BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. v. BIOGEN IDEC INC.
Plaintiff: BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Defendant: PFIZER INC., BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., BIOGEN IDEC INC., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. and Ares Trading S.A.
Counter Claimant: EMD SERONO, INC. and BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
In Re: In re Biogen '755 Patent Litigation
Not Classified By Court: STEPHEN M. GREENBERG
Case Number: 2:2010cv02734
Filed: May 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Passaic
Presiding Judge: Claire C Cecchi
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 1106 ERRATA to the Precedential Opinion re #1060 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (dam)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1105 FEDERAL CIRCUIT JUDGMENT as to #1060 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). REVERSED AND REMANDED. Terminated on the merits after oral argument. COSTS: Costs taxed against Appellee(s). Mandate to issue in due course. (dam)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1104 FEDERAL CIRCUIT OPINION filed for the court by Newman, Circuit Judge; Linn, Circuit Judge and Hughes, Circuit Judge. etc.(dam)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1103 Letter from Thomas K. Murphy III requesting withdrawal of appearance of Kyle Thomason, Esq. as pro hac vice counsel. (MURPHY, THOMAS)
March 24, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, AMIT H THAKORE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (lag, )
March 23, 2020 Filing 1102 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Amit H. Thakore, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10592118.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 ORDER granting #1100 Application for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Amit H. Thakore. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 3/20/2020. (ams, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 1100 APPLICATION/PETITION for admission pro hac vice of Amit H. Thakore for by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #2 Declaration of Amit H. Thakore, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 ORDER granting #1098 Letter requesting the withdrawal of pro hac vice counsel Leon Miniovich. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 3/17/2020. (ams, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 1098 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier, Esq. to the Honorable Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. requesting withdrawal of appearance of Leon Miniovich, Esq. as counsel pro hac vice. re #374 Order. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1097 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 9, 2011, before Judge Claire C Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter Agency due, but not filed, by 12/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2020. (bt, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1096 Transcript of Post- Trial Motions held on June 6, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 9/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2019. (vm)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 ORDER granting #1094 Defendant's Letter requesting the withdrawal of ROBERT E. COUNIHAN as counsel pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/24/2019. (dam, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 1094 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier, Esq. to the Honorable Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. requesting withdrawal of appearance of Robert E. Counihan, Esq. as counsel pro hac vice. re #540 Order. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ORDER granting #1091 Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eileen Woo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/2/2019. (byl)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 ORDER granting #1085 Motion to Redact and Seal #1048 Transcript, #1049 Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/2/2019. (byl)
April 15, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #1091 Consolidated Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Withdrawal of Appearance of Pro Hac Vice Counsel Eileen Woo. Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 1091 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Withdrawal of Appearance of Pro Hac Vice Counsel Eileen Woo by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Erez J. Davy in Support of Motion to Permit Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Counsel Eileen Woo, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DAVY, EREZ)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1090 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1089 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re Status Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held on 1/29/2019 (not held on the record). (jl, ) .
January 25, 2019 Filing 1088 APPLICATION/PETITION for admission pro hac vice of Mark A. Perry, Esq. for by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, Esq., #2 Declaration of Mark A. Perry, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 TEXT ORDER - A status conference call is scheduled for JANUARY 29, 2019, at 12:00 p.m. before the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi. (Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call). SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/25/19. (jl, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 1086 Federal Circuit Order filed re (1060 in 2:10-cv-02734-CCC-MF) Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). Within 14 days of the date of filing of this order, Serono is directed to show cause as to why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Biogen may respond within 7 days thereafter. The briefing schedule is stayed. (Per Curiam). (dam, )
January 17, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #1085 Consent MOTION to Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording #1048 Transcript, #1049 Transcript, . Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 1085 Consent MOTION to Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording #1048 Transcript, #1049 Transcript, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 2, 2019 Filing 1084 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to STEPHEN M. GREENBERG (Attachments: #1 Attached Undeliverable Mail) (dam, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 1083 Transcript of Proceedings - Excerpt of Trial - held on January 18, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 12/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2019. (jml, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 1082 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial (AM Session) held on February 13, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 1081 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial (AM Session) held on February 20, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 1080 **SEALED** Transcript of Proceedings held on January 31, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 1079 **SEALED** Transcript of Pretrial Hearing held on January 18, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 1078 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #1077 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1077 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #1076 Letter. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1076 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #1070 Letter, #1071 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1075 APPLICATION/PETITION for admission pro hac vice of Ayelet M. Evrony for by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John D. Tortorella, #2 Certification of Ayelet M. Evrony, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1074 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #1072 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1073 Notice of Docketing re #1060 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). Received by Federal Circuit on 10/23/2018. Entry of Appearance due 11/13/2018. Certificate of Interest due 11/13/2018. Docketing Statement due 11/13/2018. Appellants' brief due 12/31/2018. (dam, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 1072 Letter from Robert M. Goodman. