company, Inc.. (MONTGOMERY, CHARLES)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES PATRICK MONTGOMERY on behalf of Merchantville Overhead Door Company, Inc. (MONTGOMERY, CHARLES)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS and NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNSEL OF CARPENTERS( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12774471) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Merchantville Overhead Door Company, Inc..(DARREFF, BRIAN)
September 3, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information: In the future when selecting parties, select each party individually. DO NOT select All Plaintiffs or All Defendants . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (alb, )
September 3, 2021 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERCHANTVILLE OVERHEAD DOOR CO., INC. v. NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNSEL OF CARPENTERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCHANTVILLE OVERHEAD DOOR CO., INC.
Represented By: BRIAN CHARLES DARREFF
Represented By: CHARLES PATRICK MONTGOMERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHEAST CARPENTERS FUNDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHEAST REGIONAL COUNSEL OF CARPENTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?