TRANSATLANTICA COMMODITIES PTE LTD v. HANWIN SHIPPING LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: TRANSATLANTICA COMMODITIES PTE LTD
Defendant: HANWIN SHIPPING LIMITED
Garnishee: MASTER OF MV INDIGO SPICA and THE MASTER OF THE M/V INDIGO SPICA
Case Number: 1:2022cv03348
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Sharon A King
Referring Judge: Christine P O'Hearn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Writ; Granting #15 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/10/2022. (mag)
June 10, 2022 Filing 15 Consent MOTION to Release Attachment of Property and to Stay Case Pending Arbitration by HANWIN SHIPPING LIMITED. (WOOSTER, DANIEL)
June 10, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL HAROLD WOOSTER on behalf of HANWIN SHIPPING LIMITED (WOOSTER, DANIEL)
June 10, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Writ to Release Attachment and Stay Case Pending Arbitration by TRANSATLANTICA COMMODITIES PTE LTD. (GALATI, STEPHEN)
June 6, 2022 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to J. STEPHEN SIMMS, ESQ. $ 150, receipt number CAM013856 (amv)
June 3, 2022 Filing 12 Warrant In Rem and Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed as to Master, M/V INDIGO SPICA (jab)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. STEPHEN SIMMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/3/2022. (amv)
June 3, 2022 Filing 10 Exhibit to #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Amended Exhibit A to Affidavit of J. Stephen Simms by TRANSATLANTICA COMMODITIES PTE LTD. (GALATI, STEPHEN)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 WARRANT for Arrest of Vessel In Rem issued (jab)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion Appointment of Substitute Custodians. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/3/2022. (dmw)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 6/3/2022. (jab)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HANWIN SHIPPING LIMITED. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab)
June 1, 2022 Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw)
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Stephen Simms by TRANSATLANTICA COMMODITIES PTE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stephen J. Galati, #2 Affidavit of J. Stephen Simms, #3 Certification of Good Standing, Maryland Bar, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GALATI, STEPHEN)
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION Appointment of Substitute Custodian re #3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem -Writ of Maritime Attachment by TRANSATLANTICA COMMODITIES PTE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order For Appointment of Substitute Custodian)(GALATI, STEPHEN)
June 1, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem -Writ of Maritime Attachment by TRANSATLANTICA COMMODITIES PTE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment)(GALATI, STEPHEN)
June 1, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANSATLANTICA COMMODITIES PTE LTD. (GALATI, STEPHEN)
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HANWIN SHIPPING LIMITED, MASTER OF MV INDIGO SPICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13452340), filed by TRANSATLANTICA COMMODITIES PTE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(GALATI, STEPHEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRANSATLANTICA COMMODITIES PTE LTD v. HANWIN SHIPPING LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSATLANTICA COMMODITIES PTE LTD
Represented By: STEPHEN J. GALATI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANWIN SHIPPING LIMITED
Represented By: DANIEL HAROLD WOOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: MASTER OF MV INDIGO SPICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: THE MASTER OF THE M/V INDIGO SPICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?