ALTMAN et al v. CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: HEATHER ALTMAN and ELIZA WIATROSKI
Defendant: CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC., BOARDWALK REGENCY LLC d/b/a CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO, HARRAHS ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC d/b/a HARRAHS RESORT ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO, TROPICANA ATLANTIC CITY CORPORATION d/b/a TROPICANA CASINO AND RESORT ATLANTIC CITY, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC d/b/a BORGATA HOTEL CASINO & SPA, HARD ROCK INTERNATIONAL INC., SEMINOLE HARD ROCK SUPPORT SERVICES, LLC, BOARDWALK 1000, LLC d/b/a HARD ROCK HOTEL & CASINO ATLANTIC CITY, CENDYN GROUP, LLC, BOARDWALK REGENCY LLC doing business as CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO, HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC doing business as HARRAHS RESORT ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO, TROPICANA ATLANTIC CITY CORPORATION doing business as TROPICANA CASINO AND RESORT ATLANTIC CITY, MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC doing business as BORGATA HOTEL CASINO & SPA and BOARDWALK 1000, LLC doing business as HARD ROCK HOTEL & CASINO ATLANTIC CITY
Case Number: 1:2023cv02536
Filed: May 9, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Pascal
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee as to BETHANY W. KRISTOVICH, KYLE W. MACH, JUSTIN P. RAPHAEL, JULIANA M. YEE, STEPHANY REAVES: $ 750, receipt number 133420 (mg)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher J. Cormier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 7/6/2023. (alb, )
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Boris Bershteyn, Ken Schwartz, Michael Menitove and Sam Auld, filed. Motion set for 8/7/2023 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CENDYN GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gregory Mortenson in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Lawrence Buterman in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certification of Sadik Huseny in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certification of Brendan McShane in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Certification of Anna Rathbun in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #6 Certification of Christopher Brown in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(MORTENSON, GREGORY)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Boris Bershteyn, Ken Schwartz, Michael Menitove and Sam Auld, filed by BOARDWALK REGENCY LLC, CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC., HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, TROPICANA ATLANTIC CITY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Tansy Woan, #2 Certification of Boris Bershteyn, #3 Certification of Ken Schwartz, #4 Certification of Michael Menitove, #5 Certification of Sam Auld, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(WOAN, TANSY)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by TANSY WOAN on behalf of BOARDWALK REGENCY LLC, CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC., HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, TROPICANA ATLANTIC CITY CORPORATION (WOAN, TANSY)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Bethany W. Kristovich, Esquire, Kyle W. Mach, Esquire, Justin P. Raphael, Esquire, Juliana M. Yee, Esquire, and Stephany Reaves, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 6/29/2023. (dmr)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice, Defendant Cendyn Group, LLCs #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sadik Huseny, Esquire; Lawrence Buterman, Esquire; Brendan McShane, Esquire; Anna Rathbun, Esquire; and Christopher Brown, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 6/29/2023. (dmr)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Cormier, Esq., Spencer Cox, Esq., Warren T. Burns, Esq., Daniel H. Charest, Esq., Matthew Tripolitsiotis, Esq., Hannah M. Crowe Esq., and Quinn Burns, Esq.. Motion set for 7/17/2023 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jab)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher J. Cormier, Esq., Spencer Cox, Esq., Warren T. Burns, Esq., Daniel H. Charest, Esq., Matthew Tripolitsiotis, Esq., Hannah M. Crowe Esq., and Quinn Burns, Esq. by HEATHER ALTMAN, ELIZA WIATROSKI. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph J. DePalma, Esq., #2 Certification of Christopher J. Cormier, Esq., #3 Certification of Spencer Cox, Esq., #4 Certification of Warren T. Burns, Esq., #5 Certification of Daniel H. Charest, Esq., #6 Certification of Hannah M. Crowe, Esq., #7 Certification of Quinn Burns, Esq., #8 Certification of Matthew Tripolitsiotis, Esq., #9 Text of Proposed Order)(DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL. (RIMM, HARRY)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice OF BETHANY W. KRISTOVICH, KYLE W. MACH, JUSTIN P. RAPHAEL, JULIANA M. YEE AND STEPHANY REAVES (see Docket Entry 11 for Supporting Documents) by MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL. (RIMM, HARRY)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice OF BETHANY W. KRISTOVICH, KYLE W. MACH, JUSTIN P. RAPHAEL, JULIANA M. YEE AND STEPHANY REAVES (see Docket Entry 11 for Supporting Documents). Motion set for 7/3/2023 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission #11 filed by Harry H. Rimm on 6/6/2023 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice. PLEASE RESUBMIT using the "Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice" event. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL OF DEFENDANT MGM'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF BETHANY W. KRISTOVICH, KYLE W. MACH, JUSTIN P. RAPHAEL, JULIANA M. YEE AND STEPHANY REAVES (Attachments: #1 Certification of Harry H. Rimm In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bethany W. Kristovich, Kyle W. Mach, Justin P. Raphael, Juliana M. Yee and Stephany Reaves, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Bethany W. Kristovich, Kyle W. Mach, Justin P. Raphaell, Juliana M. Yee and Stephany Reaves, #3 Certification of Bethany W. Kristovich In Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certification of Kyle W. Mach In Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Certification of Justin P. Raphael In Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #6 Certification of Juliana M. Yee In Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #7 Certification of Stephany Reaves In Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(RIMM, HARRY)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 7/3/2023 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ssp, )
