HR HOSPITALITY, LLC et al v. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY
Plaintiff: HR HOSPITALITY LLC doing business as D/B/A KNIGHTS INN, ARJHV HOSPITALITY, LLC., doing business as D/B/A BAY VIEW INN, RGM HOSPITALITY, LLC doing business as D/B/A INN OF THE DOVE, HR HOSPITALITY, LLC doing business as KNIGHTS INN, ARJHV HOSPITALITY, LLC doing business as BAY VIEW INN and RGM HOSPITALITY, LLC doing business as INN OF THE DOVE
Defendant: CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY
Case Number: 1:2023cv02104
Filed: April 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Christine P O'Hearn
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HR HOSPITALITY, LLC, ARJHV HOSPITALITY, LLC, RGM HOSPITALITY, LLC. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY served on 4/20/2023, answer due 5/11/2023. (RESNICK, JEFFREY)
April 19, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARJHV HOSPITALITY, LLC. (RESNICK, JEFFREY)
April 19, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RGM HOSPITALITY, LLC. (RESNICK, JEFFREY)
April 19, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HR HOSPITALITY, LLC. (RESNICK, JEFFREY)
April 18, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab)
April 18, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at #www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jab)
April 14, 2023 Filing 2 Exhibit to QC - Document Not Signed by Attorney, #1 Complaint, by ARJHV HOSPITALITY, LLC.,, HR HOSPITALITY LLC, RGM HOSPITALITY, LLC. (RESNICK, JEFFREY)
April 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14247639) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HR HOSPITALITY LLC, ARJHV HOSPITALITY, LLC.,, RGM HOSPITALITY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(RESNICK, JEFFREY)
April 14, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint #1 submitted by Jeffrey P. Resnick on 4/14/2023 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE SIGNATURE PAGES ONLY WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) USING THE EVENT *EXHIBIT TO DOCUMENT* This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
April 14, 2023 Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (tf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HR HOSPITALITY, LLC et al v. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HR HOSPITALITY LLC doing business as D/B/A KNIGHTS INN
Represented By: JEFFREY P. RESNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARJHV HOSPITALITY, LLC., doing business as D/B/A BAY VIEW INN
Represented By: JEFFREY P. RESNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RGM HOSPITALITY, LLC doing business as D/B/A INN OF THE DOVE
Represented By: JEFFREY P. RESNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HR HOSPITALITY, LLC doing business as KNIGHTS INN
Represented By: JEFFREY P. RESNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARJHV HOSPITALITY, LLC doing business as BAY VIEW INN
Represented By: JEFFREY P. RESNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RGM HOSPITALITY, LLC doing business as INN OF THE DOVE
Represented By: JEFFREY P. RESNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?