BOND et al v. SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY BOND, Richard Bond, Sr., Jennifer Underwood, Kim Keleshian, Richard Bond, Jr., RICHARD BOND, SR and RICHARD BOND, JR
Defendant: SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC, Solvay Solexis, Inc., ARKEMA INC., E.I. DUPONT NEMOURS & COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, THE 3M COMPANY, JOHN DOE ENTITIES #1-10, ARKEMA, INC. and E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2022cv01115
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin Conway, Esquire, shall make a payment of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/27/2022. (jab)
April 26, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Arnold Lakind, Esq., #2 Certification of Kevin Conway, Esq., #3 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LAKIND, ARNOLD)
April 26, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER scheduling a Telephone Status Conference for 7/18/2022 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/22/2022. (dmr)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Lubeck, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/22/2022. (dmr)
April 22, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 5/16/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
April 21, 2022 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephonic Oral Argument, Discovery and Status held on 4/21/2022. Telephonic Oral Argument, Discovery and Status Conference held on the record. Hearing on plaintiffs' application for Community Right to Know Surveys. Oral Opinion read into the record. Ordered application denied. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, Court Conference Line) (dmr)
April 21, 2022 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by KIMBERLY BOND, RICHARD BOND, SR, RICHARD BOND, JR, KIM KELESHIAN, JENNIFER UNDERWOOD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arnold Lakind, Esq., #2 Declaration of Michael Lubeck, Esq., #3 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LAKIND, ARNOLD)
April 20, 2022 Filing 50 Letter from Ryan Richman regarding Agreement on Search Connectors. (RICHMAN, RYAN)
April 19, 2022 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JAREN JANGHORBANI and CRYSTAL LOHMANN PARKER, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmr)
April 18, 2022 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC.(KURZWEIL, LANNY)
April 18, 2022 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY.(KURZWEIL, LANNY)
April 18, 2022 Filing 47 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Crystal Lohmann Parker to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WELLS, THEODORE)
April 18, 2022 Filing 46 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jaren Janghorbani to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WELLS, THEODORE)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CONSENT ORDER Concerning Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to answer, plead, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 4/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/14/2022. (dmr)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CONSENT ORDER Concerning Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to answer, plead, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 4/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/11/2022. (dmr)
April 12, 2022 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Jaren Janghorbani, Daniel Toal, and Crystal Parker: $ 450, receipt number TRE125910 (jdg, )
April 11, 2022 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC.(WELLS, THEODORE)
April 11, 2022 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by THE 3M COMPANY.(CAMERSON, DONALD)
April 11, 2022 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ARKEMA, INC..(NORTH, JOHN)
April 11, 2022 Filing 40 STIPULATION and Proposed Consent Order regarding Extension of Time to Answer by E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jaren Janghorbani, Daniel Toal, and Crystal Parker, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/8/2022. (dmr)
April 7, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Theodore V. Wells, Jr., #2 Certification of Jaren Janghorbani, #3 Certification of Daniel Toal, #4 Certification of Crystal Parker, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(WELLS, THEODORE)
April 7, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 5/2/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
April 4, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID ANDREW SCHLIER on behalf of E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC (SCHLIER, DAVID)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER directing that the parties shall file a joint letter setting forth the remaining disputes by no later than 4/18/2022. The telephone status conference for 4/5/2022 is hereby RESCHEDULED to 4/21/2022 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/1/2022. (mag)
March 31, 2022 Filing 35 Letter. (CAMERSON, DONALD)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding the Group 2 Motion to Dismiss papers. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/29/2022. (dmr)
March 25, 2022 Filing 33 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS by E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
March 25, 2022 Clerk's Text Order - The document #32 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC, E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/11/2022. (dmr)
March 24, 2022 Filing 32 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to E. I. du PONT de NEMOURS AND COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY AND THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC. Attorney LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL for E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY,LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL for THE CHEMOURS COMPANY,LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL for THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC added. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
March 24, 2022 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC identifying THE CHEMOURS COMPANY as Corporate Parent.. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
March 24, 2022 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CHEMOURS COMPANY. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
March 24, 2022 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY identifying CORTEVA, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
March 24, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL on behalf of E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
March 24, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN A. RICHMAN on behalf of E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC (RICHMAN, RYAN)
March 23, 2022 Filing 26 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Arkema Inc... (NORTH, JOHN)
March 23, 2022 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARKEMA, INC. identifying Arkema Delaware Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (NORTH, JOHN)
March 23, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by MARJAN MOUSSAVIAN on behalf of ARKEMA, INC. (MOUSSAVIAN, MARJAN)
March 23, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by IRENE HSIEH on behalf of ARKEMA, INC. (HSIEH, IRENE)
March 23, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by JEMI GOULIAN LUCEY on behalf of ARKEMA, INC. (LUCEY, JEMI)
March 23, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN DAVID NORTH on behalf of ARKEMA, INC. (NORTH, JOHN)
March 23, 2022 Clerk's Text Order - The document #26 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ARKEMA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/11/2022. (dmr)
