COOK v. CATHEL et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv03916
Filed: August 5, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
Presiding Judge: Faith S. Hochberg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM/ORDER granting re 37 Application to Proceed IFP filed by THOMAHL COOK. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 1/18/17. (DD, ) N/M
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/22/2016. (ld, )
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM/ORDER that respondents request for an extension of time to file a response to the amended habeas petition is granted; that respondents shall file and serve their response to the amended habeas petition on or before September 14, 2015. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/14/15. (DD, )
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM/ORDER REOPENING CASE; that the Clerk shall update Mr. Cooks address of record as follows: Thomahl Cook, SB# 405681, East Jersey State Prison, Lockbag R, Rahway, New Jersey 07065; that the Clerk shall replace Ron Cathel with Patrick Nogan as a respondent; that petitioners motion to amend his habeas petition is granted and the Clerk shall file petitioners amended petition which can be found at Dkt. Nos. 11-2, 11-3, 11-4 & 11-5; that respondents shall file a full and complete answer to the habeas petition within forty-five (45) days of the entry of this Order; etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/29/15. (DD, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOK v. CATHEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?