STILLMAN v. STAPLES, INC.
Plaintiff: Alison H. Rubin, Matthew Douthilt, CHRISTOPHER AGOSTINO, Jignes A. Jain, AMBER WEBB, JEREMIAH UNDERHILL, MICHAEL PEREZ, Matthew D. Heinly, DANIEL DELUCA, Louis Stines, JAMES R. MATSUOKA, David Porter, Robert J. Gallo, Jeff Goldberg, CHRISTOPHER SURDO, MICHELE TOWNSEND, BRIAN E. MCNEILL, Mauricio Merizalde, FRANCISCO J. REAL, April B. Parchision, DEBORAH SAUNDERS, Rob Swanger, William Nash, Milton R. Baker, Jr., Hardat Pariag, HERSHANE JONES, Jeffrey Michael, JOHN T. GARLAND, HERBERT DAYE, Fred J. Overing, EDWARD RODRIGUEZ, JOANNE R. ZIPPRIAN, BRANDON PALMER, Oliver Rerd, Larry Lichtefeld, Shawn Clinton, Craig S. Phillips, MATTHEW BROOKS, JAMES J. MURRAY, Louis A. Viola, Christopher R. Wagner, Blyeshia D. Kemp, JEFFREY CIOTTI, MARC MORGAN, Johnny Wing, Daniel Polaski, Kelli Maze, CHRIS KURN, DIANA DENNIS, Gerald T. Reichett, MOHAMED SAMB, DAVID P. ESTES, Curtis McPherson, Eric McAfee, Julie Seltz, NANCY TREON, MICHAEL DAVID HENRY, Calvin Thomas, David Michael Weinstein, GERALD B. WILKIE, JR., Roger A. Chambers, JON M. WALTON, Garrett Murawski, THOMAS DYER, TERRY WOMACK, SHANNAN E. MCCAUSLAND, Greg G. Mauch, PHILIP ANDREOTTI, JEREMY ANDERSON, RAMON PEDRAZA, VICTORIA TOMLINSON, STEPHEN KLEMASH, Tommy L. McCall, RAUL ALDARONDO, JEFFREY BLAND, Joshua Sharninghouse, CRYSTAL WYMAN, Joseph A. O'Brien, Jr., LESTER PARADA, Heleeda Ellis, Anthony Richardson, FREDERICK NADDEO, HEATHER ANN LARNEY, KIMBERLY J. COOPER, LaVern J. Wilson, AL WHITTON, JAMES BEDDINGFIELD, GREGORY F. BLAKE, DUSTIN FORBES, Carl Popovich, EDWARD CAMUS, JASON MOTTA, Geoff Niederlitz, ISIAH NORA, PAUL MANZO, MARK GHIRARDUZZI, RAY YACOUBY, SANDEEP KANWAL, NICOLE MAZURKIEWICZ, Jason Stockdale, William Rooney, CHRISSY HAYFORD, Mark DiMauro, CRAIG PAGLIUCA, Sam Forrester, Sabina Rusznak, RALPH E. GAUDETTE, III, JOSEPH PUCCIO, Kenley Diaz, Ray Tejada, Justin Hallstein, Kathleen Breitenwischer, JOSE BUCKLES, NURYA ALVARENGA, MICHAEL MOREA, MICHAEL D. HALASZ, EDWARD HALL, Laterfah Smith, Wilfred M. Johnson, Chandra L. Griffin, SHAWN K. WELCH, DAVID ELLIOTT, Corey Larkins, Leroy J. Troxell, Jr., Chris Linden, Paul Szymanski, JEAN K. MAHER, DANIEL BJORAKER, COLSTON STEWART, IV., Jason T. Ransom, Arthur Lee Haislip, IV., Jerome Gray, Chris Wolff, CRAIG R. EDWARDS, Eric Nordlind, JOSE CASTRO, SHAUN N. MILLER, Alan Michaud, Lennie Trocard, GREGORY BONE, DAVINA HARMAN, MANUEL ARCHILA, Andrew Robert Sparks, JEAN K MAHER, H.E. Mendez, Valerie Casey, Allison Mansell, DANIEL J. THIBODEAU, BENJAMIN J. WRIGHT, DARRELL LEWIS, Carey Kendig, Pete Briese, RONALD STILLMAN, CHRISTOPHER C. ADAMS, Sean Oates, RAUL LOPEZ, JR., MONICA MCDAVID, RICK POHL, DAVID R. AYERS, Katie L. Leavy, Mark D. Hudson, DONNA J. ASTLE, Denise Scislowicz, Charles Walsh, Gar Rodrigues, AnnMarie Hunter, SERG OCADIZ, Jamie G. England, Alissa M. Marrero, KEVIN FITCHETT, BRETT D. FOLSE, Lonnie Mejia, CANDYCE L. ROBERTS, FRED ASIEBU LARBI, KYLE RIESENBECK, Mario Telleria, Ishekia Farguharson, David Lilliment, BRUCE BACKOFEN, Graig Wilkins, JOSH MCKINNEY, RICHARD LONG, DANIEL B. KEMBLE, Debra J. Cross, CHRISTOPHER NOONAN, Alan King, Harold McClurg, Jason Richardson, MADISON ANNE MCWATTERS, Sam Jumaan, ELIE MOURAD, Marlana DeLeone, Eric Lindsay, Shauna L. Rooke-Meyer, MICHELLE EDWARDS, BRENT D. CONLEY, MICHAEL WILLIAMS, AMBER THOMPSON, Christopher Rueb, Tresa Matthews, CORY THOMPSON, RYAN BLAKE, Kevin MacGregor, Sheryl D. Ross, Stephen Moriarty, Brian Mathisen, Jennifer D. Smith, BRANDON DRAKE, NOELIA DOMINGUEZ, Jeremy M. Tate, Christopher F. Newton, DAVID P. WINTERS, Shane Magnan, Gerold B. Wilkie, Norman K. Swiger, Kendra M. Basten, David B. Batterman, TIM HUYGE, BRIAN SODER, RYAN TUCKER, Rebecca Nichols, TIMOTHY E. STIVERS, Kevin Placy, PAUL CHAUVIN, Kimberly Cusack, Amy Crookston, FRANCO PEDRAZA, DANNY JAMES, Dorien Brooker, DUEWA NIKEMA BATSON, AMANDA MCNEIL, Kevin Jozefowicz, Lester Bodie, III, James Croeber, FAKIR NUMAIRUADIN, Keehan Grant, Benjamin Pintor, DONNA WEEDER, GREGORY BLAKE, Ricardo Arevali, GEORGE DAWLI, Brian Kupisz, Stephen Huisman, Andrew K.M. Chan, ROBERTO LOPEZ, CHRISTINA ATHERTON, JESSE JOHNSON, JULIE DELUCA, DHAVAL Y. PUROHIT, DEREK COOLEY JACKSON, Michael Buck, JANE NAHAS, Christopher Berry, Neil Matheson, DARRELL C. LASSITER, JR., SAMUEL P. LYONS, Edward A. Strasburger, David Kuharski, PAMELA A. PATTERSON, Ronald Matthys, BRAD D. CARTER, TIM BREWER, Jeff Suder, Travis J. Smith, AMY CROOKSON, Michael Douglas Kovorich, Tom E. Waters, Brian Schochet, Nicholas P. Bongiorno, Ronald K. Brown, SCOTT WOOD, Willis Dent, Jr., ANN CARUOLO, Chris Jacobson, WARREN L. FREDERICKSON, PAULA CONDRY, Patrick Ciabattari, Eric Hurst, JEREMY BIGGS, Porter Jaushlin, Jaison L Petite, Jason Houle, MICHELLE BRISSON-SIMONE, VOKE UWAMU, LESLIE MURPHY, IV., RICHARD WEAVER, BRETT STONE, Matthew S Russell, Donald J. Ciriello, AMANDA MORGOIA, DAVID BROUSSEAU, MELISSA A. SMITH, BRENDA C. JONES, BRYAN MOORE, ELMINIO SOTO, DANIEL D. HASH, PAUL OSCI, Joshua Distel, Christopher Plath, DAN JAMES, Bryan G. Newsome, STEPHANIE ALBRIGHT, James A. Turner, MICHELLE HARDIN, KEVIN L. MILLER, RANDALL SMITH, CHRIS CRONK, JAMES H. THOMPSON, MICHAEL R. WRIGHT, BRIAN BRIGHT, MARK HOBGOOD, TIM BURGOYNE, JR., AMY LOUDERBACK, RIA SAVINO, STEVEN MANIEC, Kevin Fowle, David A. Brousseau, Cyndi L. Muirhead, Carl M. Johnson, Valerie A. Bako, Robert McCann, Steven P. Fisher, Brenda S. Stinnette, JEFFREY HIGGINS, John Politano, AMPIRO DELAGARZA SCHNORRBUSH, JOSE DIAZ, Kathi Blinco, MITCHELL R. MILLER, JEFFREY BENNETT, Charles Vohn Clifford, MICHAEL HUTTON, CHRISTOPHER A. RICKS, Steven L. Osterholz, Jason Monteressi, JOSH DROULLARD, JASON MEINDL, Karen Herman, JARRET SPENCE, CHRIS JOHNSON, REGINALD BELL, BRANKO BADURINA, MARCUS EDWARDS, MARTIN ROMANOW, Marsha Corellen, MICHAEL WHEELER, Steven D. Maniec, Hemrita Gauilanes, Eben Howard, DENNIS A. MARN, HEATHER SHELTON, LUIS S. PEREZ, Stephanie Pochonis, RANDY LEFEBURE, Deborah L Puckett, GILBERT MUNOZ, Justin D. Smith, Rodney O. Jefese, Eric Wendt, MARK A. ATKINSON, ANGELICA ALVARADO, GEORGE M. SLATER, LUIS A. BETANCE, Michelle Peterson, Bradley T. Hall, Lawrence Weatherbee, KEVIN CHENG, Kevin Merna, JAMES R. PAIGE, JR., Donnie Duncan, TARNOWSKI, ZAHID MOHAMMAD, RONALD GADDINI, Jacqueline Klahold, Shane Croye, JEANNA FOULKE, Karin Wellington, Jesse G. Walker, Annette Martinez, EUGENE HUNTER ANDERSON, Stephen M. Torowus, Jamy Belcher, IVAN GARRIS, QUINTIN ISRAEL ROY, BRAD OGDEN, MARK GOLDMAN, SAHIR ANAND, Todd Hensley, JOSHUA MAILLOUX, ROBERT C. MARTIN, Steven E Peel, NNETTE PARKER, Angelo Collins, JASON COWAN, Christoph Von Der Ahe, John Littley, Keith Keiser, Aaron Fitzgerald, Valerie Kay Nau, Donald B. Dierking, James Marden, BRIAN M. GERACI, Joseph D Ochettree, III, David Olinda, Jeffrey .R. Crusse, DAVID LESHNICK, JUDY G. RAYMOND, Kenneth B. Kohlmann, BRIAN M. CARUSO, Jeremy McCord, CHRISTOPHER MOLDEN, KIMBERLY A HARRIS, Richard A. Fratto, Richard Fahey, MICHAEL R. ARNWINE, Mary Kovacs, STEVEN R. YOUNGQUIST, DOUGLAS E. MATTHISON, JR., IRIS HAMILTON, BERTHA CARTWRIGHT, NATHAN HOURAMI, Ronald Glenn Hartley, DEBRA ROMANDY, CHRISTOPHER M. CARRIGAN, Kristin J. Hendersen, GABRIEL H KELLOGG, VALENTIN GONZALEZ, Mark A. Sinning, COLEEN RIDLEN, Joseph Kariuki, KEVIN BRYANT, BRADLEY A. RIVERA, MICHAEL KIRSCHBROWN, MANUEL A. ARCHILA, Curtis T. Brown, BRENT CONLEY, Tanya Pena, Dave Hurley, ALEXIS OERTING, VICKI WICKHAM, Eric S. Perry, McCarthy Reed Lewis, OFFICER MICHAEL PEREZ, N'GAI GEORGE, Steven K. Webb, Edward J. Carter, Matthew S. Helmers, Jolene Niederlitz, ROBERT COLFER, ANDREW THERIAULT, EVAN COHEN, JERRY HERRING, Emanuele Moretti, Chad Kemble, STEPHANIE M. HENDRICKSON, DARYL ATKINS, Shawn Hureau, Charles Arthur Nygaard, Daniel Piccolo, SCOTTIE R. MCDANIEL, KEVIN VARBLE, JAMES OGLES, Abel Espinoza, Nancy L. Griger, William R. Grasso, MICHAEL TROMAN, J. Robert Pand, BRYAN KAZES, RICHARD J. PHILLIPS, KAREN ROCHA, JOSE AGUIRRE, SHAWN CARTER, JASON LOFTIS, Jeff Gretous, Jason W. Rowe, Stacey L. Novak, HAMID BARADARVAR, Todd Greenstein, THOMAS PRITCHETT, VALERIE ROBINSON, Hunter Somerville, John Cray, CHAD R. LOCTINER, RANDALL MUELLER, MAJEEDATATUM ANDERSON, CHARLIE MILINER, ALLAN WINSLOW, RONALD HARTLEY, Vernon Readus, ROSE M. WHITE, Elick Cortez, LAWRENCE STEINBERG, GARY LOUGHMAN, COURTNEY M. HALL, Ryan A. Glasshagel, DANEL ALLEN, Christopher D. Outtette, J. DAVID GRAYBEAL, Catherine Birmingham, JONATHAN BOONE, EDMUNDO LOPEZ, MICHAEL MELE, VICTOR SPACHUK, ANTHONY E. EZENYI, Laura Pitagna, DARRELL GAINES, ROBERT METZGER, Michael D. Freeman, WILLIAM D. EDWARDS, John J. Ewasko, Kimberly D. Hughes, KELVIN WATKINS, KENT B. DOUGLAS, GERALD MANNING, Donna Weeden, MICHAEL S. ROSS, BRYAN K. YOUNGBLOOD, JR., DEANNA GUZMAN, CHRISTOPHER ROGERS, Cory Smith, NORMAN SWIGER, ANTHONY MCKIETHEN, CHRISTOPHER A. PERRY, BRIAN BACA, GARY BINGER, Ronald G. Schmale, BRET ASTELL, Michael Navalta, JUDITH GARRICK, EDWARD CARTER, Steve Rerdy, Rebecca Stoedter, JAMES THOMPSON and IVAN PIERANTONI
Defendant: STAPLES, INC., TONI C. LEONARD and Billie Jo Bronson
Receiver: Andres Calo, Jr.
