LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Plaintiff: LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY and WILLIAM and JANET HOPKINS
Defendant: BROAN NUTONE, LLC and BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv07382
Filed: December 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The court having reviewed the docket, and it appearing that by letter dated December 22, 2022 [ECF No. #4 ] that the Clerk informed counsel for plaintiff that its records show that counsel is not a member of the Federal Bar of New Jersey, and that counsel is responsible for having a member of the Bar of this Court file an appearance in accordance with Local Civil Rule 101.1 on behalf of plaintiff, and it appearing that counsel has not complied with this requirement, and the Court having not received a joint discovery plan, it is ORDERED that today's initial conference is ADJOURNED. Plaintiff's counsel shall comply with the Rules of this Court by Feb. 24, 2023 or otherwise show cause, in writing, by Feb. 24, 2023 why the undersigned Magistrate Judge should not recommend that this matter be dismissed for non-compliance with Court rules. The Clerk's Office shall forward a copy of this text order and the docket sheet to counsel by regular mail. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 2/8/2023. (rss, )
February 8, 2023 A copy of #9 Text order has been mailed to the Plaintiff attorney's address. (rss, )
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The initial conference is RESCHEDULED for February 8, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. The call-in number is 888-808-6929, access code 2170922#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 1/12/2023. (rss, )
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Amended Order Initial Conference set for 2/1/2023 at 3:30 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 1/11/2023. (alb, )
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Initial Conference set for 2/7/2023 at 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 1/11/2023. (alb, )
January 10, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BROAN-NUTONE LLC.(MIDURA, CHRISTOPHER)
December 22, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (jab,N.M.)
December 22, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by parties and intervenors in diversity actions to identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. Such disclosure statements must be filed with the parties, intervenors or proposed intervenors first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response or other request addressed to the Court. (jab)
December 22, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jab)
December 22, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jab)
December 21, 2022 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Broan NuTone, LLC. Attorney CHRISTOPHER PAUL MIDURA for BROAN NUTONE, LLC added. (MIDURA, CHRISTOPHER)
December 21, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BROAN NUTONE, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/9/2022. (alb, )
December 20, 2022 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (mmb, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BROAN NUTONE, LLC identifying Nortek, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MIDURA, CHRISTOPHER)
December 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BROAN NUTONE, LLC from Superior Court of NJ - Burlington, case number BUR-L-2070-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13905469), filed by BROAN NUTONE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MIDURA, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY v. BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBERTY MUTUAL MID-ATLANTIC INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM and JANET HOPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROAN NUTONE, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAUL MIDURA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROAN-NUTONE LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER PAUL MIDURA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?