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting an extension of time for Defendants' to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 6/1/2023. (alb, )
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CENDYN GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Gregory Mortenson in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Lawrence Buterman in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certification of Sadik Huseny in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Certification of Brendan McShane in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Certification of Anna Rathbun in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #6 Certification of Christopher Brown in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(MORTENSON, GREGORY)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENDYN GROUP, LLC identifying Accel-KKR as Other Affiliate, Cendyn Parent, Inc., Cendyn Group Holdings LLC as Corporate Parent.. (MORTENSON, GREGORY)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY STEPHEN MORTENSON on behalf of CENDYN GROUP, LLC (MORTENSON, GREGORY)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Defendants' Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Pascal)(RIMM, HARRY)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by HARRY H. RIMM on behalf of MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL (RIMM, HARRY)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE B. DERENZE on behalf of HEATHER ALTMAN, ELIZA WIATROSKI (DERENZE, CATHERINE)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. DEPALMA on behalf of HEATHER ALTMAN, ELIZA WIATROSKI (DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOARDWALK 1000, LLC, BOARDWALK REGENCY LLC, CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CENDYN GROUP, LLC, HARD ROCK INTERNATIONAL INC., HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC, MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, SEMINOLE HARD ROCK SUPPORT SERVICES, LLC, TROPICANA ATLANTIC CITY CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (dmw, )
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOARDWALK 1000, LLC d/b/a HARD ROCK HOTEL & CASINO ATLANTIC CITY, BOARDWALK REGENCY LLC d/b/a CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO, CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CENDYN GROUP, LLC, HARD ROCK INTERNATIONAL INC., HARRAHS ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC d/b/a HARRAHS RESORT ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO, MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC d/b/a BORGATA HOTEL CASINO & SPA, MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL, SEMINOLE HARD ROCK SUPPORT SERVICES, LLC, TROPICANA ATLANTIC CITY CORPORATION d/b/a TROPICANA CASINO AND RESORT ATLANTIC CITY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14305483) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ELIZA WIATROSKI, HEATHER ALTMAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Non-Arbitrability)(REUBEN, MINDEE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALTMAN et al v. CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER ALTMAN
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: CATHERINE B. DERENZE
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZA WIATROSKI
Represented By: MINDEE J. REUBEN
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Represented By: CATHERINE B. DERENZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAESARS ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By: TANSY WOAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARDWALK REGENCY LLC d/b/a CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRAHS ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC d/b/a HARRAHS RESORT ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROPICANA ATLANTIC CITY CORPORATION d/b/a TROPICANA CASINO AND RESORT ATLANTIC CITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM RESORTS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: HARRY H. RIMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC d/b/a BORGATA HOTEL CASINO & SPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARD ROCK INTERNATIONAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEMINOLE HARD ROCK SUPPORT SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARDWALK 1000, LLC d/b/a HARD ROCK HOTEL & CASINO ATLANTIC CITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENDYN GROUP, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY STEPHEN MORTENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARDWALK REGENCY LLC doing business as CAESARS ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO
Represented By: TANSY WOAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING COMPANY, LLC doing business as HARRAHS RESORT ATLANTIC CITY HOTEL & CASINO
Represented By: TANSY WOAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROPICANA ATLANTIC CITY CORPORATION doing business as TROPICANA CASINO AND RESORT ATLANTIC CITY
Represented By: TANSY WOAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC doing business as BORGATA HOTEL CASINO & SPA
Represented By: HARRY H. RIMM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARDWALK 1000, LLC doing business as HARD ROCK HOTEL & CASINO ATLANTIC CITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?