COOPER v. AETNA HEALTH INC. PA, CORP. et al
Plaintiff: MICHELE COOPER
Defendant: AETNA HEALTH INC. PA, CORP., AETNA HEALTH MANAGEMENT, LLC, AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AETNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AETNA HEALTH INC. and AETNA INSURANCE COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT
Case Number: 2:2007cv03541
Filed: July 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Faith S. Hochberg
Presiding Judge: Patty Shwartz
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 ORDER granting 979 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 995 Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part 996 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 6/30/15. (rg, )
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 899 OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 8/30/13. (rg, )
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 868 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 4/15/13. (sr, )
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER Ordered that, NPSC may move before this Court for a suggestion of remand to the transferor District Court, the Central District of California, within 30 days of this Order, etc., Signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg on 11/18/10. (dc, )
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER ON INFORMAL APPLICATION & SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2008 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz; Final Pretrial Order shall be delivered to Chambers no later than 11/9/08@4:00 PM etc. setting various Telephone Status Conferences for various dates @ 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patty Shwartz on 9/10/08. (cs, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COOPER v. AETNA HEALTH INC. PA, CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELE COOPER
Represented By: BARRY M. EPSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA HEALTH INC. PA, CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA HEALTH MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA HEALTH INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA INSURANCE COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?