Not Classified By Court: JOHN HUGHES
Case Number: 2:2007cv00849
Filed: February 21, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Passaic
Presiding Judge: Patty Shwartz
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2012 Filing 775 CERTIFIED ORDER of USCA in lieu of formal MANDATE as to #743 and #765 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by STAPLES, INC. (ca3smw)
December 21, 2011 Filing 774 STIPULATION Regarding Satisfaction of Judgment by STAPLES, INC.. (SARAVAY, ADAM)
December 20, 2011 Filing 773 Letter from Seth R. Lesser re #771 Order. (LESSER, SETH)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 771 LETTER ORDER directing the pltf. counsel to file a response to pltf. Ronald Stillman's letter dated 12/6/2011 no later than 12/28/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/8/2011. (nr, )
December 8, 2011 Filing 772 Letter from Ron Stillman regarding settlement (nr, )
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 770 ORDER of USCA as to #757 Notice of Appeal (USCA)filed by RONALD STILLMAN (ca3th, )
November 29, 2010 Filing 769 AMENDED BOND in the amount of $ 16,130.05 posted by STAPLES, INC. (nr, )
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 768 CONSENT ORDER approving modified supersedeas bond and staying final judgment pending appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/27/2010. (nr, )
October 27, 2010 Filing 767 Letter from Counsel for Staples. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Modifying Supersedeas Bond)(SARAVAY, ADAM)
November 17, 2009 Filing 765 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #764 Order on Motion for New Trial, #740 Judgment, #758 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by STAPLES, INC.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0312-2816566. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (MAYER, CHRISTOPHER)
November 16, 2009 Filing 766 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 6, 2009, before Judge Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services, Telephone number 973-237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2010. (ji, )
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER denying #738 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 11/06/2009. (nr, )
November 5, 2009 Filing 763 USCA Case Number 09-4072 for #757 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by RONALD STILLMAN. USCA Case Manager Stephanie/smw (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3smw)
October 28, 2009 Filing 762 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by STAPLES, INC. (MAYER, CHRISTOPHER)
October 27, 2009 Filing 761 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 21, 2009, before Judge Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services, Telephone number 973-237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/17/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2010. (ji, )
October 26, 2009 Filing 760 Transcript of Proceedings (Recorded Opinion) held on September 16, 2009, before Judge Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services, Telephone number 973-237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2010. (ji, )
October 26, 2009 Filing 759 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by RONALD STILLMAN (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LESSER, SETH)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER denying deft's #737 Motion for decertification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/21/2009. (nr, )
October 16, 2009 Filing 757 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #740 Judgment, by RONALD STILLMAN. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 03120000000002769733. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LESSER, SETH)
October 16, 2009 Filing 756 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN of Request to Withdraw Alexander E. Barnett as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LESSER, SETH)
October 14, 2009 Filing 755 USCA Case Number 09-3871 for #743 , Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by STAPLES, INC.. USCA Case Manager Stephanie W. (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3smw)
October 13, 2009 Filing 754 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re #737 MOTION Decertification of the Collective Action filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
October 13, 2009 Filing 753 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re #738 MOTION for New Trial (Fluctuating Workweek) MOTION for New Trial (Fluctuating Workweek) filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam N. Saravay (with Exhibit A), #2 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
October 9, 2009 Filing 752 BOND in the amount of $ 7,280,344.85 posted by STAPLES, INC. (nr, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER approving deft's proposed supersedeas bond and staying the judgment entered on 9/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/02/2009. (nr, )
October 5, 2009 Filing 750 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #737 MOTION Decertification of the Collective Action filed by RONALD STILLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(LESSER, SETH)
October 5, 2009 Filing 749 Letter from Seth R. Lesser re #748 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Proposed Order)(LESSER, SETH)
October 5, 2009 Filing 748 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #738 MOTION for New Trial (Fluctuating Workweek) MOTION for New Trial (Fluctuating Workweek) filed by RONALD STILLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Certification Seth R. Lesser, #2 Exhibit A to Lesser Certification, #3 Exhibit B to Lesser Certification, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(LESSER, SETH)
October 2, 2009 Filing 746 Letter from Defendant Staples, Inc. with authority supporting entry of Consent Order. (MAYER, CHRISTOPHER)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER on informal application denying pltfs' request for "clarification" as to the status of deft's motion;. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/01/2009. (nr, )
September 30, 2009 Filing 745 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel to the Hon Patti Shwartz seeking clarification as to status of motions. (LESSER, SETH)
September 30, 2009 Filing 744 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Order Approving Supersedeas Bond and Staying Final Judgment Pending Appeal)(MAYER, CHRISTOPHER)
September 30, 2009 Filing 743 NOTICE OF APPEAL by STAPLES, INC.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 03120000000002744833. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (MAYER, CHRISTOPHER)
September 30, 2009 Filing 742 NOTICE by GARY E MASON of Change of Firm Name and Address (MASON, GARY)
September 29, 2009 Filing 741 NOTICE by STAPLES, INC. OF REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ROBERT W. FISCHER, JR., ESQ., AND TODD M. SORRELL, ESQ., AS COUNSEL FOR STAPLES, INC. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
September 23, 2009 ***Civil Case Terminated. (mn, )
September 18, 2009 Filing 740 JUDGMENT for $4,611,100.41 in favor of pltfs. and against STAPLES, INC. inclusive of attorneys fees and costs; denying prejudgment interest; post judgment interest shall begin to run as of the date of judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 09/16/2009. (nr, )
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 739 ORDER granting pltf's #733 Motion for Attorney Fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 09/16/2009. (nr, )
September 14, 2009 Set Deadlines as to #737 MOTION Decertification of the Collective Action, #738 MOTION for New Trial (Fluctuating Workweek) MOTION for New Trial (Fluctuating Workweek). Motion set for 10/19/2009 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
September 14, 2009 Filing 738 MOTION for New Trial (Fluctuating Workweek) by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Adam N. Saravay, #3 Exhibits A-C to Saravay Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
September 14, 2009 Filing 737 MOTION Decertification of the Collective Action by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Adam N. Saravay, #3 Exhibits A-E to Declaration of Adam N. Saravay, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
September 11, 2009 Filing 736 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Richard L. Alfred to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
September 4, 2009 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number 200358176 re Richard L. Alfred (nr, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 735 ORDER granting #734 Motion for Richard I. Alfred to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 08/24/2009. (nr, )
August 14, 2009 Set Deadlines as to #734 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Richard L. Alfred, Esq.) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Richard L. Alfred, Esq.). Motion set for 9/21/2009 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
August 14, 2009 Filing 734 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Richard L. Alfred, Esq.) by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Bryan Cantrell, Esq., in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of Richard L. Alfred, Esq., in Support of His Pro Hac Vice Application, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
August 5, 2009 Set Deadlines as to #733 MOTION for Attorney Fees to Reactivate Plaintiffs' Motion for Fees and Expenses. Motion set for 9/8/2009 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
August 5, 2009 Filing 733 MOTION for Attorney Fees to Reactivate Plaintiffs' Motion for Fees and Expenses by RONALD STILLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth R Lesser In Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LESSER, SETH)
August 5, 2009 Filing 732 Letter from Plaintiffs counsel on consent seeking extension of deadline to reactivate attorneys fee motion re #725 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. (LESSER, SETH)
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ORDER on informal application tolling the FLSA claims for the period of May 14, 2009 through 9/9/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 07/30/2009. (nr, )
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 730 Order Appointing Mediator, JOHN HUGHES rep by JOHN J. HUGHES appointed. mediation will be completed by 7/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 05/28/2009. (nr, )
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 729 CONSENT ORDER terminating pltf's motion for fees and directing the parties to participate in the Court ordered mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 05/18/2009. (nr, )
May 18, 2009 Filing 726 Letter from Plaintiffs & Proposed Order re: attorney fees. (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER denying deft's motion for judgment notwithstanding the jury verdict, or in the alternative a motion for a new trial ; granting pltf's cross-motion for an award of liquidated damages; denying pltf's application for prejudgment interest. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 05/11/2009. (nr, )
May 15, 2009 Filing 727 OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 05/11/2009. (nr, )
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER terminating pltf's #713 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 05/14/2009. (nr, )
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER denying #706 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law not with standing the jury verdict or for new trial; granting #710 Motion for liquidated damages and denying application for prejudgment interest. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 05/11/2009. (nr, )
May 1, 2009 Filing 723 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel responding to Defendant's request to strike Plaintiffs' letter of April 30 re #722 Letter. (LESSER, SETH)
May 1, 2009 Filing 722 Letter from Staples, Inc. requesting Plaintiffs' Unauthorized Reply be Stricken re #720 Letter, #721 Letter. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
April 30, 2009 Filing 721 Letter from Letter from Plaintiffs' counsel to Judge Shwartz regarding Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' counsels' fee application and requesting defense counsel records [CORRECTED VERSION].. (LESSER, SETH)
April 30, 2009 Filing 720 Letter from Plaintiffs' counsel to Judge Shwartz regarding Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs' counsels' fee application and requesting defense counsel records. (LESSER, SETH)
April 27, 2009 Filing 719 BRIEF in Opposition re #713 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Cost Reimbursement filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam N. Saravay, #2 Exhibits to Saravay Decl., #3 Declaration of Peter O. Hughes, #4 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
April 23, 2009 Filing 718 Letter from Plaintiffs re: Plaintiffs' Request for Prejudgment Interest on the Unpaid Overtime Jury Awards re #711 Notice (Other). (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
April 20, 2009 Filing 717 Transcript of Proceedings (Jury Verdict) held on 2/19/08, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira Rubenstein, Telephone number (732) 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2009. (cs, )
April 20, 2009 Filing 716 Letter from Staples, Inc. re: Plaintiffs' Request for Pre-Judgment Interest re #711 Notice (Other). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
April 20, 2009 Filing 715 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by STAPLES, INC.. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
April 16, 2009 Filing 714 Transcript of Proceedings (Trial) held on 2/17/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Charles P. McGuire, Telephone number 215 840-7030. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/7/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2009. (mn, )
April 13, 2009 Set Deadlines as to #713 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Cost Reimbursement. Motion set for 5/18/2009 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
April 13, 2009 Filing 713 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Cost Reimbursement by RONALD STILLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #2 Certification of Seth Lesser, #3 Exhibit A to Lesser Certification, #4 Exhibit B to Lesser Certification (part 1), #5 Exhibit B to Lesser Certification (part 2), #6 Exhibit C to Lesser Certification, #7 Exhibit D through Exhibit I to Lesser Certification, #8 Certification of Michael Galpern, #9 Exhibit A to Galpern Certification, #10 Exhibit B to Galpern Certification (part 1), #11 Exhibit B to Galpern Certification (part 2), #12 Exhibit B to Galpern Certification (part 3), #13 Exhibit C to Galpern Certification, #14 Exhibit D to Galpern Certification, #15 Declaration of Gary Mason, #16 Exhibit A to Mason Declaration, #17 Exhibit B to Mason Declaration, #18 Exhibit C to Mason Declaration, #19 Declaration of Jeffrey Gottlieb, #20 Text of Proposed Order, #21 Certificate of Service)(LESSER, SETH)
April 6, 2009 Set Deadlines as to Motion set for 5/4/2009 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER on informal application granting request that the Court enter an order that embodies the deadlines set forth on the record on March 23, 2009; etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 04/03/2009. (nr, )
April 6, 2009 Filing 711 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN Letter from Plaintiffs re: Proposed Order of Judgment (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
April 6, 2009 Filing 710 Cross MOTION granting of liquidated damages and denial of Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law and for a new trial re #706 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Consolidated) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Consolidated) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Consolidated) on behalf of all Plaintiffs by RONALD STILLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Seth R Lesser in opposition to Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law and for new trial and in support of Plaintiffs' motion for liquidated damages, #2 Exhibit A to Lesser Certification, #3 Exhibit B to Lesser Certification, #4 Exhibit C to Lesser Certification, #5 Exhibit D to Lesser Certification, #6 Exhibit E to Lesser Certification, #7 Exhibit F to Lesser Certification, #8 Exhibit G to Lesser Certification, #9 Exhibit H to Lesser Certification, #10 Exhibit I to Lesser Certification, #11 Exhibit J to Lesser Certification, #12 Exhibit K to Lesser Certification, #13 Exhibit L to Lesser Certification, #14 Exhibit M to Lesser Certification, #15 Exhibit N to Lesser Certification, #16 Exhibit O to Lesser Certification, #17 Brief in opposition to Defendant's motion and in support of Plaintiffs' cross-motion, #18 Text of Proposed Order, #19 Certificate of Service)(LESSER, SETH)
April 3, 2009 Filing 709 Letter from Staples seeking Correction of Scheduling Order re #707 Order on Oral Motion,. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER on informal application setting a briefing schedule and directing deft. Staples to submit their motion no later than 3/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 03/18/2009. (nr, )
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER on informal application directing the pltfs. to submit their fee petition no later than 4/13/2009 which shall include redacted time records and receipt for expenses; and setting a response deadlines - signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 03/23/2009. (nr, )
March 23, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Status Conference held onthe record on 3/23/2009. (CD #S09-7.) (aa, )
March 23, 2009 Set Deadlines as to #706 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Consolidated) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Consolidated) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Consolidated). Motion set for 4/20/2009 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
March 23, 2009 Filing 706 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Consolidated) by STAPLES, INC.. Responses due by 4/6/2009 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Adam N. Saravay, #3 Exhibits 1-4 to Saravay Declaration, #4 Exhibits 5-7 (part a) to Saravay Declaration, #5 Exhibits 7 (part b)-10 to Saravay Declaration, #6 Exhibits 11-15 to Saravay Declaration, #7 Exhibits 16-23 to Saravay Declaration, #8 Exhibits 23-30 to Saravay Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 705 LETTER ORDER advising the parties that the issue concerning entitlement to liquidated damages shall be address as part of pltfs. response to deft's rule 50 motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 03/12/2009. (nr, )
March 17, 2009 Filing 704 Letter from Defendant on Behalf of All Parties Seeking Modification of Motion Schedule re #703 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 703 ORDER striking #696 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; striking #697 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; striking #698 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; A single motion and single brief complies with L.Civ.R 7.2 shall be submitted no later than 3/19/09; plainatiffs shall submit their brief in response to dft's motion and petition in support of their request for attys fees, if the fee issue is unresolved etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/16/09. (cs, )
March 16, 2009 Filing 702 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/8/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2009. (mn, )
March 16, 2009 Filing 701 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/14/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz.Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript Modified on 4/21/2009 (mn, ). (mn, ). Modified on 6/15/2009 (mn, ).
March 16, 2009 Filing 700 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/13/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript Modified on 4/21/2009 (mn, ). (mn, ). Modified on 6/15/2009 (mn, ).
March 16, 2009 Filing 699 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/12/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. Modified on 3/17/2009 (mn, ).
March 13, 2009 Filing 698 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (on the issue of Willfulness) by STAPLES, INC.. Responses due by 3/25/2009 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Adam N. Saravay, #3 Exhibits A-F to Saravay Decl., #4 Exhibits G-M to Saravay Decl., #5 Exhibits N-S to Saravay Decl., #6 Exhibit T (part 1) to Saravay Decl., #7 Exhibit T (part 2) to Saravay Decl., #8 Exhibits U-V to Saravay Decl., #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
March 13, 2009 Filing 697 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (relating to Representativeness) by STAPLES, INC.. Responses due by 3/25/2009 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Adam N. Saravay, #3 Exhibit A (part 1) to Saravay Decl., #4 Exhibit A (part 2) to Saravay Decl., #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
March 13, 2009 Filing 696 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Based on Issues Relating to Salaries of Non-Testifying Plaintiffs) by STAPLES, INC.. Responses due by 3/25/2009 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Adam N. Saravay, #3 Exhibit A to Saravay Decl., #4 Exhibit B to Saravay Decl., #5 Exhibit C to Saravay Decl., #6 Exhibit D to Saravay Decl., #7 Exhibit E to Saravay Decl., #8 Exhibit F to Saravay Decl., #9 Exhibit G (part 1) to Saravay Decl., #10 Exhibit G (part 2) to Saravay Decl., #11 Text of Proposed Order, #12 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
March 12, 2009 Filing 695 Letter from Michael A. Galpern. (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
March 5, 2009 **Please note** minute sheet dated 2/19/09 substituted to reflect verdict re: liability and corrected date. (aa, )
March 3, 2009 Filing 689 Letter from Plaintiffs -Proposed Order. (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 688 CORRECTED ORDER on informal application directing the parties to provide the defts. with the legal authority for the declaratory judgment no later than 3/3/2009 and setting a briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 02/27/2009. (nr, )
February 27, 2009 Filing 686 Letter from Plaintiffs counsel requesting amendment to scheduling order as per transcript exchange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of transcript pages)(LESSER, SETH)
February 25, 2009 Filing 683 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/20/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 25, 2009 Filing 682 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/19/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 24, 2009 Filing 677 Redaction of #671 Transcript (vol. 11) 1/28/2009. (mn, )
February 24, 2009 Filing 672 Transcript of Proceedings (volume 7) held on 1/21/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/17/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 24, 2009 Filing 671 Transcript of Proceedings (volume 11) held on 1/28/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/17/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 24, 2009 Filing 670 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by C. BRYAN CANTRELL re #646 Transcript,,, #666 Transcript,,, #652 Transcript,,, (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
February 23, 2009 Filing 687 Redaction of #666 Transcript of trial 1/29/2009. (mn, )
February 23, 2009 Filing 669 Transcript of Proceedings (trial) held on 2/18/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 23, 2009 Filing 668 Transcript of Proceedings (trial) held on 2/10/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 23, 2009 Filing 667 Transcript of Proceedings (trial) held on 2/6/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King transcription Services, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 23, 2009 Filing 666 Transcript of Proceedings (trial) held on 1/29/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER on informal application regarding entry of a declaratory judgment, an award of liquidated damages and attorneys fees; and setting a briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 02/20/2009. (nr, )
February 23, 2009 Filing 664 Transcript of Proceedings(trial) held on 1/27/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 22, 2009 Filing 663 Transcript of Proceedings (volume 18) held on 2/6/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 22, 2009 Filing 662 Transcript of Proceedings (volune 17) held on 2/5/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 22, 2009 Filing 661 Transcript of Proceedings (volume 16) held on 2/4/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 22, 2009 Filing 660 Transcript of Proceedings (volume 15) held on 2/3/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 22, 2009 Filing 659 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/2/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 22, 2009 Filing 658 Transcript of Proceedings (volume 13) held on 1/30/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 22, 2009 Filing 657 Transcript of Proceedings (volume 12) held on 1/29/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 22, 2009 Filing 656 Transcript of Proceedings (volume 10) held on 1/27/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 22, 2009 Filing 655 Transcript of Proceedings (volume 9) held on 1/26/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 22, 2009 Filing 654 Transcript of Proceedings (volume 8) held on 1/22/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 22, 2009 Filing 653 Transcript of Proceedings)(volume 6) held on 1/20/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ira N. Rubenstein, Telephone number 732 672-3356. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, )
February 20, 2009 Filing 676 Redaction of #652 Transcript of trial, 2/11/2009. (mn, )
February 20, 2009 Filing 694 Exhibit to #691 Jury Verdict. (aa, )
February 20, 2009 Filing 693 Jury Note 9 filed. (aa, )
February 20, 2009 Filing 692 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial completed on 2/20/2009. Jury note #9 filed. Damages amount read into the record. Ordered jury excused. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein.) (aa, )
February 20, 2009 Filing 652 Transcript of Proceedings (trial) held on 2/11/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Walter J. Perelli, Telephone number 973 645-2514. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2009. (mn, )
February 19, 2009 Filing 691 JURY VERDICT. (aa, ) (aa, ).
February 19, 2009 Filing 690 Jury Notes 4-8 filed. (aa, )
February 19, 2009 Filing 685 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 2/19/2009, Jury deliberations. Jury communications, 4,5,6,7 and 8 filed. Verdict regarding liability read into the record. Ordered trial with jury adjourned until 2/20/2009 09:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein.) (aa, ) Modified on 3/5/2009 (aa, ). (aa, ).
