CARSON CORPORATION v. UTILITY LINE SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: CARSON CORPORATION
Defendant: UTILITY LINE SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv20088
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Sharon A King
Referring Judge: Christine P O'Hearn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference scheduled for April 6, 2022 at 10:00 am is being RESCHEDULED to April 13, 2022 at 10:00 am. All parties shall dial 1-888-278-0296 Access Code 2961061# to connect to the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/12/22. (mb, )
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/6/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2022. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 8/31/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/13/2023.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/5/2022. (pr, )
January 4, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/4/2022 by telephone. Scheduling Order to be entered (mb, )
December 20, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Counterclaim by CARSON CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(dmr)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on January 4, 2022 at 11:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be submitted via email to njdnef_king@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 12/1/21. (mb, )
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Initial Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 11/30/2021. (dmr)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against CARSON CORPORATION by UTILITY LINE SERVICES, INC..(MCCARRON, JEFFREY)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UTILITY LINE SERVICES, INC.. (MCCARRON, JEFFREY)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to COLIN MICHAEL SCHMITT re mandatory eFiling. (amv,n.m)
November 19, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (amv)
November 19, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal #1 submitted by MCCARRON, JEFFREY appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (amv)
November 19, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (amv)
November 18, 2021 Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dd, )
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UTILITY LINE SERVICES, INC. to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey from Superior Court of Burlington County, case number BUR-L-002036-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12990491), filed by UTILITY LINE SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(MCCARRON, JEFFREY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARSON CORPORATION v. UTILITY LINE SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARSON CORPORATION
Represented By: COLIN SCHMITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTILITY LINE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY B. MCCARRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?