MARTINO v. MAZIE et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MARTINO
Defendant: DAVID MAZIE, ADAM SLATER and Mazie Slater Katz & Freeman, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv20056
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: the Court hereby grants plaintiffs #12 letter-request to extend the time in which to file opposition papers to defendants #7 Motion to Dismiss to February 8, 2022, and to thereby extend the time in which defendants file their reply to February 22, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/6/2022. (lm)
December 29, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Defendants re #12 Letter. (SLATER, ADAM)
December 29, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from Plaintiff requesting extension of time to file opposition papers to Defendants' motion to dismiss re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . (SOLOMON, ROBERT)
December 27, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re #9 MOTION to Strike #8 Reply to Response to Motion , or for Leave to File a Sur-Reply (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(SLATER, ADAM)
December 24, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion filed by ANTHONY MARTINO re #9 MOTION to Strike #8 Reply to Response to Motion , or for Leave to File a Sur-Reply (NAGEL, BRUCE)
December 23, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Strike #8 Reply to Response to Motion , or for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Motion set for 1/18/2022 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
December 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike #8 Reply to Response to Motion , or for Leave to File a Sur-Reply by All Defendants. Responses due by 1/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SLATER, ADAM)
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ANTHONY MARTINO re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to Newark Vicinage (Attachments: #1 Certification of Bruce H. Nagel)(NAGEL, BRUCE)
December 21, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 1/18/2022 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. Responses due by 1/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SLATER, ADAM)
December 16, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to Newark Vicinage . Motion set for 1/3/2022 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
December 6, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by DAVID MAZIE, MAZIE SLATER KATZ & FREEMAN, LLC, ADAM SLATER has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/20/2021. (rtm, )
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (SLATER, ADAM)
December 3, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to Newark Vicinage (Attachments: #1 Certification)(SLATER, ADAM)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT H. SOLOMON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SOLOMON, ROBERT)
November 30, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to Newark Vicinage . Motion set for 12/20/2021 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
November 29, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to Newark Vicinage . Motion set for 12/20/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case to Newark Vicinage by ANTHONY MARTINO. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of motion to transfer vicinage, #2 Certification of Bruce H. Nagel in Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(NAGEL, BRUCE)
November 19, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Party Information,Removal-Other Court Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (amv, )
November 17, 2021 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dd, )
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal,, Amended Exhibit B by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Enclosing Letter)(SLATER, ADAM)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DAVID MAZIE, Mazie Slater Katz & Freeman, LLC, ADAM SLATER from New Jersey Superior Court, case number ESX-L-008473-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12988001), filed by DAVID MAZIE, Mazie Slater Katz & Freeman, LLC, ADAM SLATER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLATER, ADAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTINO v. MAZIE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MARTINO
Represented By: BRUCE HELLER NAGEL
Represented By: ROBERT H. SOLOMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID MAZIE
Represented By: ADAM M. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM SLATER
Represented By: ADAM M. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazie Slater Katz & Freeman, LLC
Represented By: ADAM M. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?