February 18, 2009 Filing 681 Jury Note 3. (aa, )
February 18, 2009 Filing 680 Jury Note 2. (aa, )
February 18, 2009 Filing 679 Jury Note 1. (aa, )
February 18, 2009 Filing 678 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 2/18/2009. Jury deliberations. Jury communication 1, 2 and 3 filed. Ordered trial with jury adjourned until 2/19/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein/CD# S09-4) (aa, )
February 17, 2009 Filing 675 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 2/17/2009, Ordered trial with Jury adjourned until 2/18/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Chuck McGuire) (aa, )
February 17, 2009 Filing 649 Transcript of Proceedings(vol. 19) held on 2/9/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis T. Lewis, Telephone number 732 735-4522. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/10/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2009. (mn, )
February 16, 2009 Filing 684 Redaction of #646 Transcript of trial, (Audio-Recorded Portions Only) 1/20/2009 (mn, )
February 16, 2009 Filing 648 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/22/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2009. (mn, )
February 16, 2009 Filing 647 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/21/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2009. (mn, )
February 16, 2009 Filing 646 Transcript of Proceedings (audio recorded portions only) held on 1/20/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2009. (mn, )
February 16, 2009 Filing 645 Transcript of Proceedings(trial) held on 1/15/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2009. (mn, )
February 16, 2009 Filing 644 Transcript of Proceedings (trial) held on 1/14/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcript, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2009. (mn, )
February 16, 2009 Filing 643 Transcript of Proceedings(trial) held on 1/13/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2009. (mn, )
February 16, 2009 Filing 642 Transcript of Proceedings(trial) held on 1/12/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2009. (mn, )
February 13, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on the record on 2/13/2009. (CD #S09-4.) (aa, )
February 11, 2009 Filing 674 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 2/11/2009, Jury trial adjourned until 2/17/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Walter Perelli.) (aa, )
February 10, 2009 Filing 673 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 2/10/2009. Trial with jury adjourned until 2/11/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Yvonne Davion CD # S09-4) (aa, )
February 10, 2009 Filing 641 Letter from Staples, Inc. re: Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Case. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
February 9, 2009 Filing 651 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 2/9/2009. Trial with jury adjourned until 2/10/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Phyllis Lewis) (aa, )
February 6, 2009 Filing 650 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 2/6/2009. Ordered trial w/jury adjourned until 2/9/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein/CD # S09-3.) (aa, )
February 6, 2009 Filing 636 Letter from Defendants Seeking Remedy for Plaintiffs' Discovery Violations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
February 5, 2009 Filing 640 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 2/5/2009. Ordered trial with jury adjourned until 2/6/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein.) (aa, )
February 4, 2009 Filing 639 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 2/4/2009. Ordered trial with jury adjourned until 2/5/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein.) (aa, )
February 3, 2009 Filing 638 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 2/3/2009. Ordered trial with jury adjourned until 2/4/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein.) (aa, )
February 3, 2009 Filing 635 Transcript of Proceedings(volume 5) held on 1/16/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis T. Lewis, Telephone number 732 735-4522. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/24/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2009. (mn, )
February 3, 2009 Filing 634 Transcript of Proceedings (afternoon session) held on 1/14/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis T. Lewis, Telephone number 732 735-4522. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/24/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2009. (mn, )
February 3, 2009 Filing 633 Transcript of Proceedings (excerpt opening statement) held on 1/14/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis T. Lewis, Telephone number 732 735-4522. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/24/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2009. (mn, )
February 2, 2009 Filing 637 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 2/2/2009. Ordered trial with jury adjourned until 2/3/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein.) (aa, ) (aa, ).
January 30, 2009 Filing 632 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 1/30/2009, Ordered jury trial adjourned until 2/2/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein.) (aa, )
January 29, 2009 Filing 631 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 1/29/2009, Ordered trial w/jury adjourned until 1/30/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein/CD #S09-3.) (aa, )
January 28, 2009 Filing 630 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 1/28/2009, Ordered trial with jury adjourned until 1/29/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein.) (aa, )
January 27, 2009 Filing 629 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 1/27/2009, Ordered trial with jury adjourned until 1/28/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein/ CD #S09-3) (aa, )
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER granting #615 Motion to Seal Exhibit B to pltf's letter filed on 1/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 01/22/2009. (nr, )
January 26, 2009 Filing 628 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 1/26/2009. Ordered trial with jury adjourned until 1/27/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein (aa, ) (aa, ).
January 22, 2009 Filing 626 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 1/22/2009. Ordered trial with jury adjourned at 4:45 p.m. until 1/26/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein Court Recorder S09-3) (aa, )
January 22, 2009 Filing 621 Transcript of Proceedings (afternoon session) held on 1/15/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jacqueline Kashmer, Telephone number 908 229-6496. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2009. (mn, )
January 22, 2009 Filing 620 Transcript of Proceedings (morning session) held on 1/15/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jacqueline Kashmer, Telephone number 908 229-6496. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2009. (mn, )
January 21, 2009 Filing 625 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 1/21/2009. Ordered adjourned at 4:00 p.m. until 1/22/2009 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein/ CD S09-3) (aa, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 624 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 1/20/2009. Ordered trial with jury adjourned at 4:00 p.m. until 1/21/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter/Recorder Ira Rubenstein.) (aa, )
January 20, 2009 Set Deadlines as to #615 MOTION to Seal Document #611 Letter, Certification of Michael A. Galpern, Proposed Order and Certification of Service. Motion set for 2/17/2009 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 615 MOTION to Seal Document #611 Letter, Certification of Michael A. Galpern, Proposed Order and Certification of Service by RONALD STILLMAN. (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
January 16, 2009 Filing 623 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 1/16/2009. Ordered trial with jury adjourned at 4:00 p.m. until 1/20/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Phyllis Lewis.) (aa, )
January 15, 2009 Filing 619 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial held on 1/15/2009. Ordered trial with jury adjourned at 4:35 pm until 1/16/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Jackie Kashmer)(Recorder CD# S09-2) (aa, )
January 14, 2009 Filing 622 Transcript of Proceedings (Opinion)(volume I) held on 1/8/2009, before Judge Patty Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription, Telephone number 973 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2009. (mn, )
January 14, 2009 Filing 618 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial/Jury Selection held on 1/14/2009, Ordered trial with Jury adjourned at 4:00 p.m. until January 1/15/2009 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein/Phyllis Lewis. CD # S09-1) (aa, )
January 14, 2009 Filing 613 Letter from Plaintiffs Counsel re Precluing Defendant from calling Mr Stillman at trial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Letter, #2 Exhibit B to Letter, #3 Exhibit C to Letter, #4 Exhibit D to Letter)(LESSER, SETH)
January 13, 2009 Filing 617 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial/Jury Selection continued on 1/13/2009, Jury selection adjourned until 1/14/2009 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (Court Reporter Ira Rubenstein/Recorder CD S09-1) (aa, )
January 13, 2009 Filing 611 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Request Exclusion of Documents and Testimony Relating to Plaintiff Ronald Stillman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E - Part 1, #6 Exhibit E - Part 2)(GALPERN, MICHAEL)
January 13, 2009 Filing 610 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Requesting Exlusion of Certain Evidence Relating to Plaintiffs Shannan McCausland and Darrell Gaines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(GALPERN, MICHAEL)
January 13, 2009 Filing 609 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Seeking Exclusion of Certain Evidence Relating to Plaintiff Brian Baca. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(GALPERN, MICHAEL)
January 12, 2009 Filing 616 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Jury Trial/Voir Dire/Jury Selection begun on 1/12/2009. Jury selection adjourned until 1/13/09 at 9:30 a.m. (Court Reporter/Recorder Ira Rubenstein.) (aa, )
January 11, 2009 Filing 608 Letter from Plaintiffs' counsel responding to Staples' objection to admission of Wood deposition re #601 Notice (Other). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript pages from Wood deposition)(LESSER, SETH)
January 9, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on the record on 1/9/2009. (CD #S09-1.) (aa, )
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER dismissing w/out prejudice pltfs. Aguirre, Alvarenga Asiedu-Larbi, Atkins, Baker, Baradarvar, Beddingfield, Jr., Bennett, Betance, Blake, Bland, Bronson, Brooks, Camus, Cartwright, Caruolo, Chambers, Condry, Conley, Cronk, Deluca, Dominguez, Douglas, Dyer, Forbes, Garris, Goldman, Guzman, Haislip, Halasz, Henry, Houram, Huyge, Jackson, Johnson, Kazes, Kirschbrown,Klemash, Leonard, Leshnick, Lofts, Long, Lopez, Lopez, Malloux, Manzo, Marn, McDaniel, McKeiethen, McNeill, McWatters, Meindl, Moore, Mueller, Munoz, Noonan, Nora, Numairudin, Ocadiz, Ogden, Pagliuca, Paige Jr., Pedraza, Pedraza, Perry, Phillips, Pohl, Real, Ridlen, Rivera, Robinson, Rocha, Smith, Spachuk,Spence, Stewart, Surdo, Thompson, Treon, Tucker, Uwamu, Walsh, Walton, Weaver, Webb, Welch, Whitton, Wickham, Williams, Winslow & Womack. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 01/07/2009. (nr, )
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER ON INFORMAL APPLICATION denying application to adjourn the trial, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 1/9/09. (aa, )
January 9, 2009 Filing 606 Letter from Defendant re: Plaintiffs' Opening Statement. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
January 9, 2009 Filing 605 Letter from Michael A. Galpern. (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
January 9, 2009 Filing 604 Letter from Counsel for Staples, Inc., responding to Plaintiffs' Letter Request re #602 Letter. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER ON INFORMAL APPLICATION denying plaintiff's application re: depositions, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 1/8/09. (aa, )
January 8, 2009 Filing 602 Letter from Plaintiffs' counsel seeking adjournment and other relief as discovery sanction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit copy of email from Mr Sorrell to Mr Galpern)(LESSER, SETH)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER on informal application denying pltfs. request that the Court reconsider its oral directive that the parties make no reference to the California litigation during openings and to seek permission for the Court before making reference to the California case, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 01/06/2009. (nr, )
January 6, 2009 Filing 601 NOTICE by STAPLES, INC. of Objection to Admission of Deposition of Scott Wood (SARAVAY, ADAM)
January 6, 2009 Filing 600 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/19/08, before Judge Shwartz. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services, Telephone number (973) 237-6080. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2009. (cs, )
January 5, 2009 Filing 599 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant containing parties' submissions of verdict forms and damage calculation example. (LESSER, SETH)
January 5, 2009 Filing 598 Letter from Michael A. Galpern. (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
December 30, 2008 Filing 597 Letter from Michael A. Galpern. (Attachments: #1 Index A)(GALPERN, MICHAEL)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER on informal application regarding deposition of Scott Wood and production of documents, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/29/2008. (nr, )
December 29, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on the record on 12/29/2008. (CD #S08-28.) (aa, )
December 29, 2008 Filing 595 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Use of Depositions at Trial by STAPLES, INC.. (SARAVAY, ADAM)
December 29, 2008 Filing 594 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Testimony by Videoconference by STAPLES, INC.. (SARAVAY, ADAM)
December 28, 2008 Filing 593 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel to Judge Shwartz re additional authority concerning FLSA interpretation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Morgan v Family Dollar 11th Circuit decision)(LESSER, SETH)
December 23, 2008 Filing 592 NOTICE by Steven D. Maniec, Curtis T. Brown, Leroy J. Troxell, Jr, Tommy L. McCall, Michael D. Freeman, JOHN T. GARLAND, MICHELLE HARDIN, Stephanie Pochonis, Aaron Fitzgerald, ROBERT METZGER, Christopher D. Outtette, Ronald Glenn Hartley, JOANNE R. ZIPPRIAN, Jason Motta, JAMES J. MURRAY, Mary Kovacs, Catherine Birmingham, RAUL ALDARONDO, Shane Croye, Alison H. Rubin, Katie L. Leavy, Chris Jacobson, Mark A. Sinning, ELIE MOURAD, Christopher Berry, Kathi Blinco, John Cray, DIANA DENNIS, MICHELLE EDWARDS, Richard Fahey, Hershane Jones, CHRIS KURN, RANDY LEFEBURE, James Marden, Tresa Matthews, Stephen Moriarty, William Nash, Carl Popovich, Oliver Rerd, Gar Rodrigues, Lawrence Weatherbee, Eric Wendt, SAMUEL P. LYONS, TIMOTHY E. STIVERS, BRIAN M. GERACI, JOSE AGUIRRE, AMPIRO DELAGARZA SCHNORRBUSH, PAMELA A. PATTERSON, Richard A. Fratto, GEORGE DAWLI, Alissa M. Marrero, Larry Lichtefeld, LaVern J. Wilson, NURYA ALVARENGA, Matthew D. Heinly, BRYAN K. YOUNGBLOOD, JR., RONALD GADDINI, J. Robert Pand, Chris Linden, BRANKO BADURINA, AMANDA MCNEIL, Steven P. Fisher, ANTHONY E. EZENYI, Donald J. Ciriello, Pete Briese, Willis Dent, Jr, DUEWA NIKEMA BATSON, Jamie G. England, John J. Ewasko, Justin Hallstein, Robert McCann, Joseph D Ochettree, III, David Porter, JEREMY BIGGS, Edward A. Strasburger, Tom E. Waters, VALENTIN GONZALEZ, Jason Monteressi, Brian Kupisz, Louis Stines, JEFFREY BENNETT, Annette Martinez, David Kuharski, Jaison L Petite, SHAWN CARTER, Justin D. Smith, Eric McAfee, GREGORY BLAKE, Steven E Peel, Porter Jaushlin, Garrett Murawski, Jesse G. Walker, EUGENE HUNTER ANDERSON, Sheryl D. Ross, JOSEPH PUCCIO, MATTHEW BROOKS, Rob Swanger, MAJEEDATATUM ANDERSON, Alan King, Tanya Pena, Nancy L. Griger, Kimberly Cusack, DAVID BROUSSEAU, Kevin Merna, Karen Herman, John Politano, Carl M. Johnson, Greg G. Mauch, Michelle Peterson, BRIAN BACA, Jolene Niederlitz, Geoff Niederlitz, Valerie A. Bako, Wilfred M. Johnson, CHAD R. LOCTINER, Mark D. Hudson, Kristin J. Hendersen, Debra J. Cross, Christopher Rueb, ANGELICA ALVARADO, TIM BURGOYNE, JR., CHARLIE MILINER, Karin Wellington, Brian Schochet, Jeffrey Michael, David Michael Weinstein, Jason Richardson, Brian Mathisen, John Littley, William R. Grasso, Michael Buck, Blyeshia D. Kemp, Cyndi L. Muirhead, Charles Arthur Nygaard, Kendra M. Basten, BRENT CONLEY, Christopher Plath, Kathleen Breitenwischer, Nicholas P. Bongiorno, Andres Calo, Jr., Jason T. Ransom, THOMAS DYER, Joseph Kariuki, HEATHER ANN LARNEY, GREGORY F. BLAKE, MICHAEL R. ARNWINE, JEREMY ANDERSON, Andrew Robert Sparks, Christopher R. Wagner, MARK GHIRARDUZZI, Mario Telleria, Robert J. Gallo, ROSE M. WHITE, BRAD D. CARTER, AnnMarie Hunter, Donald B. Dierking, FRED ASIEBU LARBI, Jeff Goldberg, Nicole Mazurkiewicz, MICHAEL R. WRIGHT, Norman K. Swiger, Stephen M. Torowus, Denise Scislowicz, H.E. Mendez, DARRELL GAINES, Angelo Collins, MICHAEL TROMAN, James Croeber, JOSH DROULLARD, Steve Rerdy, Todd Hensley, BERTHA CARTWRIGHT, DANIEL DELUCA, Brenda S. Stinnette, MICHAEL PEREZ, CHRISTOPHER A. RICKS, Patrick Ciabattari, Jason W. Rowe, Christoph Von Der Ahe, Joshua Sharninghouse, Lennie Trocard, DOUGLAS E. MATTHISON, JR., Jeremy McCord, MICHAEL S. ROSS, CHRISTINA ATHERTON, JUDITH GARRICK, KIMBERLY A HARRIS, DEBORAH SAUNDERS, GABRIEL H KELLOGG, IVAN PIERANTONI, ALEXIS OERTING, JEAN K MAHER, DANIEL B. KEMBLE, CHRISSY HAYFORD, MARK A. ATKINSON, BRANDON PALMER, DARRELL C. LASSITER, JR, MICHAEL HUTTON, DEANNA GUZMAN, COURTNEY M. HALL, MARLANA DELEONE, NNETTE PARKER, MICHELE TOWNSEND, AMY LOUDERBACK, MARTIN ROMANOW, JOSE CASTRO, STEPHANIE ALBRIGHT, DANNY JAMES, DARRELL LEWIS, JERRY HERRING, HEATHER SHELTON, ROBERT COLFER, EDWARD HALL, TARNOWSKI, DAVID P. WINTERS, Alan Michaud, Jignes A. Jain, Shawn Hureau, Amy Crookston, STEVEN MANIEC, Benjamin Pintor, Kenneth B. Kohlmann, Eric Hurst, Graig Wilkins, Keith Keiser, JOSH MCKINNEY, Michael Navalta, Shauna L. Rooke-Meyer, Lester Bodie, III, Johnny Wing, BRET ASTELL, MANUEL ARCHILA, ZAHID MOHAMMAD, McCarthy Reed Lewis, Bradley T. Hall, Bryan G. Newsome, Carey Kendig, KYLE RIESENBECK, David B. Batterman, Hemrita Gauilanes, Todd Greenstein, Joseph A. O'Brien, Jr, JAMES THOMPSON, DAVID ELLIOTT, Kenley Diaz, Jeff Gretous, JAMES BEDDINGFIELD, Kevin Jozefowicz, Jason Stockdale, Travis J. Smith, Steven K. Webb, Steven L. Osterholz, Curtis McPherson, Milton R. Baker, Jr, Kevin Fowle, Eben Howard, JOSE DIAZ, Ronald G. Schmale, THOMAS PRITCHETT, LESTER PARADA, Paul Szymanski, Kevin Placy, ANN CARUOLO, Valerie Kay Nau, BRANDON DRAKE, Matthew S. Helmers, Chad Kemble, MICHELLE BRISSON-SIMONE, FREDERICK NADDEO, DONNA J. ASTLE, Ronald K. Brown, Lonnie Mejia, Jennifer D. Smith, BRETT D. FOLSE, Sam Forrester, SAHIR ANAND, Billie Jo Bronson, WILLIAM D. EDWARDS, EDWARD RODRIGUEZ, Kimberly D. Hughes, Daniel Polaski, Vernon Readus, Rebecca Stoedter, Keehan Grant, MOHAMED SAMB, April B. Parchision, Louis A. Viola, Ronald Matthys, Jacqueline Klahold, Stacey L. Novak, Kelli Maze, Ryan A. Glasshagel, GERALD MANNING, Allison Mansell, Laterfah Smith, Eric S. Perry, Sabina Rusznak, Christopher F. Newton, Anthony Richardson, Craig S. Phillips, Kevin MacGregor, Cory Smith, Hunter Somerville, JOSE BUCKLES, Charles Vohn Clifford, Dave Hurley, William Rooney, Julie Seltz, Shane Magnan, DAVID R. AYERS, Jason Houle, Heleeda Ellis, Chandra L. Griffin, Rodney O. Jefese, Donna Weeden, Joshua Distel, Calvin Thomas, Abel Espinoza, David Lilliment, Mauricio Merizalde, David Olinda, Chris Wolff, Marsha Corellen, JASON COWAN, Gerald T. Reichett, Jamy Belcher, Jeremy M. Tate, Jeffrey.R. Crusse, JESSE JOHNSON, Rebecca Nichols, James A. Turner, Emanuele Moretti, MANUEL A. ARCHILA, Eric Nordlind, WARREN L. FREDERICKSON, TIM BREWER, Ray Tejada, Andrew K.M. Chan, QUINTIN ISRAEL ROY, Edward J. Carter, David A. Brousseau, AMANDA MORGOIA, Gerold B. Wilkie, Jeff Suder, Valerie Casey, Mark DiMauro, Matthew Douthilt, Ishekia Farguharson, Daniel D. Hash, Fred J. Overing, RIA SAVINO, MARK HOBGOOD, Eric Lindsay, Sam Jumaan, Laura Pitagna, Ria Savino, Harold McClurg, Deborah L Puckett, Ricardo Arevali, RYAN BLAKE, Stephen Huisman, Corey Larkins, Herbert Daye, Elick Cortez, Shawn Clinton, Sean Oates, Jerome Gray, Michael Douglas Kovorich, Hardat Pariag, BRIAN M. CARUSO, Daniel Piccolo, Dorien Brooker, Neil Matheson, Zahid Mohammad, Donnie Duncan, BRENT D. CONLEY, KENT B. DOUGLAS, CHRIS JOHNSON, DANIEL BJORAKER, PAULA CONDRY, KIMBERLY J. COOPER, KEVIN FITCHETT, JEANNA FOULKE, IVAN GARRIS, MARK GOLDMAN, MICHAEL D. HALASZ, CHRISTOPHER C. ADAMS, HAMID BARADARVAR, DAN JAMES, SANDEEP KANWAL, DARRELL C. LASSITER, JR., TONI C. LEONARD, JASON LOFTIS, RICHARD LONG, JEAN K. MAHER, JAMES R. MATSUOKA, SHANNAN E. MCCAUSLAND, SCOTTIE R. MCDANIEL, BRIAN E. MCNEILL, CHRISTOPHER MOLDEN, RONALD STILLMAN, MICHAEL MOREA, MARC MORGAN, GILBERT MUNOZ, LESLIE MURPHY, IV., DEREK COOLEY JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER NOONAN, SERG OCADIZ, BRAD OGDEN, CRAIG PAGLIUCA, FRANCO PEDRAZA, DHAVAL Y. PUROHIT, RICK POHL, FRANCISCO J. REAL, BRADLEY A. RIVERA, ANDREW THERIAULT, AMBER THOMPSON, JAMES H. THOMPSON, NANCY TREON, JEREMIAH UNDERHILL, DANIEL J. THIBODEAU, JON M. WALTON, RICHARD WEAVER, DONNA WEEDER, SHAWN K. WELCH, MICHAEL WHEELER, AL WHITTON, MICHAEL WILLIAMS, TERRY WOMACK, CHRISTOPHER A. PERRY, BRIAN SODER, CHRISTOPHER M. CARRIGAN, JOSHUA MAILLOUX, BRYAN MOORE, COLSTON STEWART, IV., VICTORIA TOMLINSON, EDWARD CAMUS, PAUL CHAUVIN, EVAN COHEN, NOELIA DOMINGUEZ, N'GAI GEORGE, J. DAVID GRAYBEAL, TIM HUYGE, BRENDA C. JONES, STEPHEN KLEMASH, JANE NAHAS, JAMES R. PAIGE, JR., RAMON PEDRAZA, VICKI WICKHAM, GERALD B. WILKIE, JR., KELVIN WATKINS, BRIAN BRIGHT, KEVIN BRYANT, CRAIG R. EDWARDS, NATHAN HOURAMI, MICHAEL KIRSCHBROWN, EDMUNDO LOPEZ, RAUL LOPEZ, JR., RICHARD J. PHILLIPS, KAREN ROCHA, RYAN TUCKER, STEVEN R. YOUNGQUIST, BRETT STONE, JEFFREY BLAND, PAUL MANZO, JASON MEINDL, IRIS HAMILTON, JONATHAN BOONE, CHRISTOPHER SURDO, RANDALL SMITH, NORMAN SWIGER, BRUCE BACKOFEN, RONALD HARTLEY, JAMES OGLES, MONICA MCDAVID, ALLAN WINSLOW, SCOTT WOOD, JEFFREY CIOTTI, GARY LOUGHMAN, MELISSA A. SMITH, HERBERT DAYE, JULIE DELUCA, DUSTIN FORBES, KEVIN CHENG, AMY CROOKSON, VALERIE ROBINSON, VOKE UWAMU, ROBERTO LOPEZ, DENNIS A. MARN, RANDALL MUELLER, CHRIS CRONK, HERSHANE JONES, ANTHONY MCKIETHEN, PHILIP ANDREOTTI, RAY YACOUBY, DANIEL D. HASH, KEVIN VARBLE, VICTOR SPACHUK, LUIS A. BETANCE, DAVID LESHNICK, AMBER WEBB, FAKIR NUMAIRUADIN, NICOLE MAZURKIEWICZ, IVAN PIERANTONI, JASON MOTTA, EDWARD CARTER, MADISON ANNE MCWATTERS, GREGORY BONE, BRYAN KAZES, JARRET SPENCE, COLEEN RIDLEN, CHRISTOPHER AGOSTINO, Marlana DeLeone, Roger A. Chambers, Matthew S Russell, Charles Walsh, ISIAH NORA, DARYL ATKINS, Arthur Lee Haislip, IV., MICHAEL DAVID HENRY, ELMINIO SOTO, DANEL ALLEN, REGINALD BELL, GARY BINGER, MARCUS EDWARDS, DAVID P. ESTES, RALPH E. GAUDETTE, III, DAVINA HARMAN, STEPHANIE M. HENDRICKSON, JEFFREY HIGGINS, ROBERT C. MARTIN, MICHAEL MELE, KEVIN L. MILLER, MITCHELL R. MILLER, SHAUN N. MILLER, PAUL OSCI, LUIS S. PEREZ, JUDY G. RAYMOND, CANDYCE L. ROBERTS, CHRISTOPHER ROGERS, DEBRA ROMANDY, GEORGE M. SLATER, LAWRENCE STEINBERG, CORY THOMPSON, BENJAMIN J. WRIGHT, CRYSTAL WYMAN Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's Depositions Counter-Desginations (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
