PISANO v. URQUIA-ORTIZ et al
Plaintiff: ANTONIO PISANO
Defendant: DANIELLE P. URQUIA-ORTIZ and JENNA M. NACE
Case Number: 1:2024cv09247
Filed: September 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER consolidating cases with 1:23-cv-01281-KMW-AMD. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/24/2024. (dmr)
October 24, 2024 Cases associated: Create association to 1:23-cv-01281-KMW-AMD. (dmr)
October 24, 2024 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The in-person initial scheduling conference on 10/29/2024 at 11:00 A.M. shall be, and is hereby, CONVERTED to a telephonic status conference, which conference shall include counsel from the consolidated/companion cases. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-856-210-8988 / 443 509 985#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/21/2024. (slc)
October 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Initial Conference set for 10/29/2024 at 11:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/03/2024. (aji, )
October 2, 2024 Filing 5 Danielle Urquia-Ortiz's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by DANIELLE P. URQUIA-ORTIZ.(BISHOP, MELISSA)
October 1, 2024 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by ANTONIO PISANO. JENNA M. NACE served on 9/20/2024, answer due 10/11/2024. (BURNHAM, PHILIP)
September 19, 2024 Filing 3 Diversity Disclosure Statement by ANTONIO PISANO. (BURNHAM, PHILIP)
September 19, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JENNA M. NACE, DANIELLE P. URQUIA-ORTIZ. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (aji, )
September 19, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information: DO NOT select the All Defendants radio button, instead, select each defendant individually . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (aji, )
September 19, 2024 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (aji, )
September 19, 2024 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (aji, )
September 19, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (aji, )
September 18, 2024 Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw )
September 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15671963) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ANTONIO PISANO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BURNHAM, PHILIP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PISANO v. URQUIA-ORTIZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO PISANO
Represented By: PHILIP S. BURNHAM, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIELLE P. URQUIA-ORTIZ
Represented By: MELISSA BISHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNA M. NACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?