SCHASER et al v. FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JOHN SCHASER and DEBORAH SCHASER
Defendant: FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN DOES PARTNERSHIPS I TO C, JOHN DOES INSTITUTIONS, A TO Z, JOHN DOES PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATIONS A TO Z, JANE DOES 1 TO 10, JOHN DOES INCORPORATED A TO Z and JOHN DOES 1 TO 10
Cross-Defendant: JOHN DOES 1 TO 10
Cross-Complainant: FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2024cv09163
Filed: September 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Christine P O'Hearn
Referring Judge: Matthew J Skahill
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the initial conference currently scheduled for November 15, 2024 is hereby moved to December 6, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. The call in information is 856-210-8988, access code 6456 350 564#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 11/8/24. (Shaw, A).
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: In light of counsel's request, the initial conference currently scheduled for November 6, 2024 is hereby moved to November 15, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. The call in information is 856-210-8988, access code 456 350 564#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 10/4/24. (Shaw, A).
October 3, 2024 Filing 8 Letter from Dan Klein re: adjournment request. (KLEIN, DANIEL)
October 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Initial Conference set for 11/6/2024 at 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 10/02/2024. (aji, )
October 1, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against JOHN DOES 1 TO 10 by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(KLEIN, DANIEL)
September 18, 2024 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Federated Mutual Insurance Co.. Attorney DANIEL LEWELYN KLEIN for FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY added. (KLEIN, DANIEL)
September 18, 2024 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, CIS by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (KLEIN, DANIEL) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/18/2024) (mag).
September 18, 2024 CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - Document #5 submitted by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY on 9/18/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/4/2024. (sms2)
September 18, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Civil Cover Sheet #4 filed by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY on 9/18/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (mag)
September 17, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (js)
September 17, 2024 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (js)
September 16, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dmw, )
September 13, 2024 Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dmw)
September 13, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL LEWELYN KLEIN on behalf of FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (KLEIN, DANIEL)
September 13, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (KLEIN, DANIEL)
September 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of NJ-Cumberland, case number CUM-L-747-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15662786), filed by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KLEIN, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHASER et al v. FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN SCHASER
Represented By: ADAM SCOTT GETSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH SCHASER
Represented By: ADAM SCOTT GETSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL LEWELYN KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES PARTNERSHIPS I TO C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES INSTITUTIONS, A TO Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATIONS A TO Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES 1 TO 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES INCORPORATED A TO Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1 TO 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-defendant: JOHN DOES 1 TO 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross-complainant: FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL LEWELYN KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?