December 23, 2008 Filing 591 NOTICE by STAPLES, INC. of Objections to Plaintiffs' Counter-Designations of Deposition Testimony (SARAVAY, ADAM)
December 22, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on the record on 12/22/2008. (CD #S08-28.) (aa, )
December 22, 2008 Filing 590 NOTICE by STAPLES, INC. of Case-in-Chief Trial Witnesses (SARAVAY, ADAM)
December 22, 2008 Filing 589 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN of Plaintiffs' Case-in-Chief Trial Witness List (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LESSER, SETH)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER on informal application regarding discovery, Telephone Conference set for 12/22/2008 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.; jury selection shall commence on 1/12/2009 at 9:30a.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/19/2008. (nr, )
December 22, 2008 Filing 586 TRIAL BRIEF Re: Concept of live Video Conferencing as a way to present certain out-of-state witness' testimony by Steven D. Maniec, Curtis T. Brown, Leroy J. Troxell, Jr, Tommy L. McCall, Michael D. Freeman, JOHN T. GARLAND, MICHELLE HARDIN, Stephanie Pochonis, Aaron Fitzgerald, ROBERT METZGER, Christopher D. Outtette, Ronald Glenn Hartley, JOANNE R. ZIPPRIAN, Jason Motta, JAMES J. MURRAY, Mary Kovacs, Catherine Birmingham, RAUL ALDARONDO, Shane Croye, Alison H. Rubin, Katie L. Leavy, Chris Jacobson, Mark A. Sinning, ELIE MOURAD, Christopher Berry, Kathi Blinco, John Cray, DIANA DENNIS, MICHELLE EDWARDS, Richard Fahey, Hershane Jones, CHRIS KURN, RANDY LEFEBURE, James Marden, Tresa Matthews, Stephen Moriarty, William Nash, Carl Popovich, Oliver Rerd, Gar Rodrigues, Lawrence Weatherbee, Eric Wendt, SAMUEL P. LYONS, TIMOTHY E. STIVERS, BRIAN M. GERACI, JOSE AGUIRRE, AMPIRO DELAGARZA SCHNORRBUSH, PAMELA A. PATTERSON, Richard A. Fratto, GEORGE DAWLI, Alissa M. Marrero, Larry Lichtefeld, LaVern J. Wilson, NURYA ALVARENGA, Matthew D. Heinly, BRYAN K. YOUNGBLOOD, JR., RONALD GADDINI, J. Robert Pand, Chris Linden, BRANKO BADURINA, AMANDA MCNEIL, Steven P. Fisher, ANTHONY E. EZENYI, Donald J. Ciriello, Pete Briese, Willis Dent, Jr, DUEWA NIKEMA BATSON, Jamie G. England, John J. Ewasko, Justin Hallstein, Robert McCann, Joseph D Ochettree, III, David Porter, JEREMY BIGGS, Edward A. Strasburger, Tom E. Waters, VALENTIN GONZALEZ, Jason Monteressi, Brian Kupisz, Louis Stines, JEFFREY BENNETT, Annette Martinez, David Kuharski, Jaison L Petite, SHAWN CARTER, Justin D. Smith, Eric McAfee, GREGORY BLAKE, Steven E Peel, Porter Jaushlin, Garrett Murawski, Jesse G. Walker, EUGENE HUNTER ANDERSON, Sheryl D. Ross, JOSEPH PUCCIO, MATTHEW BROOKS, Rob Swanger, MAJEEDATATUM ANDERSON, Alan King, Tanya Pena, Nancy L. Griger, Kimberly Cusack, DAVID BROUSSEAU, Kevin Merna, Karen Herman, John Politano, Carl M. Johnson, Greg G. Mauch, Michelle Peterson, BRIAN BACA, Jolene Niederlitz, Geoff Niederlitz, Valerie A. Bako, Wilfred M. Johnson, CHAD R. LOCTINER, Mark D. Hudson, Kristin J. Hendersen, Debra J. Cross, Christopher Rueb, ANGELICA ALVARADO, TIM BURGOYNE, JR., CHARLIE MILINER, Karin Wellington, Brian Schochet, Jeffrey Michael, David Michael Weinstein, Jason Richardson, Brian Mathisen, John Littley, William R. Grasso, Michael Buck, Blyeshia D. Kemp, Cyndi L. Muirhead, Charles Arthur Nygaard, Kendra M. Basten, BRENT CONLEY, Christopher Plath, Kathleen Breitenwischer, Nicholas P. Bongiorno, Jason T. Ransom, THOMAS DYER, Joseph Kariuki, HEATHER ANN LARNEY, GREGORY F. BLAKE, MICHAEL R. ARNWINE, JEREMY ANDERSON, Andrew Robert Sparks, Christopher R. Wagner, MARK GHIRARDUZZI, Mario Telleria, Robert J. Gallo, ROSE M. WHITE, BRAD D. CARTER, AnnMarie Hunter, Donald B. Dierking, FRED ASIEBU LARBI, Jeff Goldberg, Nicole Mazurkiewicz, MICHAEL R. WRIGHT, Norman K. Swiger, Stephen M. Torowus, Denise Scislowicz, H.E. Mendez, DARRELL GAINES, Angelo Collins, MICHAEL TROMAN, James Croeber, JOSH DROULLARD, Steve Rerdy, Todd Hensley, BERTHA CARTWRIGHT, DANIEL DELUCA, Brenda S. Stinnette, MICHAEL PEREZ, CHRISTOPHER A. RICKS, Patrick Ciabattari, Jason W. Rowe, Christoph Von Der Ahe, Joshua Sharninghouse, Lennie Trocard, DOUGLAS E. MATTHISON, JR., Jeremy McCord, MICHAEL S. ROSS, CHRISTINA ATHERTON, JUDITH GARRICK, KIMBERLY A HARRIS, DEBORAH SAUNDERS, GABRIEL H KELLOGG, IVAN PIERANTONI, ALEXIS OERTING, JEAN K MAHER, DANIEL B. KEMBLE, CHRISSY HAYFORD, MARK A. ATKINSON, BRANDON PALMER, DARRELL C. LASSITER, JR, MICHAEL HUTTON, DEANNA GUZMAN, COURTNEY M. HALL, MARLANA DELEONE, NNETTE PARKER, MICHELE TOWNSEND, AMY LOUDERBACK, MARTIN ROMANOW, JOSE CASTRO, STEPHANIE ALBRIGHT, DANNY JAMES, DARRELL LEWIS, JERRY HERRING, HEATHER SHELTON, ROBERT COLFER, EDWARD HALL, TARNOWSKI, DAVID P. WINTERS, Alan Michaud, Jignes A. Jain, Shawn Hureau, Amy Crookston, STEVEN MANIEC, Benjamin Pintor, Kenneth B. Kohlmann, Eric Hurst, Graig Wilkins, Keith Keiser, JOSH MCKINNEY, Michael Navalta, Shauna L. Rooke-Meyer, Lester Bodie, III, Johnny Wing, BRET ASTELL, MANUEL ARCHILA, ZAHID MOHAMMAD, McCarthy Reed Lewis, Bradley T. Hall, Bryan G. Newsome, Carey Kendig, KYLE RIESENBECK, David B. Batterman, Hemrita Gauilanes, Todd Greenstein, Joseph A. O'Brien, Jr, JAMES THOMPSON, DAVID ELLIOTT, Kenley Diaz, Jeff Gretous, JAMES BEDDINGFIELD, Kevin Jozefowicz, Jason Stockdale, Travis J. Smith, Steven K. Webb, Steven L. Osterholz, Curtis McPherson, Milton R. Baker, Jr, Kevin Fowle, Eben Howard, JOSE DIAZ, Ronald G. Schmale, THOMAS PRITCHETT, LESTER PARADA, Paul Szymanski, Kevin Placy, ANN CARUOLO, Valerie Kay Nau, BRANDON DRAKE, Matthew S. Helmers, Chad Kemble, MICHELLE BRISSON-SIMONE, FREDERICK NADDEO, DONNA J. ASTLE, Ronald K. Brown, Lonnie Mejia, Jennifer D. Smith, BRETT D. FOLSE, Sam Forrester, SAHIR ANAND, WILLIAM D. EDWARDS, EDWARD RODRIGUEZ, Kimberly D. Hughes, Daniel Polaski, Vernon Readus, Rebecca Stoedter, Keehan Grant, MOHAMED SAMB, April B. Parchision, Louis A. Viola, Ronald Matthys, Jacqueline Klahold, Stacey L. Novak, Kelli Maze, Ryan A. Glasshagel, GERALD MANNING, Allison Mansell, Laterfah Smith, Eric S. Perry, Sabina Rusznak, Christopher F. Newton, Anthony Richardson, Craig S. Phillips, Kevin MacGregor, Cory Smith, Hunter Somerville, JOSE BUCKLES, Charles Vohn Clifford, Dave Hurley, William Rooney, Julie Seltz, Shane Magnan, DAVID R. AYERS, Jason Houle, Heleeda Ellis, Chandra L. Griffin, Rodney O. Jefese, Donna Weeden, Joshua Distel, Calvin Thomas, Abel Espinoza, David Lilliment, Mauricio Merizalde, David Olinda, Chris Wolff, Marsha Corellen, JASON COWAN, Gerald T. Reichett, Jamy Belcher, Jeremy M. Tate, Jeffrey.R. Crusse, JESSE JOHNSON, Rebecca Nichols, James A. Turner, Emanuele Moretti, MANUEL A. ARCHILA, Eric Nordlind, WARREN L. FREDERICKSON, TIM BREWER, Ray Tejada, Andrew K.M. Chan, QUINTIN ISRAEL ROY, Edward J. Carter, David A. Brousseau, AMANDA MORGOIA, Gerold B. Wilkie, Jeff Suder, Valerie Casey, Mark DiMauro, Matthew Douthilt, Ishekia Farguharson, Daniel D. Hash, Fred J. Overing, RIA SAVINO, MARK HOBGOOD, Eric Lindsay, Sam Jumaan, Laura Pitagna, Ria Savino, Harold McClurg, Deborah L Puckett, Ricardo Arevali, RYAN BLAKE, Stephen Huisman, Corey Larkins, Herbert Daye, Elick Cortez, Shawn Clinton, Sean Oates, Jerome Gray, Michael Douglas Kovorich, Hardat Pariag, BRIAN M. CARUSO, Daniel Piccolo, Dorien Brooker, Neil Matheson, Zahid Mohammad, Donnie Duncan, BRENT D. CONLEY, KENT B. DOUGLAS, CHRIS JOHNSON, DANIEL BJORAKER, PAULA CONDRY, KIMBERLY J. COOPER, KEVIN FITCHETT, JEANNA FOULKE, IVAN GARRIS, MARK GOLDMAN, MICHAEL D. HALASZ, CHRISTOPHER C. ADAMS, HAMID BARADARVAR, DAN JAMES, SANDEEP KANWAL, DARRELL C. LASSITER, JR., JASON LOFTIS, RICHARD LONG, JEAN K. MAHER, JAMES R. MATSUOKA, SHANNAN E. MCCAUSLAND, SCOTTIE R. MCDANIEL, BRIAN E. MCNEILL, CHRISTOPHER MOLDEN, RONALD STILLMAN, MICHAEL MOREA, MARC MORGAN, GILBERT MUNOZ, LESLIE MURPHY, IV., DEREK COOLEY JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER NOONAN, SERG OCADIZ, BRAD OGDEN, CRAIG PAGLIUCA, FRANCO PEDRAZA, DHAVAL Y. PUROHIT, RICK POHL, FRANCISCO J. REAL, BRADLEY A. RIVERA, ANDREW THERIAULT, AMBER THOMPSON, JAMES H. THOMPSON, NANCY TREON, JEREMIAH UNDERHILL, DANIEL J. THIBODEAU, JON M. WALTON, RICHARD WEAVER, DONNA WEEDER, SHAWN K. WELCH, MICHAEL WHEELER, AL WHITTON, MICHAEL WILLIAMS, TERRY WOMACK, CHRISTOPHER A. PERRY, BRIAN SODER, CHRISTOPHER M. CARRIGAN, JOSHUA MAILLOUX, BRYAN MOORE, COLSTON STEWART, IV., VICTORIA TOMLINSON, EDWARD CAMUS, PAUL CHAUVIN, EVAN COHEN, NOELIA DOMINGUEZ, N'GAI GEORGE, J. DAVID GRAYBEAL, TIM HUYGE, BRENDA C. JONES, STEPHEN KLEMASH, JANE NAHAS, JAMES R. PAIGE, JR., RAMON PEDRAZA, VICKI WICKHAM, GERALD B. WILKIE, JR., KELVIN WATKINS, BRIAN BRIGHT, KEVIN BRYANT, CRAIG R. EDWARDS, NATHAN HOURAMI, MICHAEL KIRSCHBROWN, EDMUNDO LOPEZ, RAUL LOPEZ, JR., RICHARD J. PHILLIPS, KAREN ROCHA, RYAN TUCKER, STEVEN R. YOUNGQUIST, BRETT STONE, JEFFREY BLAND, PAUL MANZO, JASON MEINDL, IRIS HAMILTON, JONATHAN BOONE, CHRISTOPHER SURDO, RANDALL SMITH, NORMAN SWIGER, BRUCE BACKOFEN, RONALD HARTLEY, JAMES OGLES, MONICA MCDAVID, ALLAN WINSLOW, SCOTT WOOD, JEFFREY CIOTTI, GARY LOUGHMAN, MELISSA A. SMITH, HERBERT DAYE, JULIE DELUCA, DUSTIN FORBES, KEVIN CHENG, AMY CROOKSON, VALERIE ROBINSON, VOKE UWAMU, ROBERTO LOPEZ, DENNIS A. MARN, RANDALL MUELLER, CHRIS CRONK, HERSHANE JONES, ANTHONY MCKIETHEN, PHILIP ANDREOTTI, RAY YACOUBY, DANIEL D. HASH, KEVIN VARBLE, VICTOR SPACHUK, LUIS A. BETANCE, DAVID LESHNICK, AMBER WEBB, FAKIR NUMAIRUADIN, NICOLE MAZURKIEWICZ, IVAN PIERANTONI, JASON MOTTA, EDWARD CARTER, MADISON ANNE MCWATTERS, GREGORY BONE, BRYAN KAZES, JARRET SPENCE, COLEEN RIDLEN, CHRISTOPHER AGOSTINO, Marlana DeLeone, Roger A. Chambers, Matthew S Russell, Charles Walsh, ISIAH NORA, DARYL ATKINS, Arthur Lee Haislip, IV., MICHAEL DAVID HENRY, ELMINIO SOTO, DANEL ALLEN, REGINALD BELL, GARY BINGER, MARCUS EDWARDS, DAVID P. ESTES, RALPH E. GAUDETTE, III, DAVINA HARMAN, STEPHANIE M. HENDRICKSON, JEFFREY HIGGINS, ROBERT C. MARTIN, MICHAEL MELE, KEVIN L. MILLER, MITCHELL R. MILLER, SHAUN N. MILLER, PAUL OSCI, LUIS S. PEREZ, JUDY G. RAYMOND, CANDYCE L. ROBERTS, CHRISTOPHER ROGERS, DEBRA ROMANDY, GEORGE M. SLATER, LAWRENCE STEINBERG, CORY THOMPSON, BENJAMIN J. WRIGHT, CRYSTAL WYMAN. (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #547 Motion in Limine to exclude; granting in part and denying in part #548 Motion in Limine to exclude. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/19/2008. (nr, )
December 19, 2008 Filing 585 TRIAL BRIEF Re: Admissibility of Plaintiffs' Depositions by Steven D. Maniec, Curtis T. Brown, Leroy J. Troxell, Jr, Tommy L. McCall, Michael D. Freeman, JOHN T. GARLAND, MICHELLE HARDIN, Stephanie Pochonis, Aaron Fitzgerald, ROBERT METZGER, Christopher D. Outtette, Ronald Glenn Hartley, JOANNE R. ZIPPRIAN, Jason Motta, JAMES J. MURRAY, Mary Kovacs, Catherine Birmingham, RAUL ALDARONDO, Shane Croye, Alison H. Rubin, Katie L. Leavy, Chris Jacobson, Mark A. Sinning, ELIE MOURAD, Christopher Berry, Kathi Blinco, John Cray, DIANA DENNIS, MICHELLE EDWARDS, Richard Fahey, Hershane Jones, CHRIS KURN, RANDY LEFEBURE, James Marden, Tresa Matthews, Stephen Moriarty, William Nash, Carl Popovich, Oliver Rerd, Gar Rodrigues, Lawrence Weatherbee, Eric Wendt, SAMUEL P. LYONS, TIMOTHY E. STIVERS, BRIAN M. GERACI, JOSE AGUIRRE, AMPIRO DELAGARZA SCHNORRBUSH, PAMELA A. PATTERSON, Richard A. Fratto, GEORGE DAWLI, Alissa M. Marrero, Larry Lichtefeld, LaVern J. Wilson, NURYA ALVARENGA, Matthew D. Heinly, BRYAN K. YOUNGBLOOD, JR., RONALD GADDINI, J. Robert Pand, Chris Linden, BRANKO BADURINA, AMANDA MCNEIL, Steven P. Fisher, ANTHONY E. EZENYI, Donald J. Ciriello, Pete Briese, Willis Dent, Jr, DUEWA NIKEMA BATSON, Jamie G. England, John J. Ewasko, Justin Hallstein, Robert McCann, Joseph D Ochettree, III, David Porter, JEREMY BIGGS, Edward A. Strasburger, Tom E. Waters, VALENTIN GONZALEZ, Jason Monteressi, Brian Kupisz, Louis Stines, JEFFREY BENNETT, Annette Martinez, David Kuharski, Jaison L Petite, SHAWN CARTER, Justin D. Smith, Eric McAfee, GREGORY BLAKE, Steven E Peel, Porter Jaushlin, Garrett Murawski, Jesse G. Walker, EUGENE HUNTER ANDERSON, Sheryl D. Ross, JOSEPH PUCCIO, MATTHEW BROOKS, Rob Swanger, MAJEEDATATUM ANDERSON, Alan King, Tanya Pena, Nancy L. Griger, Kimberly Cusack, DAVID BROUSSEAU, Kevin Merna, Karen Herman, John Politano, Carl M. Johnson, Greg G. Mauch, Michelle Peterson, BRIAN BACA, Jolene Niederlitz, Geoff Niederlitz, Valerie A. Bako, Wilfred M. Johnson, CHAD R. LOCTINER, Mark D. Hudson, Kristin J. Hendersen, Debra J. Cross, Christopher Rueb, ANGELICA ALVARADO, TIM BURGOYNE, JR., CHARLIE MILINER, Karin Wellington, Brian Schochet, Jeffrey Michael, David Michael Weinstein, Jason Richardson, Brian Mathisen, John Littley, William R. Grasso, Michael Buck, Blyeshia D. Kemp, Cyndi L. Muirhead, Charles Arthur Nygaard, Kendra M. Basten, BRENT CONLEY, Christopher Plath, Kathleen Breitenwischer, Nicholas P. Bongiorno, Andres Calo, Jr., Jason T. Ransom, THOMAS DYER, Joseph Kariuki, HEATHER ANN LARNEY, GREGORY F. BLAKE, MICHAEL R. ARNWINE, JEREMY ANDERSON, Andrew Robert Sparks, Christopher R. Wagner, MARK GHIRARDUZZI, Mario Telleria, Robert J. Gallo, ROSE M. WHITE, BRAD D. CARTER, AnnMarie Hunter, Donald B. Dierking, FRED ASIEBU LARBI, Jeff Goldberg, Nicole Mazurkiewicz, MICHAEL R. WRIGHT, Norman K. Swiger, Stephen M. Torowus, Denise Scislowicz, H.E. Mendez, DARRELL GAINES, Angelo Collins, MICHAEL TROMAN, James Croeber, JOSH DROULLARD, Steve Rerdy, Todd Hensley, BERTHA CARTWRIGHT, DANIEL DELUCA, Brenda S. Stinnette, MICHAEL PEREZ, CHRISTOPHER A. RICKS, Patrick Ciabattari, Jason W. Rowe, Christoph Von Der Ahe, Joshua Sharninghouse, Lennie Trocard, DOUGLAS E. MATTHISON, JR., Jeremy McCord, MICHAEL S. ROSS, CHRISTINA ATHERTON, JUDITH GARRICK, KIMBERLY A HARRIS, DEBORAH SAUNDERS, GABRIEL H KELLOGG, IVAN PIERANTONI, ALEXIS OERTING, JEAN K MAHER, DANIEL B. KEMBLE, CHRISSY HAYFORD, MARK A. ATKINSON, BRANDON PALMER, DARRELL C. LASSITER, JR, MICHAEL HUTTON, DEANNA GUZMAN, COURTNEY M. HALL, MARLANA DELEONE, NNETTE PARKER, MICHELE TOWNSEND, AMY LOUDERBACK, MARTIN ROMANOW, JOSE CASTRO, STEPHANIE ALBRIGHT, DANNY JAMES, DARRELL LEWIS, JERRY HERRING, HEATHER SHELTON, ROBERT COLFER, EDWARD HALL, TARNOWSKI, DAVID P. WINTERS, Alan Michaud, Jignes A. Jain, Shawn Hureau, Amy Crookston, STEVEN MANIEC, Benjamin Pintor, Kenneth B. Kohlmann, Eric Hurst, Graig Wilkins, Keith Keiser, JOSH MCKINNEY, Michael Navalta, Shauna L. Rooke-Meyer, Lester Bodie, III, Johnny Wing, BRET ASTELL, MANUEL ARCHILA, ZAHID MOHAMMAD, McCarthy Reed Lewis, Bradley T. Hall, Bryan G. Newsome, Carey Kendig, KYLE RIESENBECK, David B. Batterman, Hemrita Gauilanes, Todd Greenstein, Joseph A. O'Brien, Jr, JAMES THOMPSON, DAVID ELLIOTT, Kenley Diaz, Jeff Gretous, JAMES BEDDINGFIELD, Kevin Jozefowicz, Jason Stockdale, Travis J. Smith, Steven K. Webb, Steven L. Osterholz, Curtis McPherson, Milton R. Baker, Jr, Kevin Fowle, Eben Howard, JOSE DIAZ, Ronald G. Schmale, THOMAS PRITCHETT, LESTER PARADA, Paul Szymanski, Kevin Placy, ANN CARUOLO, Valerie Kay Nau, BRANDON DRAKE, Matthew S. Helmers, Chad Kemble, MICHELLE BRISSON-SIMONE, FREDERICK NADDEO, DONNA J. ASTLE, Ronald K. Brown, Lonnie Mejia, Jennifer D. Smith, BRETT D. FOLSE, Sam Forrester, SAHIR ANAND, WILLIAM D. EDWARDS, EDWARD RODRIGUEZ, Kimberly D. Hughes, Daniel Polaski, Vernon Readus, Rebecca Stoedter, Keehan Grant, MOHAMED SAMB, April B. Parchision, Louis A. Viola, Ronald Matthys, Jacqueline Klahold, Stacey L. Novak, Kelli Maze, Ryan A. Glasshagel, GERALD MANNING, Allison Mansell, Laterfah Smith, Eric S. Perry, Sabina Rusznak, Christopher F. Newton, Anthony Richardson, Craig S. Phillips, Kevin MacGregor, Cory Smith, Hunter Somerville, JOSE BUCKLES, Charles Vohn Clifford, Dave Hurley, William Rooney, Julie Seltz, Shane Magnan, DAVID R. AYERS, Jason Houle, Heleeda Ellis, Chandra L. Griffin, Rodney O. Jefese, Donna Weeden, Joshua Distel, Calvin Thomas, Abel Espinoza, David Lilliment, Mauricio Merizalde, David Olinda, Chris Wolff, Marsha Corellen, JASON COWAN, Gerald T. Reichett, Jamy Belcher, Jeremy M. Tate, Jeffrey.R. Crusse, JESSE JOHNSON, Rebecca Nichols, James A. Turner, Emanuele Moretti, MANUEL A. ARCHILA, Eric Nordlind, WARREN L. FREDERICKSON, TIM BREWER, Ray Tejada, Andrew K.M. Chan, QUINTIN ISRAEL ROY, Edward J. Carter, David A. Brousseau, AMANDA MORGOIA, Gerold B. Wilkie, Jeff Suder, Valerie Casey, Mark DiMauro, Matthew Douthilt, Ishekia Farguharson, Daniel D. Hash, Fred J. Overing, RIA SAVINO, MARK HOBGOOD, Eric Lindsay, Sam Jumaan, Laura Pitagna, Ria Savino, Harold McClurg, Deborah L Puckett, Ricardo Arevali, RYAN BLAKE, Stephen Huisman, Corey Larkins, Herbert Daye, Elick Cortez, Shawn Clinton, Sean Oates, Jerome Gray, Michael Douglas Kovorich, Hardat Pariag, BRIAN M. CARUSO, Daniel Piccolo, Dorien Brooker, Neil Matheson, Zahid Mohammad, Donnie Duncan, BRENT D. CONLEY, KENT B. DOUGLAS, CHRIS JOHNSON, DANIEL BJORAKER, PAULA CONDRY, KIMBERLY J. COOPER, KEVIN FITCHETT, JEANNA FOULKE, IVAN GARRIS, MARK GOLDMAN, MICHAEL D. HALASZ, CHRISTOPHER C. ADAMS, HAMID BARADARVAR, DAN JAMES, SANDEEP KANWAL, DARRELL C. LASSITER, JR., JASON LOFTIS, RICHARD LONG, JEAN K. MAHER, JAMES R. MATSUOKA, SHANNAN E. MCCAUSLAND, SCOTTIE R. MCDANIEL, BRIAN E. MCNEILL, CHRISTOPHER MOLDEN, RONALD STILLMAN, MICHAEL MOREA, MARC MORGAN, GILBERT MUNOZ, LESLIE MURPHY, IV., DEREK COOLEY JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER NOONAN, SERG OCADIZ, BRAD OGDEN, CRAIG PAGLIUCA, FRANCO PEDRAZA, DHAVAL Y. PUROHIT, RICK POHL, FRANCISCO J. REAL, BRADLEY A. RIVERA, ANDREW THERIAULT, AMBER THOMPSON, JAMES H. THOMPSON, NANCY TREON, JEREMIAH UNDERHILL, DANIEL J. THIBODEAU, JON M. WALTON, RICHARD WEAVER, DONNA WEEDER, SHAWN K. WELCH, MICHAEL WHEELER, AL WHITTON, MICHAEL WILLIAMS, TERRY WOMACK, CHRISTOPHER A. PERRY, BRIAN SODER, CHRISTOPHER M. CARRIGAN, JOSHUA MAILLOUX, BRYAN MOORE, COLSTON STEWART, IV., VICTORIA TOMLINSON, EDWARD CAMUS, PAUL CHAUVIN, EVAN COHEN, NOELIA DOMINGUEZ, N'GAI GEORGE, J. DAVID GRAYBEAL, TIM HUYGE, BRENDA C. JONES, STEPHEN KLEMASH, JANE NAHAS, JAMES R. PAIGE, JR., RAMON PEDRAZA, VICKI WICKHAM, GERALD B. WILKIE, JR., KELVIN WATKINS, BRIAN BRIGHT, KEVIN BRYANT, CRAIG R. EDWARDS, NATHAN HOURAMI, MICHAEL KIRSCHBROWN, EDMUNDO LOPEZ, RAUL LOPEZ, JR., RICHARD J. PHILLIPS, KAREN ROCHA, RYAN TUCKER, STEVEN R. YOUNGQUIST, BRETT STONE, JEFFREY BLAND, PAUL MANZO, JASON MEINDL, IRIS HAMILTON, JONATHAN BOONE, CHRISTOPHER SURDO, RANDALL SMITH, NORMAN SWIGER, BRUCE BACKOFEN, RONALD HARTLEY, JAMES OGLES, MONICA MCDAVID, ALLAN WINSLOW, SCOTT WOOD, JEFFREY CIOTTI, GARY LOUGHMAN, MELISSA A. SMITH, HERBERT DAYE, JULIE DELUCA, DUSTIN FORBES, KEVIN CHENG, AMY CROOKSON, VALERIE ROBINSON, VOKE UWAMU, ROBERTO LOPEZ, DENNIS A. MARN, RANDALL MUELLER, CHRIS CRONK, HERSHANE JONES, ANTHONY MCKIETHEN, PHILIP ANDREOTTI, RAY YACOUBY, DANIEL D. HASH, KEVIN VARBLE, VICTOR SPACHUK, LUIS A. BETANCE, DAVID LESHNICK, AMBER WEBB, FAKIR NUMAIRUADIN, NICOLE MAZURKIEWICZ, IVAN PIERANTONI, JASON MOTTA, EDWARD CARTER, MADISON ANNE MCWATTERS, GREGORY BONE, BRYAN KAZES, JARRET SPENCE, COLEEN RIDLEN, CHRISTOPHER AGOSTINO, Marlana DeLeone, Roger A. Chambers, Matthew S Russell, Charles Walsh, ISIAH NORA, DARYL ATKINS, Arthur Lee Haislip, IV., MICHAEL DAVID HENRY, ELMINIO SOTO, DANEL ALLEN, REGINALD BELL, GARY BINGER, MARCUS EDWARDS, DAVID P. ESTES, RALPH E. GAUDETTE, III, DAVINA HARMAN, STEPHANIE M. HENDRICKSON, JEFFREY HIGGINS, ROBERT C. MARTIN, MICHAEL MELE, KEVIN L. MILLER, MITCHELL R. MILLER, SHAUN N. MILLER, PAUL OSCI, LUIS S. PEREZ, JUDY G. RAYMOND, CANDYCE L. ROBERTS, CHRISTOPHER ROGERS, DEBRA ROMANDY, GEORGE M. SLATER, LAWRENCE STEINBERG, CORY THOMPSON, BENJAMIN J. WRIGHT, CRYSTAL WYMAN. (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER Ordered that the #542 MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Damages More than Two Years Prior to the Date of Filing Opt-In Consent Forms by STAPLES, INC. is deemed withdrawn and terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/15/08. (dc, )
December 17, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Status Conference held on the record on 12/17/2008. (CD #S08-27.) (aa, )
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER on informal application amending the final pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/11/2008. (nr, )
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER denying #546 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/15/08. (sr, )
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER denying #544 Motion in Limine re: deft's motion to alter the order of proof. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/15/08. (sr, )
