SPEERS v. OLYMPUS SPORTS LLC et al
Plaintiff: BRENDAN SPEERS
Defendant: OLYMPUS SPORTS LLC and TODD BEAMAN
Case Number: 1:2025cv00589
Filed: January 16, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Edward S Kiel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2025 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court. #Click here to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (dmw, )
January 17, 2025 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TODD BEAMAN, OLYMPUS SPORTS LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (aji, )
January 17, 2025 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Civil Cover Sheet filed by BRENDAN SPEERS (WEISBERG, MATTHEW) on 01/16/2025 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our #website under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (aji, )
January 17, 2025 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information: Do not select ALL DEFENDANTS when opening a case on CMECF. Instead, at the Filed Against Screen, select each defendant individually. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (aji, )
January 17, 2025 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (aji, )
January 16, 2025 Judge Edward S. Kiel and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (mmb)
January 16, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15947638) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BRENDAN SPEERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(WEISBERG, MATTHEW) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/17/2025) (aji, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPEERS v. OLYMPUS SPORTS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDAN SPEERS
Represented By: MATTHEW BENJAMIN WEISBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLYMPUS SPORTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD BEAMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?