DAMIANI v. CMG MORTGAGE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: GINA DAMIANI
Defendant: CMG MORTGAGE, INC. doing business as CMG FINANCIAL, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5 and JOHN DOES 1-5
Counter Claimant: CMG MORTGAGE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv04783
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Pascal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by TYLER J. BURRELL on behalf of GINA DAMIANI (BURRELL, TYLER)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled for 10/12/2022, at 11:30 AM shall be VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall use the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 Access Code 1051623#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 9/21/2022. (bda)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Initial Conference set for 10/12/2022 at 11:30 AM via teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 9/19/2022. (mag)
September 16, 2022 Filing 14 REDACTION to #13 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),,, Counterclaim,, by CMG MORTGAGE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(IANNUCCI, MICHAEL)
September 16, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against GINA DAMIANI by CMG MORTGAGE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(IANNUCCI, MICHAEL)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER The Court is in receipt of Defendant's response, [Docket No. 8], to its August 4, 2022, Order to Show Cause regarding the amount in controversy in this matter, [Docket No. 4]. Having considered Defendant's response, the Court hereby DISCHARGES its Order to Show Cause. However, the Court reserves the right to revisit the jurisdictional issues raised by its Orders to Show Cause as the litigation proceeds. Moreover, nothing in this Order shall preclude the parties from raising any good-faith challenge to this Court's subject matter jurisdiction in the future. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 08/31/2022. (Costigan, Roberta)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: ECF: 10 was entered in error. Counsel is to disregard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 8/23/2022. (bda)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendants letter request, dated August 22, 2022, seeking an extension of Defendant Synchronys time to respond to the Complaint, ECF No. 16. For the reasons stated therein, including the consent of opposing counsel, the Court finds good cause to GRANT the request. The Court hereby extends Synchronys time to respond to the Complaint to September 9, 2022. Given this extension, the Court reschedules the August 29, 2022 initial scheduling conference to September 23, 2022, at 10:30 AM. Counsel shall dial 1-888-684-8852, access code 1051623# to connect to the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 8/23/2022. (bda)
August 23, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Seal CMG Response to Courts Order to Show Cause. Motion set for 9/19/2022 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag)
August 22, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Seal CMG Response to Courts Order to Show Cause. Motion set for 9/19/2022 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER extending the time within which Defendant may answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until the 10th day following the Court's decision regarding remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 8/17/2022. (mag) Modified on 8/23/2022 (jmh).
August 19, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CMG MORTGAGE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(IANNUCCI, MICHAEL)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 19, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal CMG Response to Courts Order to Show Cause by CMG MORTGAGE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Index A to Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(IANNUCCI, MICHAEL)
August 19, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CMG MORTGAGE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit A to Certification, #3 Exhibit B to Certification, #4 Exhibit C to Certification)(IANNUCCI, MICHAEL)
August 16, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION and Proposed Consent Order to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer by CMG MORTGAGE, INC.. (IANNUCCI, MICHAEL)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Removing Defendant shall SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; Defendant's response due by 8/19/2022. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/4/2022. (mag)
August 2, 2022 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (IANNUCCI, MICHAEL)
August 2, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMG MORTGAGE, INC. identifying CMG Financial Services, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (IANNUCCI, MICHAEL)
August 2, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CMG MORTGAGE, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/17/2022. (mag)
July 28, 2022 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab)
July 28, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jab)
July 27, 2022 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (dmw)
July 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CMG MORTGAGE INC. from Superior Court of Camden County, case number CAM L 001608 22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13592139), filed by CMG MORTGAGE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(IANNUCCI, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAMIANI v. CMG MORTGAGE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINA DAMIANI
Represented By: CHARLES JOSEPH KOCHER
Represented By: TYLER J. BURRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMG MORTGAGE, INC. doing business as CMG FINANCIAL
Represented By: MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: CMG MORTGAGE, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?