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER granting #543 Motion in Limine re: to exclude evidence of the settlement deft reached in California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/15/08. (sr, )
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER denying #545 Motion in Limine to exclude individual anecdotal evidence at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/15/2008. (nr, )
December 15, 2008 Filing 578 NOTICE by STAPLES, INC. re #576 Notice (Other), #574 Notice (Other) Staples, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs Objections to Defendant's Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
December 15, 2008 Filing 577 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Unresolved Objections to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(GALPERN, MICHAEL)
December 12, 2008 Filing 576 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN Corrected Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's Deposition Designations (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
December 12, 2008 Filing 575 NOTICE by STAPLES, INC. (Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Unresolved Objections to Deposition Designations) (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
December 12, 2008 Filing 574 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's Deposition Designations (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
December 10, 2008 Filing 573 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN re #571 Letter relating to proposed amendment to Final Pretrial Order - Proposed Form of Order as per request from Chambers (LESSER, SETH)
December 9, 2008 Filing 572 Letter from Seth R Lesser re joint letter regarding Plaintiffs' request to preclude new expert declarations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit of Deposition Transcript Page)(LESSER, SETH)
December 8, 2008 Filing 571 Letter from Seth Lesser regarding request to amend Final Pretrial Order. (LESSER, SETH)
December 8, 2008 Filing 570 Letter from Seth Lesser regarding joint letter to be filed regarding Plaintiffs' request to preclude new expert declarations. (LESSER, SETH)
December 5, 2008 Filing 569 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN of Plaintiffs' Proposed Special Verdict Form (LESSER, SETH)
December 5, 2008 Filing 568 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RONALD STILLMAN re #563 Trial Brief, #564 Proposed Voir Dire, #565 Proposed Jury Instructions, #567 Notice (Other), #566 Notice (Other) (LESSER, SETH)
December 5, 2008 Filing 567 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN of Plaintiffs' Proposed Order Regarding Injunctive Relief (LESSER, SETH)
December 5, 2008 Filing 566 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN of Plaintiffs' Neutral Statement of the Case (LESSER, SETH)
December 5, 2008 Filing 565 Proposed Jury Instructions by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
December 5, 2008 Filing 564 Proposed Voir Dire by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
December 5, 2008 Filing 563 TRIAL BRIEF by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
December 5, 2008 Filing 562 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STAPLES, INC. re #558 Proposed Voir Dire, #560 Notice (Other), #559 Notice (Other), #561 Trial Brief (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
December 5, 2008 Filing 561 TRIAL BRIEF by STAPLES, INC.. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
December 5, 2008 Filing 560 NOTICE by STAPLES, INC. (Proposed Special Verdict Form) (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
December 5, 2008 Filing 559 NOTICE by STAPLES, INC. (Proposed Neutral Statement of the Case) (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
December 5, 2008 Filing 558 Proposed Voir Dire by STAPLES, INC.. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
November 25, 2008 Filing 557 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. GALPERN on behalf of all plaintiffs (GALPERN, MICHAEL)
November 24, 2008 Filing 556 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RONALD STILLMAN re #555 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #552 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #554 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #553 Brief in Opposition to Motion (LESSER, SETH)
November 24, 2008 Filing 555 BRIEF in Opposition re #546 MOTION to Bifurcate (Motion In Limine No. 5) filed by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
November 24, 2008 Filing 554 BRIEF in Opposition re #545 MOTION in Limine (No. 4) to Exclude Individual Anecdotal Evidence at Trial MOTION in Limine (No. 4) to Exclude Individual Anecdotal Evidence at Trial filed by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
November 24, 2008 Filing 553 BRIEF in Opposition re #544 MOTION in Limine (No. 3) to Alter the Order of Proof filed by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
November 24, 2008 Filing 552 BRIEF in Opposition re #543 MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of the California Settlement MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of the California Settlement filed by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
November 24, 2008 Filing 551 BRIEF in Opposition re #548 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Expert Opinion Evidence, #547 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinions Based upon Daubert filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam N. Saravay, #2 Declaration of Michael J. O'Neil, #3 Declaration of Ali Saad, #4 Attachment 1 to Saad Decl., (Expert Report of Ali Saad), #5 Attachment A to Expert Report of Ali Saad, #6 Attachment B, Part 1 of 3, to Expert Report of Ali Saad, #7 Attachment B, Part 2 of 3, to Expert Report of Ali Saad, #8 Attachment B, Part 3 of 3, to Expert Report of Ali Saad, #9 Attachments C-E to Expert Report of Ali Saad, #10 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
November 19, 2008 Filing 550 Letter from Staples, Inc., withdrawing motion without prejudice re #542 MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Damages More than Two Years Prior to the Date of Filing Opt-In Consent Forms MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Damages More than Two Years Prior to the Date of Filing Opt-In Consent Forms. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
November 14, 2008 Set Deadlines as to #542 MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Damages More than Two Years Prior to the Date of Filing Opt-In Consent Forms MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Damages More than Two Years Prior to the Date of Filing Opt-In Consent Forms, #545 MOTION in Limine (No. 4) to Exclude Individual Anecdotal Evidence at Trial MOTION in Limine (No. 4) to Exclude Individual Anecdotal Evidence at Trial, #543 MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of the California Settlement MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of the California Settlement, #548 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Expert Opinion Evidence, #546 MOTION to Bifurcate (Motion In Limine No. 5), #547 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinions Based upon Daubert, #544 MOTION in Limine (No. 3) to Alter the Order of Proof. Motion set for 12/15/2008 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
November 14, 2008 Filing 549 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RONALD STILLMAN re #547 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinions Based upon Daubert (LESSER, SETH)
November 14, 2008 Filing 548 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Expert Opinion Evidence by RONALD STILLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinions, #2 Declaration of Seth R Lesser in support of Daubert motion and motion in limine to exclude expert opinions, #3 Exhibit A to Lesser Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Lesser Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Lesser Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Lesser Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Lesser Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Lesser Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Lesser Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to Lesser Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to Lesser Declaration, #12 Exhibit J to Lesser Declaration, #13 Exhibit K to Lesser Declaration, #14 Exhibit L to Lesser Declaration, #15 Exhibit M to Lesser Declaration, #16 Exhibit N to Lesser Declaration, #17 Exhibit O to Lesser Declaration, #18 Exhibit P to Lesser Declaration, #19 Exhibit Q to Lesser Declaration, #20 Text of Proposed Order, #21 Certificate of Service)(LESSER, SETH)
November 14, 2008 Filing 547 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Opinions Based upon Daubert by RONALD STILLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude, #2 Declaration of Seth R Lesser in support of Daubert motion to exclude and motion in limine, #3 Exhibit A to Lesser Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Lesser Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Lesser Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Lesser Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Lesser Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Lesser Declaration, #9 Exhibit G to Lesser Declaration, #10 Exhibit H to Lesser Declaration, #11 Exhibit I to Lesser Declaration, #12 Exhibit J to Lesser Declaration, #13 Exhibit K to Lesser Declaration, #14 Exhibit L to Lesser Declaration, #15 Exhibit M to Lesser Declaration, #16 Exhibit N to Lesser Declaration, #17 Exhibit O to Lesser Declaration, #18 Exhibit P to Lesser Declaration, #19 Exhibit Q to Lesser Declaration, #20 Text of Proposed Order)(LESSER, SETH)
November 14, 2008 Filing 546 MOTION to Bifurcate (Motion In Limine No. 5) by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
November 14, 2008 Filing 545 MOTION in Limine (No. 4) to Exclude Individual Anecdotal Evidence at Trial by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Robert W. Fischer, Jr., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
November 14, 2008 Filing 544 MOTION in Limine (No. 3) to Alter the Order of Proof by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
November 14, 2008 Filing 543 MOTION in Limine (No. 2) to Exclude Evidence of the California Settlement by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Robert W. Fischer, Jr., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
November 14, 2008 Filing 542 MOTION in Limine (No. 1) to Exclude Evidence of Damages More than Two Years Prior to the Date of Filing Opt-In Consent Forms by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Adam N. Saravay, #3 Declaration of Brian G. Leary, #4 Declaration of Matthew Setterlund, #5 Declaration of Andrew Seto, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER on informal application amending the final pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 11/10/2008. (nr, )
November 10, 2008 Filing 540 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN of Plaintiffs' Amended Statement of Contested Facts Pursuant to Pretrial Order (Docket No. 539) at page 9 (LESSER, SETH)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 539 FINAL JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/15/2008. (nr, )
October 15, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Final Pretrial Conference held on the record on 10/15/2008. (CD #S08-20.) (aa, )
October 7, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Settlement Conference held on 10/7/2008. (aa, )
October 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER granting #535 Motion for Jeffry A. Klafter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/03/2008. (nr, )
September 25, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER, (There shall be a settlement conference on 10/7/2008 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Trial counsel and clients with full settlement authority are required to attend.)ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 9/25/08. (Liriano, I)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER on informal application granting the request to extend the deadline to disclose responsive reports and to depose Mr. Guillemete. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 09/24/2008. (nr, )
September 24, 2008 Set Deadlines as to #535 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey A Klafter. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2008 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (nr, ) (PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT)
September 24, 2008 Filing 536 Letter from Seth R Lesser Jointly Requesting Amendment to Pretrial Schedule. (LESSER, SETH)
September 24, 2008 Filing 535 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey A Klafter by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
September 17, 2008 Filing 534 Letter from SR Lesser jointly requesting status conference. (LESSER, SETH)
September 15, 2008 Filing 533 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Zahid Mohammad, Donnie Duncan (LESSER, SETH)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 532 CORRECTED ORDER on informal application denying application for reconsideration of the order dated 9/3/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 09/10/2008. (nr, )
September 11, 2008 Filing 531 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Daniel Piccolo, Dorien Brooker, Neil Matheson (LESSER, SETH)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER on informal application denying application for reconsideration of the order entered on Sept. 3, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 09/10/2008. (nr, )
September 9, 2008 Filing 529 Letter from Letter from Seth Lesser re deposition extension request. (LESSER, SETH)
September 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER on informal application denying pltf's request for an extension of the deposition deadline until 10/15/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 09/03/2008. (nr, )
August 29, 2008 Filing 527 Letter from Seth Lesser. (LESSER, SETH)
August 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER ON INFORMAL APPLICATION granting pltfs.' request to permit late-filed consents to be considered part of the collective action that the Court certified on 4/22/08, etc., Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 8/13/08. (dc, )
August 19, 2008 Filing 525 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jerome Gray, Michael Douglas Kovorich, Hardat Pariag (LESSER, SETH)
August 15, 2008 Filing 524 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Stephen Huisman, Corey Larkins, Herbert Daye, Elick Cortez, Shawn Clinton, Sean Oates (LESSER, SETH)
August 14, 2008 Filing 523 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Deborah L Puckett, Ricardo Arevali (LESSER, SETH)
August 13, 2008 Filing 522 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Ria Savino, Harold McClurg (LESSER, SETH)
August 8, 2008 Filing 521 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Sam Jumaan, Laura Pitagna (LESSER, SETH)
August 8, 2008 Filing 520 Letter from Seth R. Lesser Re- Request in Having Late Filed Consents be Part of Collective Action. (LESSER, SETH)
August 7, 2008 Filing 519 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Eric Lindsay (LESSER, SETH)
August 7, 2008 Filing 518 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Mark Hobgood (LESSER, SETH)
August 5, 2008 Filing 517 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Ria Savino (LESSER, SETH)
July 31, 2008 Filing 516 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Fran L. Rudich to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LESSER, SETH)
July 28, 2008 Filing 515 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Mark DiMauro, Matthew Douthilt, Ishekia Farguharson, Daniel D. Hash, Fred J. Overing, Kevin Fitchett (LESSER, SETH)
July 25, 2008 Filing 514 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of AMANDA MORGOIA, Gerold B. Wilkie, Jeff Suder, Valerie Casey (LESSER, SETH)
July 24, 2008 Filing 513 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Gar Rodrigues, Warren L. Frederickson, TIM BREWER, Ray Tejada, Andrew K.M. Chan, Roy Quintin Israel, Edward J. Carter, David A. Brousseau (LESSER, SETH)
July 23, 2008 Filing 512 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Calvin Thomas, Abel Espinoza, David Lilliment, Mauricio Merizalde, David Olinda, Chris Wolff, Marsha Corellen, JASON COWAN, Gerald T. Reichett, Jamy Belcher, Jeremy M. Tate, Jeffrey.R. Crusse, JESSE JOHNSON, Rebecca Nichols, James A. Turner, Emanuele Moretti, Manuel A. Archila, Eric Nordlind (LESSER, SETH)
July 23, 2008 Filing 511 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Kevin MacGregor, Cory Smith, Hunter Somerville, Jose Buckles, Charles Vohn Clifford, Dave Hurley, William Rooney, Julie Seltz, Shane Magnan, David R. Ayers, Jason Houle, Heleeda Ellis, Chandra L. Griffin, Rodney O. Jefese, Donna Weeden, Joshua Distel (LESSER, SETH)
July 18, 2008 Filing 510 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Louis A. Viola, Ronald Matthys, Jacqueline Klahold, Stacey L. Novak, Kelli Maze, Ryan A. Glasshagel, Gerald Manning, Allison Mansell, Laterfah Smith, Eric S. Perry, Sabina Rusznak, Christopher F. Newton, Anthony Richardson, Craig S. Phillips (LESSER, SETH)
July 17, 2008 Filing 509 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of WILLIAM D. EDWARDS, EDWARD RODRIGUEZ, Kimberly D. Hughes, Daniel Polaski, Vernon Readus, Rebecca Stoedter, Keehan Grant, Mohamed Samb, April B. Parchision (LESSER, SETH)
July 15, 2008 Filing 508 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Bryan G. Newsome, Carey Kendig, Kyle Riesenbeck, David B. Batterman, Hemrita Gauilanes, Todd Greenstein, Joseph A. O'Brien, Jr, JAMES THOMPSON, DAVID ELLIOTT, Kenley Diaz, Jeff Gretous, Kevin Jozefowicz, Jason Stockdale, Travis J. Smith, Steven K. Webb, Steven L. Osterholz, Curtis McPherson, Milton R. Baker, Jr, Kevin Fowle, Eben Howard, JOSE DIAZ, Ronald G. Schmale, THOMAS PRITCHETT, Lester Parada, Paul Szymanski, Kevin Placy, Valerie Kay Nau, Brandon Drake, Matthew S. Helmers, Chad Kemble, Michelle Brisson-Simone, Frederick Naddeo, Donna J. Astle, Ronald K. Brown, Lonnie Mejia, Jennifer D. Smith, Brett D. Folse, Sam Forrester, Sahir Anand (LESSER, SETH)
July 10, 2008 Filing 507 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Bret Astell, Zahid Mohammad, McCarthy Reed Lewis, Bradley T. Hall (LESSER, SETH)
July 9, 2008 Filing 506 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Benjamin Pintor, Kenneth B. Kohlmann, Eric Hurst, Graig Wilkins, Keith Keiser, Josh McKinney, Michael Navalta, Shauna L. Rooke-Meyer, Lester Bodie, III, Johnny Wing, LESLIE MURPHY, IV. (LESSER, SETH)
July 8, 2008 Filing 504 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of DAVID P. WINTERS, Alan Michaud, Jignes A. Jain, Shawn Hureau, Amy Crookston, BRIAN BACA, RICK POHL (LESSER, SETH)
July 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER on informal application granting pltf's request to re-ssend the identical court-approved notice no later than 7/8/2008, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 07/03/2008. (nr, )
July 3, 2008 Filing 503 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of EDWARD HALL, TARNOWSKI (LESSER, SETH)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER on informal application and SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2008 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Jury Trial set for 1/12/2009 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Discovery due by 9/2/2008. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/7/2008.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 07/01/2008. (nr, )
July 2, 2008 Filing 501 Letter from Both Parties Re- Plaintiffs' Request to Send Out a Reminder Notice. (LESSER, SETH)
July 1, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on 7/1/2008. (aa, )
July 1, 2008 Filing 500 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of STEPHANIE ALBRIGHT, DANNY JAMES, DARRELL LEWIS, HEATHER SHELTON, ROBERT COLFER (LESSER, SETH)
June 30, 2008 Filing 499 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MICHELE TOWNSEND, AMY LOUDERBACK, MARTIN ROMANOW, JOSE CASTRO (LESSER, SETH)
June 27, 2008 Filing 498 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of COURTNEY M. HALL, Marlana DeLeone, NNETTE PARKER (LESSER, SETH)
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER, (There shall be a telephone conference set for 7/1/2008 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call.)ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 6/25/08. (Liriano, I)
June 24, 2008 Filing 497 Letter from F. Rudich and A. Saravay Requesting Conference Call. (LESSER, SETH)
June 24, 2008 Filing 496 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of DANIEL B. KEMBLE, CHRISSY HAYFORD, MARK A. ATKINSON, BRANDON PALMER, DARRELL C. LASSITER, JR, MICHAEL HUTTON, Daniel Bjoraker (LESSER, SETH)
June 20, 2008 Filing 495 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MICHAEL S. ROSS, CHRISTINA ATHERTON, KIMBERLY A HARRIS, DEBORAH SAUNDERS, GABRIEL H KELLOGG, Ivan Pierantoni, Judith Garrick, ALEXIS OERTING, JEAN K MAHER (LESSER, SETH)
June 18, 2008 Filing 494 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MICHAEL PEREZ, CHRISTOPHER A. RICKS, Patrick Ciabattari, Jason W. Rowe, Christoph Von Der Ahe, Joshua Sharninghouse, Lennie Trocard, Douglas E. Matthison, Jr, Jeremy McCord (LESSER, SETH)
