RSA ENTERPRISES et al v. RIP-OFF REPORT.COM et al Featured Case

Plaintiff, a building contractor, sued Ripoff Report for posting an an allegedly defamatory and libelous statement on its website from an unsatisfied customer. Plaintiff also sued Google for add the web page to its directory.

Plaintiff: RSA ENTERPRISES and RAFFI ARSLANIAN
Defendant: RIP-OFF REPORT.COM and GOOGLE.COM
Case Number: 2:2007cv01882
Filed: April 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Sussex
Presiding Judge: Harold A. Ackerman
Presiding Judge: Esther Salas
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND ORDER, w/out prejudice & w/out costs. Signed by Judge Harold A. Ackerman on 8/2/07. (dc, )
August 2, 2007 Filing 3
AMENDED COMPLAINT Stipulation of Dismissal against all defendants all defendants., filed by RAFFI ARSLANIAN.(OLEAR, CONRAD)
April 24, 2007 Filing 2
Summons Issued as to RIP-OFF REPORT.COM, GOOGLE.COM.Days Due - 20. MLD TO COUNSEL 4/24/07(dr, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2007 (dr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RSA ENTERPRISES et al v. RIP-OFF REPORT.COM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RSA ENTERPRISES
Represented By: WILLIAM I STRASSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAFFI ARSLANIAN
Represented By: WILLIAM I STRASSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIP-OFF REPORT.COM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOGLE.COM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?