LANEY v. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY et al
Plaintiff: YOLANDA LANEY
Defendant: CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY and ANTHONY SWAN
Case Number: 1:2023cv02361
Filed: April 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL on behalf of CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY, ANTHONY SWAN (ISRAEL, RONALD)
May 25, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN O'HANLON on behalf of YOLANDA LANEY (O'HANLON, STEPHEN)
May 25, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by YOLANDA LANEY. ANTHONY SWAN waiver sent on 5/22/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (O'HANLON, STEPHEN)
May 25, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by YOLANDA LANEY. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY waiver sent on 5/22/2023, answer due 7/21/2023. (O'HANLON, STEPHEN)
May 25, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN O'HANLON on behalf of YOLANDA LANEY (O'HANLON, STEPHEN)
May 25, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Appearance #3 submitted by STEPHEN T. OHANLON on 5/25/2023 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (alb, )
May 1, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY, ANTHONY SWAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
April 28, 2023 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw)
April 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY, ANTHONY SWAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14281488) with JURY DEMAND, filed by YOLANDA LANEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCHWARTZ, ISRAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANEY v. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOLANDA LANEY
Represented By: ISRAEL SCHWARTZ
Represented By: STEPHEN O'HANLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY SWAN
Represented By: RONALD LAWRENCE ISRAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?