June 17, 2008 Filing 493 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jeff Goldberg, Nicole Mazurkiewicz, Michael R. Wright, Norman K. Swiger, Stephen M. Torowus, Denise Scislowicz, H.E. Mendez, DARRELL GAINES, Angelo Collins, MICHAEL TROMAN, James Croeber, Josh Droullard, Steve Rerdy, Todd Hensley, DANIEL DELUCA, Brenda S. Stinnette (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 492 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Donald B. Dierking (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 491 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Ray Yacouby (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 490 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of AnnMarie Hunter (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 489 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Brad D. Carter (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 488 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of ROSE M. WHITE (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 487 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Robert J. Gallo (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 486 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of CHRISTOPHER MOLDEN (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 485 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Mario Telleria (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 484 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Christopher R. Wagner (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 483 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Andrew Robert Sparks (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 482 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of JEREMY ANDERSON (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 481 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of KEVIN BRYANT (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 480 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MICHAEL R. ARNWINE (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 479 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of GREGORY F. BLAKE (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 478 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Heather Ann Larney (LESSER, SETH)
June 13, 2008 Filing 477 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Joseph Kariuki (LESSER, SETH)
June 12, 2008 Filing 476 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jason T. Ransom (LESSER, SETH)
June 12, 2008 Filing 475 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Andres Calo, Jr. (LESSER, SETH)
June 12, 2008 Filing 474 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Nicholas P. Bongiorno (LESSER, SETH)
June 12, 2008 Filing 473 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of CHRISTOPHER M. CARRIGAN (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 471 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of BRENDA C. JONES (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 470 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Kathleen Breitenwischer (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 469 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of DUEWA NIKEMA BATSON (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 468 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Christopher Plath (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 467 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Kendra M. Basten (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 466 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jeanna Foulke (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 465 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Kevin Varble (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 464 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Charles Arthur Nygaard (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 463 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Cyndi L. Muirhead (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 462 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Blyeshia D. Kemp (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 461 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Michael Buck (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 460 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of William R. Grasso (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 459 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of John Littley (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 458 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Brian Mathisen (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 457 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jason Richardson (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 456 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of David Michael Weinstein (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 455 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jeffrey Michael (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 454 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Brian Schochet (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 453 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Karin Wellington (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 452 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Charlie Miliner (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 451 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Tim Burgoyne, Jr. (LESSER, SETH)
June 11, 2008 Filing 450 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Angelica Alvarado (LESSER, SETH)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER on informal application regarding discovery and opt-in pltfs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 06/09/2008. (nr, )
June 10, 2008 Filing 449 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of BRENDA C. JONES (LESSER, SETH)
June 9, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on 6/9/2008. (aa, )
June 9, 2008 Filing 448 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Christopher Rueb (LESSER, SETH)
June 9, 2008 Filing 447 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Debra J. Cross (LESSER, SETH)
June 9, 2008 Filing 446 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Kristin J. Hendersen (LESSER, SETH)
June 9, 2008 Filing 445 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Mark D. Hudson (LESSER, SETH)
June 9, 2008 Filing 444 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of BRIAN SODER (LESSER, SETH)
June 6, 2008 Filing 443 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Chad R. Loctiner (LESSER, SETH)
June 6, 2008 Filing 442 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Wilfred M. Johnson (LESSER, SETH)
June 6, 2008 Filing 441 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Valerie A. Bako (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 440 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Geoff Niederlitz (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 439 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jolene Niederlitz (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 438 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Michelle Peterson (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 437 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Eric McAfee (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 436 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Eugene Hunter Anderson (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 435 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Greg G. Mauch (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 434 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Carl M. Johnson (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 433 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of JAMES R. MATSUOKA (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 432 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of John Politano (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 431 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Karen Herman (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 430 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Kevin Merna (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 429 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Kimberly Cusack (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 428 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Nancy L. Griger (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 427 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Tanya Pena (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 426 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Alan King (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 425 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Majeedatatum Anderson (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 424 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Rob Swanger (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 423 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MARC MORGAN (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 422 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of GARY BINGER (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 421 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of LUIS S. PEREZ (LESSER, SETH)
June 4, 2008 Filing 420 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of JOSEPH PUCCIO (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 419 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Sheryl D. Ross (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 418 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Eugene Hunter Anderson (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 417 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Matthew S Russell (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 416 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jesse G. Walker (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 415 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Garrett Murawski (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 414 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Porter Jaushlin (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 413 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Steven E Peel (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 412 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of CHRISTOPHER C. ADAMS (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 411 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Eric McAfee (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 410 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Justin D. Smith (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 409 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of SHAWN CARTER (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 408 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jaison L Petite (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 407 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of David Kuharski (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 406 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of CRAIG R. EDWARDS (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 405 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Annette Martinez (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 404 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Louis Stines (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 403 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of SANDEEP KANWAL (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Brian Kupisz (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 401 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jason Monteressi (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 400 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MICHAEL WHEELER (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 399 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of JEREMIAH UNDERHILL (LESSER, SETH)
June 3, 2008 Filing 398 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of VALENTIN GONZALEZ (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 397 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Tom E. Waters (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 396 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Edward A. Strasburger (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 395 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of David Porter (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 394 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Joseph D Ochettree, III (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 393 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Robert McCann (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Justin Hallstein (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 391 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of J. DAVID GRAYBEAL (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 390 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of N'GAI GEORGE (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 389 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of John J. Ewasko (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 388 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jamie G. England (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 387 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Willis Dent, Jr (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 386 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Pete Briese (LESSER, SETH)
May 30, 2008 Filing 385 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Philip Andreotti (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 384 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Donald J. Ciriello (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 383 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Anthony E. Ezenyi (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 382 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Kimberly J. Cooper (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 381 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Steven P. Fisher (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 380 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Amanda McNeil (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 379 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Chris Linden (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 378 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of J. Robert Pand (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 377 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Ronald Gaddini (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 376 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of SANDEEP KANWAL (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 375 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Bryan K. Youngblood, Jr (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 374 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Brett Stone (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 373 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of DANIEL J. THIBODEAU (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 372 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Matthew D. Heinly (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 371 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of LaVern J. Wilson (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 370 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of EVAN COHEN (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 369 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Larry Lichtefeld (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 368 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Alissa M. Marrero (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 367 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of George Dawli (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 366 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Richard A. Fratto (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 365 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of PAMELA A. PATTERSON (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 364 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of AMPIRO DELAGARZA SCHNORRBUSH (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 363 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of BRIAN M. GERACI (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 362 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jerry Herring (LESSER, SETH)
May 29, 2008 Filing 361 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of TIMOTHY E. STIVERS (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 360 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Samuel P. Lyons (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 359 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Scott Wood (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 358 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Eric Wendt (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 357 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Lawrence Weatherbee (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 356 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Gar Rodrigues (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 355 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Oliver Rerd (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 354 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of DHAVAL Y. PUROHIT (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 353 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Carl Popovich (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 352 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of William Nash (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 351 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Stephen Moriarty (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 350 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Tresa Matthews (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 349 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of James Marden (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 348 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Randy LeFebure (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 347 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Chris Kurn (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 346 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Hershane Jones (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 345 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Iris Hamilton (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 344 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Richard Fahey (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 343 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MICHELLE EDWARDS (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 342 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Diana Dennis (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 341 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of John Cray (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 340 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jeffrey Ciotti (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 339 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Kathi Blinco (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 338 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Christopher Berry (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 337 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of BRANKO BADURINA (LESSER, SETH)
May 28, 2008 Filing 336 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Bruce Backofen (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 335 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of ELIE MOURAD (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 334 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of RALPH E. GAUDETTE, III (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 333 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of JEFFREY HIGGINS (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Mark A. Sinning (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 331 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Chris Jacobson (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 330 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Katie L. Leavy (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 329 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Alison H. Rubin (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Shane Croye (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 327 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Raul Aldarondo (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 326 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of SHANNAN E. MCCAUSLAND (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of VICTORIA TOMLINSON (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 324 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Catherine Birmingham (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 323 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Mary Kovacs (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 322 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of JAMES J. MURRAY (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 321 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of JANE NAHAS (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 320 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of STEVEN R. YOUNGQUIST (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 319 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jason Motta (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 318 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Joanne R. Zipprian (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 317 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Gary Loughman (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 316 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Ronald Glenn Hartley (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 315 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Christopher D. Outtette (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 314 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of ROBERT METZGER (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Aaron Fitzgerald (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 312 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Stephanie Pochonis (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 311 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MICHAEL MOREA (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Michelle Hardin (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 309 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of John T. Garland (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 308 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Michael D. Freeman (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 307 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Tommy L. McCall (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 306 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Leroy J. Troxell, Jr (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 305 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of JEREMY BIGGS (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 304 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Curtis T. Brown (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 303 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of BRIAN BRIGHT (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 302 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Steven D. Maniec (LESSER, SETH)
