MARS, INC. v. NATRACEUTICAL, S.A. et al Featured Case

Mars, Inc. alleges that Natraceutical, S.A. and Natra U.S., Inc. infringed certain patents held by Mars concerning the production of cocoa with enriched polyphenol content, which purportedly conveys vascular health benefits to consumers of chocolate.

Plaintiff: MARS, INC.
Defendant: NATRACEUTICAL, S.A.
Movant: KENNETH JUREK, DANIEL N. CHRISTUS, STEPHEN T. SCHERER and LINDA A.O. LAMBERSON
Counter Claimant: NATRACEUTICAL, S.A.
Counter Defendant: MARS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2007cv01574
Filed: April 3, 2007
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Newark Office
County: Middlesex
Referring Judge: Patty Shwartz
Presiding Judge: Stanley R. Chesler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2007 42 Opinion or Order of the Court
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2009 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.,Discovery due by 11/24/2008.,Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/24/2009; etc.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 9/25/07. (DD, )
September 10, 2007 39 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER withdrawing re 5 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction filed by MARS, INC.. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 9/7/07. (DD, )
August 22, 2007 38
Letter from John M. Agnello. (AGNELLO, JOHN)
August 16, 2007 37 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER amending briefing schedule on the Court's 4/26/07 Order.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 8/9/07. (DD, )
August 14, 2007 36 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER ON INFORMAL APPL. granting pro hac vice appl. as to XAVIER RUIZ, ESQ.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 8/13/07. (DD, )
August 8, 2007 34 Opinion or Order of the Court
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 7/26/07. (DD, )
July 31, 2007 33 Opinion or Order of the Court
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 7/26/07. (DD, )
July 23, 2007 32 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER ON INFORMAL APPLICATION RE: disputes concerning two portions of the proposed discovery confidentiality order, & indicating a revised discovery confidentiality order shall be submitted no later than 7/26/07; etc. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 7/23/07. (sr, )
July 20, 2007 31 Opinion or Order of the Court
LETTER ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 7/23/2007 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 7/20/07. (DD, )
July 3, 2007 30 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER N INFORMAL APPL. that the request for court-intervention in connection w/the matters set forth in the letters dated 6/25/07 & 6/26/07 are deemed WITHDRAWN.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 7/2/07. (DD, )
June 27, 2007 29 Opinion or Order of the Court
LETTER-ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 7/2/2007 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 6/26/07. (DD, )
June 11, 2007 26
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 26, 2007 before Judge Shwartz. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, )
June 6, 2007 25
ANSWER to Counterclaim by MARS, INC..(FLAX, MELISSA)
May 24, 2007 24 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING deft., NATRA U.S., INC. w/out prejudice.. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 5/23/07. (DD, )
May 17, 2007 23
ANSWER to Complaint , Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM and Jury Demand against MARS, INC. by NATRACEUTICAL, S.A..(PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
May 11, 2007 21 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER ON INFORMAL APPL. that the appl. for the pro hac vice admission of RAJA N. SALIBA, ESQ., MARK BOLAND, ESQ. GORDON KIT, ESQ. & MICHAEL R. DZWONCZYK, ESQ.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 5/10/07. (DD, )
May 9, 2007 20
Certification of Michael E. Patunas (CORRECTED) on behalf of NATRACEUTICAL, S.A., NATRA U.S., INC.. (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
May 4, 2007 18
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kenneth J. Jurek, Daniel N. Christus, Stephen T. Scherrer, Linda A.O. Lamberson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (AGNELLO, JOHN)
May 2, 2007 17 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting re 16 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to KENNETH J. JUREK, ESQ. DANIEL N. CHRISTUS, ESQ. STEPHEN T. SCHERRER, ESQ. & LINDA A.O. LAMBERSON, ESQ. filed by MARS, INC.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 5/1/07. (DD, )
April 27, 2007 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
SCHEDULING ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 9/25/2007 09:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 10 before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 4/27/07. (aa, )
April 24, 2007 13
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to NATRACEUTICAL, S.A. (CORRECTED). Attorney MICHAEL E. PATUNAS and MICHAEL E. PATUNAS for NATRACEUTICAL, S.A. and NATRA U.S., INC. added. (PATUNAS, MICHAEL)
April 23, 2007 11 Opinion or Order of the Court
LETTER-ORDER Telephone Status Conference set for 4/26/2007 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.. Signed by Judge Patty Shwartz on 4/20/07. (DD, )
April 18, 2007 10
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to NATRA U.S., Inc.. Attorney ALLYN ZISSEL LITE and ALLYN ZISSEL LITE for NATRACEUTICAL, S.A. and NATRA U.S., INC., MICHAEL E. PATUNAS and ALLYN ZISSEL LITE for NATRACEUTICAL, S.A.,NATRA U.S., INC., JASON ELLIOT MACIAS and ALLYN ZISSEL LITE for NATRACEUTICAL, S.A.,NATRA U.S., INC. added. (LITE, ALLYN)
April 17, 2007 9
Certification of of Service (Amended) on behalf of MARS, INC.. (FLAX, MELISSA)
April 16, 2007 8
MOTION for Order to Show Cause Application for Order to Show Cause relating to Docket Entry 5 by MARS, INC.. (FLAX, MELISSA)
April 12, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court
LETTER ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Claire C. Cecchi recused. Case reassigned to Judge Patty Shwartz for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/12/07. (sr, )
April 5, 2007 3
NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA E. FLAX on behalf of MARS, INC. (FLAX, MELISSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARS, INC. v. NATRACEUTICAL, S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARS, INC.
Represented By: MELISSA E. FLAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATRACEUTICAL, S.A.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. PATUNAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: KENNETH JUREK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: DANIEL N. CHRISTUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: STEPHEN T. SCHERER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: LINDA A.O. LAMBERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: NATRACEUTICAL, S.A.
Represented By: MICHAEL E. PATUNAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: MARS, INC.
Represented By: MELISSA E. FLAX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?