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1071 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #1070 Letter. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1070 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #1069 Order,. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1069 PARTIAL JUDGMENT: Entering Judgment in favor of Plaintiff Biogen and against Defendants Serono and Pfizer on certain issues; the Court will schedule a jury trial to determine the amount of damages owed to Biogen, followed by a jury trial of all issues between Biogen and Bayer and Novartis; and conditionally granting a new trial. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/26/2018. (jr)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1068 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #1064 Amended Document, #1066 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 ORDER granting Plaintiff's re #1063 Letter request to unseal D.E. #1058 Letter, etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/24/18. (mfg, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 1066 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1065 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #1064 Amended Document. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1064 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Amendment to #1061 Letter . (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 20, 2018 Filing 1063 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #1058 Letter,,. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1061 Letter from Robert M. Goodman. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1062 REDACTED Transcript of Proceedings held on August 11, 2017, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 11/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2019. (jml, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 1060 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Federal Circuit as to #1044 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-9078186. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1059 UNSEALED OPINION as to DE #1043 . Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 9/28/18. (cm, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 1058 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 18, 2018 Filing 1057 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1056 **SEALED** Transcript of TRIAL - PM SESSION - held on February 20, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter Jackie Kashmer (908-200-1040). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (mfr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1055 **SEALED** Transcript of TRIAL - PM SESSION - held on February 15, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter Jackie Kashmer (908-200-1040). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (mfr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1054 **SEALED** Transcript of TRIAL - PM SESSION held on February 14, 2018, before Judge Cliare C. Cecchi. Court Reporter Jackie Kashmer (908-200-1040). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (mfr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1053 **SEALED** Transcript of TRIAL - PM SESSION - held on February 13, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter Jackie Kashmer (908-200-1040). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (mfr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1052 **SEALED** Transcript of TRIAL - PM SESSION - held on February 8, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter Jackie Kashmer (908-200-1040). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (mfr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1051 **SEALED** Transcript of TRIAL - PM SESSION held on February 7, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter Jackie Kashmer (908-200-1040). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (mfr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1050 **SEALED** Transcript of TRIAL - PM SESSION - held on February 6, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter Jackie Kashmer (908-200-1040). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (mfr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1049 **SEALED** Transcript of TRIAL - PM SESSION - held on February 1, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter Jackie Kashmer (908-200-1040). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (mfr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1048 **SEALED** Transcript of TRIAL - PM SESSION held on January 29, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter Jackie Kashmer (908-200-1040). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (mfr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1047 **SEALED** Transcript of TRIAL - PM SESSION held on January 26, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter Jackie Kashmer (908-200-1040). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (mfr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1046 **SEALED** Transcript of TRIAL - PM SESSION held on January 25, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter Jackie Kashmer (908-200-1040). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (mfr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1045 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial - PM SESSION - held on January 23, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter/Transcriber Jackie Kashmer (908-200-1040). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (mfr)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 ORDER re Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law #980 & #982 . Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 9/7/18. (jl, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 1043 SEALED OPINION. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 9/7/18. (jl, )
September 4, 2018 Transcript Sealed D.E. #751 Per Order D.E. #854 (cm, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1042 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial Verdict held on February 23, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1041 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial Summations and Deliberations held on February 22, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1040 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial Jury Charge Conference held on February 16, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1039 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial AM Session held on February 15, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1038 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial AM Session held on February 7, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1037 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial AM Session held on February 6, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1036 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial held on February 5, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1035 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial held on February 2, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1034 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial AM Session held on January 25, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1033 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial [Colloquy an Jury Charge] held on February 21, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1032 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial AM Session held on February 14, 2017, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1031 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial AM and PM Sessions held on February 9, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1030 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial AM Session / Partial PM Session held on February 8, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, ).
