STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 98.110.80.155
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 98.110.80.155
Case Number: 1:2022cv01919
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Sharon A King
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER Granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to the Rule 26(f) Conference Subject to a Protective Order, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/3/2022. (amv)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #4 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference Subject to a Protective Order. Motion set for 5/16/2022 before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference Subject to a Protective Order by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of David Williamson, #3 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Patrick Paige, #4 Exhibit C -- Declaration of Susan Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(ATKIN, JOHN)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (bda)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Judicial Preferences. KMW #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (bda)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ATKIN, JOHN)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 98.110.80.155 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13309529) with JURY DEMAND, filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ATKIN, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 98.110.80.155
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JOHN C. ATKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 98.110.80.155
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?