OPALINSKI et al v. ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. et al
Plaintiff: DAVID OPALINSKI and JAMES MCCABE
Defendant: ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. and ROBERT HALF CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2010cv02069
Filed: April 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Susan D. Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION. Signed by Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 11/19/2015. (nr, )
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 OPINION AND ORDER denying deft's 68 Motion to Vacate the partial final award on clause construction issued on 5/31/2012. Signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg on 12/3/2012. (nr, )
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 OPINION AND ORDER granting deft's 54 Motion to Compel arbitration and dismiss ; denying as moot plf's 55 Motion to facilitate notice of potential pltfs. informing them of their right to opt-into this case under the FLSA. Signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg on 10/6/2011. (nr, )
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 LETTER ORDER granting pltf's request to extend briefing schedule on pending motions for a period of 14 days. Signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg on 07/21/2011. (nr, )
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION AND ORDER affirming the order dated 10/14/2010 of Mag. Judge Arleo for pro hac vice admission of Liss-Riordan. Signed by Susan D. Wigenton on 03/18/2011. (nr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OPALINSKI et al v. ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID OPALINSKI
Represented By: ANTHONY L. MARCHETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MCCABE
Represented By: ANTHONY L. MARCHETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT HALF INTERNATIONAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT HALF CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?