WALSH SECURITIES INC v. CRISTO PROPERTY, et al

Case Number: 2:1997cv03496
Filed: July 17, 1997
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Newark Office
Presiding Judge: Dickinson R. Debevoise
Referring Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2014 592 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 586 Report and Recommendations dismissing w/prejudice counterclaims & crossclaims of deft., RICHARD CALANNI. Signed by Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise on 3/21/14. (DD, )
June 30, 2010 395 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER granting 366 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/30/10. (dc, )
December 16, 2009 372 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Dickinson R. Debevoise on 12/16/09. (DD, )
June 30, 2009 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 291 MOTION for Reconsideration re 289 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct MOTION for Reconsideration re 289 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct and Walsh's motion for leave to file a Fourth Amended Complaint as to proposed Ct. VII I, Proposed Ct. IX and the additional of a breach of duty of good faith and fair dealing claims to CountIV is granted. and pltf must file its Fourth Amended complaint by 7/10/09 filed by WALSH SECURITIES INC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp on 6/30/09. (cs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALSH SECURITIES INC v. CRISTO PROPERTY, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?