May 27, 2008 Filing 301 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of James Ogles (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of CRYSTAL WYMAN (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 299 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of BENJAMIN J. WRIGHT (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 298 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of CORY THOMPSON (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 297 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of ANDREW THERIAULT (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 296 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of LAWRENCE STEINBERG (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 295 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of ELMINIO SOTO (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 294 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of GEORGE M. SLATER (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of DEBRA ROMANDY (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of CHRISTOPHER ROGERS (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 291 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of CANDYCE L. ROBERTS (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of JUDY G. RAYMOND (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 289 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of LUIS S. PEREZ (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 288 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of PAUL OSCI (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 287 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of ELIE MOURAD (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 286 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of AMANDA MORGOIA (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 285 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MARC MORGAN (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 284 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of SHAUN N. MILLER (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MITCHELL R. MILLER (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 282 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of KEVIN L. MILLER (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 281 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MICHAEL MELE (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 280 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of ROBERT C. MARTIN (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of JEFFREY HIGGINS (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 278 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jerry Herring (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 277 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of STEPHANIE M. HENDRICKSON (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 276 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of DAVINA HARMAN (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 275 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Mark Ghirarduzzi (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of RALPH E. GAUDETTE, III (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 273 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of DAVID P. ESTES (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MARCUS EDWARDS (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 271 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Kevin Cheng (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 270 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of PAUL CHAUVIN (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 269 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of CHRISTOPHER M. CARRIGAN (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of GARY BINGER (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 267 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of REGINALD BELL (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of DANEL ALLEN (LESSER, SETH)
May 23, 2008 Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Christopher Agostino (LESSER, SETH)
May 1, 2008 Filing 264 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of ELMINIO SOTO (LESSER, SETH)
May 1, 2008 Filing 263 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of MICHAEL DAVID HENRY (LESSER, SETH)
May 1, 2008 Filing 262 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN of Change of Firm Affiliation (LESSER, SETH)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting #254 Motion to Certify Class action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 04/18/2008. (nr, )
April 22, 2008 Filing 260 OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 04/18/2008. (nr, ) Modified on 4/22/2008 (nr, ). (Signature dated modified from 4/21/2008 to the correct dated of 4/18/2008)
April 7, 2008 Filing 259 RESPONSE in Support re #254 MOTION to Certify Class filed by RONALD STILLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fran L. Rudich, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(LESSER, SETH)
March 28, 2008 Filing 257 BRIEF in Opposition re #254 MOTION to Certify Class filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert W. Fischer, Jr., in Support of Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification, #2 Exhibit A to Fischer Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Fischer Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Fischer Decl. Pt. 1, #5 Exhibit C to Fischer Decl. Pt. 2, #6 Exhibit D to Fischer Decl., #7 Exhibit E to Fischer Decl., #8 Exhibit F to Fischer Decl., #9 Exhibits G-1, G-2, and G-3 to Fischer Decl., #10 Certificate of Service)(CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
March 26, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz: Telephone Conference held on 3/26/2008. (aa, )
March 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/9/2008 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 03/26/2008. (nr, )
March 26, 2008 Filing 256 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN of Change of Firm Affiliation for Alexander E. Barnett (LESSER, SETH)
March 25, 2008 Filing 255 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Arthur Lee Haislip, IV. (LESSER, SETH)
March 7, 2008 Set Deadlines as to #254 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2008 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (nr, ) (PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT)
March 7, 2008 Filing 254 MOTION to Certify Class by RONALD STILLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Seth R. Lesser, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Declaration of Baca, #22 Declaration of Biggs, #23 Declaration of Bright, #24 Declaration of Carter, #25 Declaration of Gaines, #26 Declaration of George, #27 Declaration of Graybeal, #28 Declaration of Stone, #29 Declaration of Wood, #30 Proposed Order, #31 Certificate of Service)(LESSER, SETH)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 253 OPDER on informal application granting request to extend the deadline to file a moiton for collective action; FIFTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/6/2008. Telephone Conference set for 3/26/2008 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/9/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2008 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 02/27/2008. (nr, )
February 28, 2008 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Daryl Atkins (LESSER, SETH)
February 28, 2008 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Isiah Nora (LESSER, SETH)
February 26, 2008 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Charles Walsh (LESSER, SETH)
February 26, 2008 Filing 249 Letter from Seth R. Lesser Re- Request Extension of Briefing Schedule. (LESSER, SETH)
February 26, 2008 Filing 248 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Matthew S Russell (LESSER, SETH)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER on informal application granting request to extend the deadline to take depositions to 2/13/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 02/11/2008. (nr, )
February 13, 2008 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Roger A. Chambers (LESSER, SETH)
February 12, 2008 Filing 245 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Janet Walsh to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LESSER, SETH)
February 12, 2008 Filing 244 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew P. Bell to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LESSER, SETH)
February 11, 2008 Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by C. BRYAN CANTRELL on behalf of STAPLES, INC. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
February 11, 2008 Filing 242 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Todd M. Sorrell, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
February 11, 2008 Filing 241 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert W. Fischer, Jr., Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CANTRELL, C. BRYAN)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER on informal application deeming the request for court-intervention concerning privilege disputes as moot and cancelling the hrg. scheduled for 2/8/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 02/07/2008. (nr, )
February 7, 2008 Filing 240 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by RONALD STILLMAN, STAPLES, INC.. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. (nr, )
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER denying the request for an order compelling the pltfs. counsel to serve Rule 45 subpoenas on the two opt-in pltfs.; directing the defts. to serve a deposition notice for these two opt-in pltfs. etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 01/31/2008. (nr, )
January 31, 2008 Filing 237 Letter from Seth Lesser and Adam Saravay regarding discovery dispute. (LESSER, SETH)
January 28, 2008 Filing 236 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN Notice of Availability of a US MJ to Exercise Jurisdiction (LESSER, SETH)
January 28, 2008 Filing 235 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN Notice of Availability of a US Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction (LESSER, SETH)
January 28, 2008 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Marlana DeLeone (LESSER, SETH)
January 28, 2008 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Coleen Ridlen (LESSER, SETH)
January 28, 2008 Filing 232 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jarret M. Spence (LESSER, SETH)
January 28, 2008 Filing 231 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Christopher Agostino (LESSER, SETH)
January 15, 2008 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Coleen Ridlen (LESSER, SETH)
January 15, 2008 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jarret Spence (LESSER, SETH)
January 14, 2008 Filing 228 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 14, 2007 before Judge Shwartz. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, )
January 11, 2008 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number 200349980 re Janet Walsh (nr, )
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting #222 Motion for Nicholas A. Migliaccio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 01/08/2008. (nr, )
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting #215 Motion for Janet C. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 1/7/08. (cs, )
January 7, 2008 Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Bryan Kazes (LESSER, SETH)
January 7, 2008 Filing 224 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Gregory Bone (LESSER, SETH)
January 7, 2008 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Madison Anne McWatters (LESSER, SETH)
January 7, 2008 Filing 222 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas Migliaccio by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
January 3, 2008 Filing 221 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jason Motta (LESSER, SETH)
January 3, 2008 Filing 220 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Ivan Pierantoni (LESSER, SETH)
January 3, 2008 Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Nicole Mazurkiewicz (LESSER, SETH)
January 3, 2008 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Fakir Numairuadin (LESSER, SETH)
January 3, 2008 Filing 217 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Amber Webb (LESSER, SETH)
January 3, 2008 Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of David Leshnick (LESSER, SETH)
December 20, 2007 Set Deadlines as to #215 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Janet Walsh. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2008 10:00 AM before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. (nr, ) (PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THEC COURT)
December 20, 2007 Filing 215 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Janet Walsh by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
December 20, 2007 Filing 214 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Luis A. Betance (LESSER, SETH)
December 17, 2007 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Victor Spachuk (LESSER, SETH)
December 17, 2007 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Kevin Varble (LESSER, SETH)
December 17, 2007 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Daniel D Hash (LESSER, SETH)
December 14, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patty Shwartz : Telephone Conference held on 12/14/2007. (aa, )
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER on informal application for production of documents and granting request to extend the deadline to complete fact discovery needed to present the motion for collective action and to file the collective action notive; FOURTH AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/26/2008 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2008 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.,Discovery due by 2/6/2008.,Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/9/2008.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/14/2007. (nr, )
December 11, 2007 Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Ray Yacouby (LESSER, SETH)
December 11, 2007 Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Philip Andreotti (LESSER, SETH)
December 10, 2007 Filing 207 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Anthony McKiethen (LESSER, SETH)
December 10, 2007 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Hershane Jones (LESSER, SETH)
December 10, 2007 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Chris Cronk (LESSER, SETH)
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 203 LETTER ORDER Telephone Conference set for 12/14/2007 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 12/07/2007. (nr, )
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER on informal application extending the parties deadline to submit discovery disputes pursuant to the Third Amended Pretrial scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 11/30/2007. (nr, )
December 7, 2007 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Randall Mueller (LESSER, SETH)
December 7, 2007 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Dennis A. Marn (LESSER, SETH)
December 6, 2007 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of ROBERTO LOPEZ (LESSER, SETH)
December 6, 2007 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Voke Uwamu (LESSER, SETH)
December 6, 2007 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Valerie Robinson (LESSER, SETH)
December 6, 2007 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Amy Crookson (LESSER, SETH)
December 6, 2007 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Kevin Cheng (LESSER, SETH)
December 5, 2007 Filing 195 Letter from Defendant's Counsel (Joint Discovery Letter). (SARAVAY, ADAM)
December 5, 2007 Filing 194 Letter from Plaintiff and Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8#9 Exhibit 9)(LESSER, SETH)
December 4, 2007 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Dustin Forbes (LESSER, SETH)
December 3, 2007 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Julie DeLuca (LESSER, SETH)
December 3, 2007 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Herbert Daye (LESSER, SETH)
November 29, 2007 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Melissa A. Smith (LESSER, SETH)
November 29, 2007 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Gary Loughman (LESSER, SETH)
November 29, 2007 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Zahid Mohammad (LESSER, SETH)
November 28, 2007 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jeffrey Ciotti (LESSER, SETH)
November 28, 2007 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Scott Wood (LESSER, SETH)
November 28, 2007 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Allan Winslow (LESSER, SETH)
November 28, 2007 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Branko Badurina (LESSER, SETH)
November 28, 2007 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of JAMES R. MATSUOKA (LESSER, SETH)
November 27, 2007 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number 200349393 re Todd M. Sorrell (nr, )
November 27, 2007 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Monica McDavid (LESSER, SETH)
November 27, 2007 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of James Ogles (LESSER, SETH)
November 27, 2007 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Ronald Hartley (LESSER, SETH)
November 26, 2007 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Bruce Backofen (LESSER, SETH)
November 26, 2007 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Norman Swiger (LESSER, SETH)
November 26, 2007 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Randall Smith (LESSER, SETH)
November 26, 2007 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Christopher Surdo (LESSER, SETH)
November 26, 2007 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jonathan Boone (LESSER, SETH)
November 26, 2007 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Iris Hamilton (LESSER, SETH)
November 21, 2007 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jason Meindl (LESSER, SETH)
November 21, 2007 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Paul Manzo (LESSER, SETH)
November 21, 2007 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Jeffrey Bland (LESSER, SETH)
