BETEIRO, LLC v. KINDRED GROUP PLC et al
Plaintiff: BETEIRO, LLC
Defendant: KINDRED GROUP PLC, TRANNEL INTERNATIONAL, LTD, UNIBET INTERNATIONAL, LTD and UNIBET INTERACTIVE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01536
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Sharon A King
Referring Judge: Christine P O'Hearn
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark Supko, Esq. and Molly A. Jones, Esq. on behalf of Defendants (Unopposed). Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
May 4, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark Supko, Esq. and Molly A. Jones, Esq. on behalf of Defendants (Unopposed) by KINDRED GROUP PLC, TRANNEL INTERNATIONAL, LTD, UNIBET INTERACTIVE, INC., UNIBET INTERNATIONAL, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Arnold B. Calmann, Esq., #2 Declaration of Mark Supko, Esq., #3 Declaration of Molly A. Jones, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(CALMANN, ARNOLD)
May 3, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KINDRED GROUP PLC. BETEIRO, LLC waiver sent on 4/8/2022, answer due 7/7/2022. (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
May 3, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR on behalf of KINDRED GROUP PLC, TRANNEL INTERNATIONAL, LTD, UNIBET INTERACTIVE, INC., UNIBET INTERNATIONAL, LTD (ESCANLAR, KATHERINE)
May 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ARNOLD B. CALMANN on behalf of KINDRED GROUP PLC, TRANNEL INTERNATIONAL, LTD, UNIBET INTERACTIVE, INC., UNIBET INTERNATIONAL, LTD (CALMANN, ARNOLD)
March 22, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KINDRED GROUP PLC, TRANNEL INTERNATIONAL, LTD, UNIBET INTERACTIVE, INC., UNIBET INTERNATIONAL, LTD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mag)
March 22, 2022 Filing 4 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (mag)
March 21, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information : In the future when selecting parties, select each party individually. DO NOT select All Plaintiffs or All Defendants. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (mag)
March 18, 2022 Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw)
March 18, 2022 Filing 3 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44,, by BETEIRO, LLC. (WARD, DAVID)
March 18, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BETEIRO, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (WARD, DAVID)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KINDRED GROUP PLC, TRANNEL INTERNATIONAL, LTD, UNIBET INTERNATIONAL, LTD, UNIBET INTERACTIVE, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13268202) with JURY DEMAND , Related Case Selected, filed by BETEIRO, LLC.(WARD, DAVID) Modified Applicable Parties on 3/21/2022 (mag).
March 18, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dmw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BETEIRO, LLC v. KINDRED GROUP PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETEIRO, LLC
Represented By: DAVID A. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINDRED GROUP PLC
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANNEL INTERNATIONAL, LTD
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIBET INTERNATIONAL, LTD
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIBET INTERACTIVE, INC.
Represented By: ARNOLD B. CALMANN
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?