NATAMA NABA v. RAUFER
Plaintiff: KANSUNDO BRIGITTE NATAMA NABA
Defendant: SUSAN RAUFER
Case Number: 1:2021cv19370
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Predjuice by KANSUNDO BRIGITTE NATAMA NABA (SIMMONS, HOWARD)
December 15, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rtm, )
November 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ENES HAJDARPASIC on behalf of SUSAN RAUFER (HAJDARPASIC, ENES)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KANSUNDO BRIGITTE NATAMA NABA. SUSAN RAUFER served on 11/3/2021, answer due 1/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts, #2 Exhibit USPS Online Proof of Delivery on U.S. Attorney's Office DNJ)(SIMMONS, HOWARD)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUSAN RAUFER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, )
October 27, 2021 Judge Robert B. Kugler added. (dmw)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUSAN RAUFER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12932359), filed by KANSUNDO BRIGITTE NATAMA NABA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SIMMONS, HOWARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATAMA NABA v. RAUFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KANSUNDO BRIGITTE NATAMA NABA
Represented By: HOWARD DAVID SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN RAUFER
Represented By: ENES HAJDARPASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?