CONSALO FAMILY FARMS, LLC v. MUCCI INTERNATIONAL MARKETING INC.
Counter Defendant: CONSALO FAMILY FARMS, LLC
Counter Claimant: Mucci International Marketing Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv16864
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Initial Conference set for 12/1/2021 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 11/8/2021. (pr, )
November 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. (dd, )
November 5, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MUCCI INTERNATIONAL MARKETING INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John L. Strand, #2 Certification of Jessica A. Vosgerchian, #3 Certification of Kira-Khanh McCarthy, #4 Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #5 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
November 5, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge K. M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pr, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Order by CONSALO FAMILY FARMS, LLC re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LOWRY, TIMOTHY)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Order by CONSALO FAMILY FARMS, LLC re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LOWRY, TIMOTHY)
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 AO120 Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 COMPLAINT) (alb)
November 2, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (pr, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CONSALO FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Colin Steele, #2 Exhibit Certification of Timothy J. Lowry)(LOWRY, TIMOTHY)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CONSALO FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Gina Durham, #2 Exhibit Certification of Timothy J. Lowry)(LOWRY, TIMOTHY)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH L. LINARES on behalf of MUCCI INTERNATIONAL MARKETING INC. (LINARES, JOSEPH)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against CONSALO FAMILY FARMS, LLC by MUCCI INTERNATIONAL MARKETING INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-C, #3 Exhibit D-H, #4 AO120 Form)(WALSH, LIZA)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ on behalf of MUCCI INTERNATIONAL MARKETING INC. (RUIZ, HECTOR)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MUCCI INTERNATIONAL MARKETING INC.. (WALSH, LIZA)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MUCCI INTERNATIONAL MARKETING INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by CONSALO FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (LOWRY, TIMOTHY)
September 13, 2021 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (mmb, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONSALO FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (LOWRY, TIMOTHY)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mucci International Marketing Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12796365) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CONSALO FAMILY FARMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(LOWRY, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONSALO FAMILY FARMS, LLC v. MUCCI INTERNATIONAL MARKETING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: CONSALO FAMILY FARMS, LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY JOHN LOWRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mucci International Marketing Inc.
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?