MACELLARI v. IMPERIAL
Plaintiff: MARIO MACELLARI
Defendant: GREG IMPERIAL
Case Number: 1:2025cv01236
Filed: February 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Sharon A King
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2025 Memorandum Order #4 sent to Plaintiff via regular U.S. mail. (sms2, n.m.)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #1 -1 Application IFP; DISMISSING Plaintiff's #1 Complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Plaintiff may have the case reopened, if they file an amended complaint within thirty days of the date of the entry of this Memorandum Order; Defendant shall not be served before the Court's sua sponte screen of an amended complaint; directing the Clerk of Court to serve a copy of this Memorandum Order on Plaintiff to his address of record by regular U.S. mail and CLOSE this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/4/2025. (sms2, n.m.)
March 4, 2025 COMPLAINT filed, please see entry #1 for the Complaint. (sms2, n.m.)
March 4, 2025 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sms2, n.m.)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reallocated to Camden and Reassigned to Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King for all further proceedings. Judge Julien Xavier Neals no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/20/25. (mmb)
February 14, 2025 Filing 2 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (Notice of Mail) (dam)
February 13, 2025 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Envelope)(dam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MACELLARI v. IMPERIAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIO MACELLARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG IMPERIAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?