November 21, 2007 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by SETH R. LESSER on behalf of Brett Stone (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 169 NOTICE by STEVEN R. YOUNGQUIST Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 168 NOTICE by RYAN TUCKER Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 167 NOTICE by KAREN ROCHA Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 166 NOTICE by RICHARD J. PHILLIPS Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 165 NOTICE by RAUL LOPEZ, JR. Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 164 NOTICE by EDMUNDO LOPEZ Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 163 NOTICE by MICHAEL KIRSCHBROWN Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 162 NOTICE by NATHAN HOURAMI Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 161 NOTICE by CHRISSY HAYFORD Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 160 NOTICE by CRAIG R. EDWARDS Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 159 NOTICE by KEVIN BRYANT Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 158 NOTICE by BRIAN BRIGHT Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 157 NOTICE by KELVIN WATKINS Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 156 NOTICE by GERALD B. WILKIE, JR. Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 155 NOTICE by VICKI WICKHAM Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 154 NOTICE by MICHAEL TROMAN Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 153 NOTICE by MARTIN ROMANOW Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 152 NOTICE by CHRISTOPHER A. RICKS Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 151 NOTICE by MICHAEL PEREZ Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 150 NOTICE by RAMON PEDRAZA Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 149 NOTICE by JAMES R. PAIGE, JR. Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 148 NOTICE by JANE NAHAS Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 147 NOTICE by STEPHEN KLEMASH Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 146 NOTICE by BRENDA C. JONES Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 145 NOTICE by TIM HUYGE Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 144 NOTICE by J. DAVID GRAYBEAL Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 143 NOTICE by N'GAI GEORGE Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 142 NOTICE by NOELIA DOMINGUEZ Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 141 NOTICE by JASON COWAN Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 140 NOTICE by EVAN COHEN Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 139 NOTICE by PAUL CHAUVIN Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 138 NOTICE by EDWARD CAMUS Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 137 NOTICE by JEREMY ANDERSON Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 136 NOTICE by VICTORIA TOMLINSON Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 135 NOTICE by COLSTON STEWART, IV. Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 134 NOTICE by BRYAN MOORE Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 133 NOTICE by JOSHUA MAILLOUX Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 132 NOTICE by DARRELL GAINES Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 131 NOTICE by CHRISTOPHER M. CARRIGAN Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 130 NOTICE by BRIAN SODER Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 129 NOTICE by CHRISTOPHER A. PERRY Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 128 NOTICE by TERRY WOMACK Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 127 NOTICE by DAVID P. WINTERS Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 126 NOTICE by MICHAEL WILLIAMS Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 125 NOTICE by AL WHITTON Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 124 NOTICE by MICHAEL WHEELER Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 123 NOTICE by SHAWN K. WELCH Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 122 NOTICE by DONNA WEEDER Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 121 NOTICE by RICHARD WEAVER Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 120 NOTICE by JON M. WALTON Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 119 NOTICE by DANIEL J. THIBODEAU Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 118 NOTICE by JEREMIAH UNDERHILL Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 117 NOTICE by NANCY TREON Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 116 NOTICE by JAMES H. THOMPSON Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 115 NOTICE by AMBER THOMPSON Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 114 NOTICE by ANDREW THERIAULT Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 113 NOTICE by BRADLEY A. RIVERA Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 112 NOTICE by FRANCISCO J. REAL Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 111 NOTICE by THOMAS PRITCHETT Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 110 NOTICE by RICK POHL Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 109 NOTICE by DHAVAL Y. PUROHIT Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 108 NOTICE by FRANCO PEDRAZA Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 107 NOTICE by CRAIG PAGLIUCA Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 106 NOTICE by BRAD OGDEN Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 105 NOTICE by SERG OCADIZ Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 104 NOTICE by CHRISTOPHER NOONAN Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 19, 2007 Filing 103 NOTICE by DEREK COOLEY JACKSON Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 102 NOTICE by LESLIE MURPHY, IV. Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 101 NOTICE by GILBERT MUNOZ Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 100 NOTICE by MARC MORGAN Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 99 NOTICE by MICHAEL MOREA Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 98 NOTICE by CHRISTOPHER MOLDEN Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 97 NOTICE by BRIAN E. MCNEILL Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 96 NOTICE by SCOTTIE R. MCDANIEL Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 95 NOTICE by SHANNAN E. MCCAUSLAND Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 94 NOTICE by JAMES R. MATSUOKA Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 93 NOTICE by JEAN K. MAHER Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 92 NOTICE by RICHARD LONG Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 91 NOTICE by JASON LOFTIS Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 90 NOTICE by TONI C. LEONARD Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 89 NOTICE by DARRELL C. LASSITER, JR. Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 88 NOTICE by SANDEEP KANWAL Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 87 NOTICE by DAN JAMES Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 86 NOTICE by HAMID BARADARVAR Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 16, 2007 Filing 85 NOTICE by CHRISTOPHER C. ADAMS Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 84 NOTICE by Michael D. Halasz Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 83 NOTICE by MARK GOLDMAN Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 82 NOTICE by Ivan Garris Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 81 NOTICE by Jeanna Foulke Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 80 NOTICE by Kevin Fitchett Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 79 NOTICE by Kimberly J. Cooper Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 78 NOTICE by Paula Condry Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 77 NOTICE by Andrew K.M. Chan Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 76 NOTICE by Tim Brewer Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 75 NOTICE by Daniel Bjoraker Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 74 NOTICE by CHRIS JOHNSON Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 73 NOTICE by Kent B. Douglas Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 72 NOTICE by Brent D. Conley Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 71 NOTICE by Brian M. Caruso Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 70 NOTICE by Ryan Blake Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 13, 2007 Filing 69 NOTICE by GREGORY F. BLAKE Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Todd M. Sorrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 11/07/2007. (nr, )
November 6, 2007 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Todd Sorrell (Revised Certification in Support) by STAPLES, INC.. (SARAVAY, ADAM)
November 1, 2007 Set Deadlines as to #66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Todd Sorrell, Esq.. Motion Hearing set for 11/26/2007 10:00 AM before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. (nr, ) (PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPES UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT)
October 30, 2007 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Todd Sorrell, Esq. by STAPLES, INC.. (SARAVAY, ADAM)
October 30, 2007 Filing 65 NOTICE by Billie Jo Bronson Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 64 NOTICE by Ann Caruolo Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 63 NOTICE by James Beddingfield Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 62 NOTICE by Manuel Archila Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 61 NOTICE by Steven Maniec Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 60 NOTICE by Jerry Herring Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 59 NOTICE by Deanna Guzman Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 58 NOTICE by Judith Garrick Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 57 NOTICE by Bertha Cartwright Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 56 NOTICE by Fred Asiebu Larbi Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 55 NOTICE by Mark Ghirarduzzi Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 54 NOTICE by Thomas Dyer Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 53 NOTICE by Brent Conley Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Filing 52 NOTICE by Edward Carter Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 30, 2007 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number 200347962 re Andrew P. Bell (nr, )
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER on informal application granting request to extend deadlne to raise unresolved discovery disputes and to complete fact discovery; THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 1/7/2008 04:00 PM before Judge Katharine S. Hayden.,Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/9/2008.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/25/2007. (nr, )
October 25, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patty Shwartz : Telephone Conference held on 10/25/2007. (aa, )
October 25, 2007 Filing 50 NOTICE by BRIAN BACA Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 25, 2007 Filing 49 NOTICE by DAVID BROUSSEAU Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 25, 2007 Filing 48 NOTICE by MATTHEW BROOKS Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 25, 2007 Filing 47 NOTICE by GREGORY BLAKE Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 25, 2007 Filing 46 NOTICE by JEFFREY BENNETT Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 25, 2007 Filing 45 NOTICE by JEREMY BIGGS Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 25, 2007 Filing 44 NOTICE by DUEWA NIKEMA BATSON Consent to Joint (LESSER, SETH)
October 25, 2007 Filing 43 NOTICE by Branko Badurina Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 25, 2007 Filing 42 NOTICE by NURYA ALVARENGA Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 25, 2007 Filing 41 NOTICE by JOSE AGUIRRE Consent to Join (LESSER, SETH)
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Andrew P. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/23/2007. (nr, )
October 22, 2007 Set Deadlines as to #39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion Hearing set for 11/26/2007 10:00 AM before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. (nr, ) (PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT)
October 22, 2007 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/25/2007 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.,Discovery due by 12/1/2007.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 10/03/2007. (nr, )
October 3, 2007 Filing 37 Letter from Seth R. Lesser. (LESSER, SETH)
September 11, 2007 Filing 36 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Fran L. Rudich to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (LESSER, SETH)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER on informal application that deft. shall provide a esponse to pltf's interrog. No. 2 for the period from 2/8/04 to present. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 7/30/2007. (mn, )
July 24, 2007 Filing 34 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN Request by Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Attorney to Receive Electronic Notification - Mason (LESSER, SETH)
July 24, 2007 Filing 33 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN Request by Local Counsel for Pro Hac Vice Attorney to Receive Electronic Notification - Barnett (LESSER, SETH)
July 20, 2007 Filing 32 Letter from Adam Saravay. (SARAVAY, ADAM)
July 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER on informal application denying request regarding discovery and directing the parties to meet and confer to attempt to resolve the dispute embodied in the letter. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 07/17/2007. (nr, )
July 17, 2007 Filing 30 Letter from Adam N. Saravay. (SARAVAY, ADAM)
July 17, 2007 Filing 29 Letter from Gary E. Mason. (MASON, GARY)
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order on informal application granting request to extend discovery; AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/25/2007 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.,Discovery due by 12/1/2007.,Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/9/2007.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 07/11/2007. (nr, )
July 11, 2007 Filing 27 Letter from Adam Saravay of McCarter & English, LLP. (HANNAN, LISA)
July 10, 2007 Filing 26 Letter from Fran L. Rudich. (LESSER, SETH)
June 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER on Informal Application re: Discovery PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 6/29/07. (jd, )
June 28, 2007 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT/Certification in support of discovery confidentiality order by STAPLES, INC.. (HANNAN, LISA)
June 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/25/2007 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz., Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2008 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.,Discovery due by 7/27/2007.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 06/15/2007. (nr, )
June 15, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patty Shwartz : Scheduling Conference held on 6/15/2007. (aa, )
June 11, 2007 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number 200345652 re Robert W. Fischer (nr, )
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Gary E. Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of pltf.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 6/6/2007. (mn, )
June 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Alexander E. Barnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of pltf.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 6/6/2007. (mn, )
June 5, 2007 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alexander E. Barnett by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
June 5, 2007 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gary E. Mason by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
May 9, 2007 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HANNAN, LISA)
May 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER ORDER re #15 Order Rescheduling Conference from 6/1/07 to 6/15/2007 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz etc. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 5/1/07. (cs, )
April 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 6/1/2007 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 4/23/07. (aa, )
April 23, 2007 Filing 14 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN of Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1) (LESSER, SETH)
April 19, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patty Shwartz : Telephone Conference held on 4/19/2007. (aa, )
April 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER scheduling a Rule 16 conference for June 1, 2007 at 10:00a.m., a joint discovery plan shall be submitted on May 22, 2007 at 4:00p.m. etc.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 04/19/2007. (nr, )
April 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER ORDER: scheduling a Telephone Conference for 4/19/2007 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 4/17/2007. (mn, )
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Robert W. Fischer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 04/12/2007. (nr, )
April 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 4/12/07. (rg, )
April 11, 2007 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Plaintiff's Second Claim for Relief by STAPLES, INC..Responses due by 4/30/2007 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Strike Plaintiff's Second Claim for Relief#2 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Second Claim for Relief#3 Certificate of Service)(SARAVAY, ADAM)
March 30, 2007 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Adam N. Saravay, Esq., in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice#2 Certification of Robert W. Fischer, Jr., Esq., In Support of His Pro Hac Vice Application#3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice#4 Certificate of Service)(HANNAN, LISA)
March 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to FRAN L. RUDICH, ESQ.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 3/29/07. (DD, )
March 29, 2007 Filing 7 NOTICE by RONALD STILLMAN Notice of Consent (LESSER, SETH)
March 28, 2007 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2007 10:00 AM before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. (nr, ) (PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT)
March 28, 2007 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
March 26, 2007 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RONALD STILLMAN. STAPLES, INC. served on 3/7/2007, answer due 3/27/2007. (LESSER, SETH)
March 23, 2007 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer - Document 4 submitted by L. HANNAN on 03/21/2007 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/11/2007. (nr, )
March 21, 2007 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney ADAM N. SARAVAY and LISA M. HANNAN for STAPLES, INC., PAMELA J. MOORE and LISA M. HANNAN for STAPLES, INC., LISA M. HANNAN and LISA M. HANNAN for STAPLES, INC. added. (HANNAN, LISA)
February 26, 2007 Filing 3 STATEMENT Consent to Be a Party Plaintiff by RONALD STILLMAN. (LESSER, SETH)
February 21, 2007 ATTENTION COUNSEL - As of May 1, 2006, Civil initial pleadings such as complaints and notices of removal must be filed electronically. Payment of the filing fee is made via the internet (pay.gov). Visit our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for additional information. In the future, to expedite the processing of the initial pleadings, counsel is requested to file complaints and notices of removal electronically. (ld, )
February 21, 2007 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to STAPLES, INC..Days Due - 20.MLD TO COUNSEL 2/21/07 (ld, )
February 21, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STAPLES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 343872.) jury demand, filed by RONALD STILLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter#2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STILLMAN v. STAPLES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison H. Rubin
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Douthilt
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER AGOSTINO
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jignes A. Jain
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBER WEBB
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMIAH UNDERHILL
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PEREZ
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew D. Heinly
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL DELUCA
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Stines
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES R. MATSUOKA
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Porter
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Gallo
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Goldberg
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER SURDO
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELE TOWNSEND
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN E. MCNEILL
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Merizalde
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO J. REAL
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April B. Parchision
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH SAUNDERS
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Swanger
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Nash
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton R. Baker, Jr.
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hardat Pariag
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERSHANE JONES
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Michael
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN T. GARLAND
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERBERT DAYE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred J. Overing
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNE R. ZIPPRIAN
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON PALMER
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Rerd
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Lichtefeld
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Clinton
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig S. Phillips
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW BROOKS
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES J. MURRAY
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis A. Viola
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher R. Wagner
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blyeshia D. Kemp
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY CIOTTI
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC MORGAN
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Wing
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Polaski
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelli Maze
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS KURN
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA DENNIS
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald T. Reichett
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMED SAMB
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID P. ESTES
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis McPherson
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric McAfee
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Seltz
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY TREON
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DAVID HENRY
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Thomas
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Michael Weinstein
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD B. WILKIE, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger A. Chambers
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON M. WALTON
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Murawski
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS DYER
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY WOMACK
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNAN E. MCCAUSLAND
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg G. Mauch
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP ANDREOTTI
Represented By: MICHAEL A. GALPERN
Represented By: SETH RICHARD LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt |