GOONAN v. HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Defendant: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Petitioner: THOMAS A GOONAN
Respondent: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. doing business as CAMPUS SERVICES GROUP
Amicus Curiae: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 32BJ
Case Number: 1:2022cv01724
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. (Administrative Termination deadline set for 7/5/2022). Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 5/4/2022. (mag)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: Based on petitioner's reporting to the Court that petitioner has approved a settlement agreement with the respondent, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that the April 22, 2022 motion to appear pro hac vice [Doc. No. #18 ] is denied as moot. Counsel shall have leave to refile this motion, at some future date, if necessary. IT is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk's Office shall enter a 60-day administrative termination order in this case due to the reported settlement. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 5/4/2022. (rss, )
April 28, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #21 First MOTION to Withdraw Petition for Section 10(j) Injunction. Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
April 27, 2022 Filing 21 First MOTION to Withdraw Petition for Section 10(j) Injunction by THOMAS A GOONAN. (RODRIGUEZ, DAVID)
April 25, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 5/16/2022 before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag)
April 22, 2022 Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 32BJ. Amendment to #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Certification of Brent L. Garren, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 18-3). (SLUTSKY, DAVID)
April 22, 2022 Filing 19 AMENDED DOCUMENT by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 32BJ. Amendment to #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected Certification of Service (ECF No. 18-5). (SLUTSKY, DAVID)
April 22, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 32BJ. (Attachments: #1 Statement as to Why No Brief, #2 Certification of David M. Slutsky, Esq. in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brent L. Garren, Esq., #3 Certification of Brent L. Garren, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Cover Letter to Court, #5 Certificate of Service Certification of Service, #6 Text of Proposed Order Admitting Brent L. Garren, Esq. Pro Hac Vice)(SLUTSKY, DAVID)
April 22, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Attachment #18-3, The Certification in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice #18 submitted by DAVID SLUTSKY on 4/22/2022 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mag)
April 21, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Petitioner's Petition for Injunction by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC..(SOBOL, DANIEL)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Amicus Curiae. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/18/2022. (mag)
April 18, 2022 Filing 15 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Petitioner's Petition for Injunction by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC..(SOBOL, DANIEL)
April 18, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SOBOL, DANIEL)
April 18, 2022 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Petitioner's Petition for Injunction by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC..(SOBOL, DANIEL)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/5/2022. (mag)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER Respondent's response to the Petition for Injunction under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act #1 and accompanying brief shall be due by April 18, 2022; Petitioner's reply, if any, shall be due by April 25, 2022. A hearing on the Petition shall be held on May 6, 2022 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4A. So Ordered by Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/5/22. (nar)
April 5, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by THOMAS A GOONAN. HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 3/28/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (RODRIGUEZ, DAVID)
April 4, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae . Motion set for 5/2/2022 before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag)
April 1, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 32BJ. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Service Employees International Union, Local 32BJ's Motion for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae, #2 Certification Certification of David M. Slutsky in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(SLUTSKY, DAVID)
April 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. SOBOL on behalf of HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. (SOBOL, DANIEL)
March 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON SHABY SHEMTOB on behalf of HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. (SHEMTOB, BRANDON)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab)
March 29, 2022 Notice of Judicial Preferences. KMW. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Redact Affidavits and Documentary Evidence by THOMAS A GOONAN. (jab)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition for Injunction by THOMAS A GOONAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jab)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 Exhibit 5 to #1 Complaint, Proposed Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law, by THOMAS A GOONAN. (jab, )
March 28, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, #5 MOTION to Redact. Motion set for 5/2/2022 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmw)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint,,, EXHIBITS TO MEMORANDUM OF POINTS OF LAW AND AUTHORITIES by THOMAS A GOONAN. (RODRIGUEZ, DAVID)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR INJUNCTION UNDER SECTION 10(j) OF THE NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS ACT, AS AMENDED against HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. , filed by THOMAS A GOONAN. (Attachments: #1 COVER LETTER #2 Brief Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition For Injunction, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Order to Show Cause #5 Proposed Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law See #3 , #6 Text of Proposed Order Granting Temporary Injunction, #7 Affidavit of Thomas Goonan, #8 Certificate of Service,(RODRIGUEZ, DAVID) Modified on 3/29/2022 (jab, ). (Attachment 5 replaced on 3/29/2022) (jab, ). Modified on 3/29/2022 (jab, ).
March 28, 2022 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (mmb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOONAN v. HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THOMAS A GOONAN
Represented By: DAVID G RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: ROSARIO JOSEPH DISPENZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: BRANDON SHABY SHEMTOB
Represented By: JOANNE RENEE STRAUSS
Represented By: DANIEL J. SOBOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. doing business as CAMPUS SERVICES GROUP
Represented By: BRANDON SHABY SHEMTOB
Represented By: DANIEL J. SOBOL
Represented By: JOANNE RENEE STRAUSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, LOCAL 32BJ
Represented By: DAVID MARK SLUTSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?