HARPER et al v. LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Plaintiff: JASON HARPER and GINA HARPER
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2008cv00051
Filed: January 4, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Faith S. Hochberg
Presiding Judge: Patty Shwartz
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 331 OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg on 7/10/13. (sr, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 OPINION AND ORDER that pltfs' 281 supplemental witness disclosures & Declarations are excluded and stricken from the record; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/4/11. (sr, )
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 LETTER OPINION AND ORDER that deft's request for production of Pltfs' retainer agreements is denied; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/29/10. (sr, )
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION/ORDER regarding expert discovery; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/31/09. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARPER et al v. LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON HARPER
Represented By: DANIEL B. SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINA HARPER
Represented By: DANIEL B. SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG ELECTRONICS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?