BATDORF et al v. INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK INC. et al
Plaintiff: RONALD BATDORF, JR. and SANDRA BATDORF
Defendant: INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK INC. doing business as INSPIRA HEALTH doing business as INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK URGENT CARE, PC doing business as INSPIRA URGENT CARE doing business as INSPIRA doing business as URGENT CARE MANTUA doing business as INSPIRA MEDIC, INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK URGENT CARE, PC doing business as INSPIRA URGENT CARE doing business as INSPIRA MEDICAL GROUP PRIMARY CARE MANTUA doing business as URGENT CARE - MANTUA doing business as INSPIRA URGENT CARE MANTUA, INSPIRA MEDICAL GROUP PRIMARY CARE MANTUA doing business as INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK URGENT CARE, PC doing business as URGENT CARE - MANTUA doing business as INSPIRA URGENT CARE MANTUA, MD ABDUL BILAL KHAN, JOHN DOES 1-5 and XYZ ENTITIES 1-5
Case Number: 1:2021cv16936
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(a)(i) by RONALD BATDORF, JR, SANDRA BATDORF (LYNAM, THOMAS)
September 22, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rtm, )
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff has 15 days to amend their complaint to comply with 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/16/2021. (rtm, )
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RONALD BATDORF, JR, SANDRA BATDORF. INSPIRA MEDICAL GROUP PRIMARY CARE MANTUA served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (LYNAM, THOMAS)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RONALD BATDORF, JR, SANDRA BATDORF. INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK URGENT CARE, PC served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (LYNAM, THOMAS)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RONALD BATDORF, JR, SANDRA BATDORF. INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK INC. served on 9/15/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. (LYNAM, THOMAS)
September 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LEONARD G. VILLARI on behalf of All Plaintiffs (VILLARI, LEONARD)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK INC., INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK URGENT CARE, PC, INSPIRA MEDICAL GROUP PRIMARY CARE MANTUA, ABDUL BILAL KHAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12799624) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RONALD BATDORF, JR, SANDRA BATDORF. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LYNAM, THOMAS)
September 14, 2021 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (mmb, )
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/14/2021. (alb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BATDORF et al v. INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD BATDORF, JR.
Represented By: THOMAS A. LYNAM, III
Represented By: LEONARD G. VILLARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA BATDORF
Represented By: THOMAS A. LYNAM, III
Represented By: LEONARD G. VILLARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK INC. doing business as INSPIRA HEALTH doing business as INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK URGENT CARE, PC doing business as INSPIRA URGENT CARE doing business as INSPIRA doing business as URGENT CARE MANTUA doing business as INSPIRA MEDIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK URGENT CARE, PC doing business as INSPIRA URGENT CARE doing business as INSPIRA MEDICAL GROUP PRIMARY CARE MANTUA doing business as URGENT CARE - MANTUA doing business as INSPIRA URGENT CARE MANTUA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPIRA MEDICAL GROUP PRIMARY CARE MANTUA doing business as INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK URGENT CARE, PC doing business as URGENT CARE - MANTUA doing business as INSPIRA URGENT CARE MANTUA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD ABDUL BILAL KHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ ENTITIES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?