March 23, 2022 Clerk's Text Order - The document #20 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THE 3M COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/11/2022. (dmr)
March 23, 2022 Clerk's Text Order - The document #19 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/11/2022. (dmr)
March 22, 2022 Filing 20 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (CAMERSON, DONALD)
March 22, 2022 Filing 19 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint. Attorney THEODORE V. WELLS, JR for SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC added. (WELLS, THEODORE)
March 21, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by VICTORIA ELIZABETH PHILLIPS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PHILLIPS, VICTORIA)
March 21, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVE PHILLIPS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PHILLIPS, STEVE)
March 21, 2022 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC identifying Ausimont Industries, Inc., Solvay S.A. as Corporate Parent.. (WELLS, THEODORE)
March 21, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by THEODORE V. WELLS, JR on behalf of SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC (WELLS, THEODORE)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER confirming directives given to counsel during telephonic status conference held on March 17, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/18/2022. (alb)
March 17, 2022 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/17/2022. Hearing on joint request to extend the discovery deadline. Ordered application granted. Ordered that the parties shall meet and confer regarding ESI issues. Joint letter to the Court by 4/1/22 with any remaining disputes. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, Court Conference Line) (tf, )
March 17, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER UNDERWOOD, RICHARD BOND, SR, KIMBERLY BOND, KIM KELESHIAN, RICHARD BOND, JR. THE 3M COMPANY served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (LAKIND, ARNOLD)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER UNDERWOOD, RICHARD BOND, SR, KIMBERLY BOND, KIM KELESHIAN, RICHARD BOND, JR. THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (LAKIND, ARNOLD)
March 17, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER UNDERWOOD, RICHARD BOND, SR, KIMBERLY BOND, KIM KELESHIAN, RICHARD BOND, JR. THE CHEMOURS COMPANY served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (LAKIND, ARNOLD)
March 17, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER UNDERWOOD, RICHARD BOND, SR, KIMBERLY BOND, KIM KELESHIAN, RICHARD BOND, JR. E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (LAKIND, ARNOLD)
March 17, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER UNDERWOOD, RICHARD BOND, SR, KIMBERLY BOND, KIM KELESHIAN, RICHARD BOND, JR. ARKEMA, INC. served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (LAKIND, ARNOLD)
March 17, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER UNDERWOOD, RICHARD BOND, SR, KIMBERLY BOND, KIM KELESHIAN, RICHARD BOND, JR. SOLVAY SOLEXIS, INC. served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (LAKIND, ARNOLD)
March 17, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JENNIFER UNDERWOOD, RICHARD BOND, SR, KIMBERLY BOND, KIM KELESHIAN, RICHARD BOND, JR. SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC served on 3/7/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (LAKIND, ARNOLD)
March 11, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE 3M COMPANY. (CAMERSON, DONALD)
March 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES WYLIE CROWDER, IV on behalf of THE 3M COMPANY (CROWDER, JAMES)
March 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DONALD J. CAMERSON, II on behalf of THE 3M COMPANY (CAMERSON, DONALD)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ARKEMA, INC., E.I. DUPONT NEMOURS & COMPANY, SOLVAY SOLEXIS, INC., SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC, THE 3M COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY, THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mag)
March 3, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Jurisdiction, Jury Demand, Party Information. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (mag)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Standing order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 03/03/2022. (mag)
March 3, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information : In the future when selecting parties, select each party individually. DO NOT select All Plaintiffs or All Defendants. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (mag)
March 1, 2022 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw)
March 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS USA, LLC; SOLVAY SOLEXIS, INC.; ARKEMA, INC.; E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY; THE CHEMOURS COMPANY; THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC; THE 3M COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13221870) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KIMBERLY BOND, RICHARD BOND, JR, RICHARD BOND, SR, KIM KELESHIAN, JENNIFER UNDERWOOD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAKIND, ARNOLD) Modified Applicable Parties on 3/3/2022 (mag).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOND et al v. SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY BOND
Represented By: ARNOLD CARL LAKIND
Represented By: STEVE PHILLIPS
Represented By: VICTORIA ELIZABETH PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bond, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Underwood
Represented By: ARNOLD CARL LAKIND
Represented By: STEVE PHILLIPS
Represented By: VICTORIA ELIZABETH PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Keleshian
Represented By: ARNOLD CARL LAKIND
Represented By: STEVE PHILLIPS
Represented By: VICTORIA ELIZABETH PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bond, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BOND, SR
Represented By: ARNOLD CARL LAKIND
Represented By: STEVE PHILLIPS
Represented By: VICTORIA ELIZABETH PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BOND, JR
Represented By: ARNOLD CARL LAKIND
Represented By: STEVE PHILLIPS
Represented By: VICTORIA ELIZABETH PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS, USA, LLC
Represented By: THEODORE V. WELLS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solvay Solexis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARKEMA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DUPONT NEMOURS & COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY
Represented By: LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Represented By: DAVID ANDREW SCHLIER
Represented By: RYAN A. RICHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHEMOURS COMPANY FC, LLC
Represented By: LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Represented By: DAVID ANDREW SCHLIER
Represented By: RYAN A. RICHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE 3M COMPANY
Represented By: DONALD J. CAMERSON, II
Represented By: JAMES WYLIE CROWDER, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE ENTITIES #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARKEMA, INC.
Represented By: JOHN DAVID NORTH
Represented By: IRENE HSIEH
Represented By: JEMI GOULIAN LUCEY
Represented By: MARJAN MOUSSAVIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY
Represented By: LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Represented By: DAVID ANDREW SCHLIER
Represented By: RYAN A. RICHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?