August 6, 2018 Filing 1029 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial AM Session held on January 29, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1028 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial AM Session held on January 26, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 1027 **SEALED** Transcript of Trial AM Session held on January 23, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing. (jml, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 1026 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to STEPHEN M. GREENBERG (ld, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 1025 UNSEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re #906 Opinion, Order.
July 26, 2018 Filing 1024 UNSEALED OPINION re #892 Opinion.
July 26, 2018 Filing 1023 REDACTED OPINION re #884 Opinion.
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 ORDER granting #1021 Motion to Withdraw as pro hac vice Attorney for Bayer. Marta Chlistunoff, Esq. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 7/20/18. (cm, )
July 16, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #1021 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Pro Hac Vice Attorney, Marta Chlistunoff. Motion set for 8/6/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, )
July 12, 2018 Filing 1021 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Pro Hac Vice Attorney, Marta Chlistunoff by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Thomas K. Murphy III, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 FINDINGS OF FACT AND ORDER granting #1007 Motion to Seal Document #989 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 7/11/18. (cm, )
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 ORDER granting #1005 Motion to Seal Seal Exhibits Supporting the Parties' Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 7/11/18. (cm, )
June 29, 2018 Filing 1018 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #1017 Letter, #1011 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
June 25, 2018 Filing 1017 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #1011 Letter. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 ORDER granting #1013 Motion to Withdraw the appearance of pro hac vice counsel as to Eric Wiener, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 6/22/18. (cm, )
June 21, 2018 Filing 1015 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., re #1010 Letter, #1014 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
June 19, 2018 Filing 1014 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #1010 Letter,. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
June 18, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #1013 MOTION to Withdraw #62 Order MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of pro hac vice attorney, Eric Wiener, Esq.. Motion set for 7/16/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, )
June 15, 2018 Filing 1013 MOTION to Withdraw #62 Order , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of pro hac vice attorney, Eric Wiener, Esq. by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Thomas K. Murphy III)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
June 15, 2018 Filing 1012 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #1011 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
June 15, 2018 Filing 1011 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. regarding discarded invalidity defenses. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
June 12, 2018 Filing 1010 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., Submitting Supplemental Authority in Opposition re #982 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPTO Memorandum Regarding Recent Subject Matter Eligibility Decision, #2 Exhibit Pernix Ireland Pain DAC v. Alvogen Malta Ops.)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
June 6, 2018 Filing 1009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2018 re #980 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., #982 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by PFIZER INC., EMD SERONO, INC. ORDERED decision reserved. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
May 31, 2018 Filing 1008 NOTICE by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #62 Order Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Eric Wiener (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
May 25, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #1007 MOTION to Seal Document #989 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, . Motion set for 6/18/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, )
May 24, 2018 Filing 1007 MOTION to Seal Document #989 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Tortorella, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
May 24, 2018 Filing 1006 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to The Honorable Mark Falk, U.S.M.J. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
May 24, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #1005 MOTION to Seal Exhibits Supporting the Parties' Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Motion set for 6/18/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, )
May 23, 2018 Filing 1005 MOTION to Seal Exhibits Supporting the Parties' Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
May 9, 2018 Filing 1004 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #980 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial re #1003 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
May 9, 2018 Filing 1003 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #980 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
May 9, 2018 Filing 1002 BRIEF Reply In Support of Rule 50(b) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine L. Ranney, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit STX-0001, #18 Exhibit STX-0002, #19 Exhibit STX-0014, #20 Exhibit STX-0019, #21 Exhibit STX-0023, #22 Exhibit STX-0053, #23 Exhibit STX-0054, #24 Exhibit PTX-0384)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 FINDING OF FACTS AND ORDER granting #889 Motion to Seal portions of Biogens December 20, 2017 letter requesting a Rule 104 hearing and Exhibit Nos. 1-7 (ECF No. 879) and portions of Seronos December 22, 2017 letter response to Biogens Request for a Rule 104 Hearing and Exhibit Nos. 2-6 (ECF No. 881). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/2/18. (cm, )
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 FINDING OF FACTS AND ORDER granting #869 Motion to Seal Document 774 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,, 846 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, 794 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, 780 Brief in Opposition to Opposition to Motion,, 825 Certification in Support of Motion,,,,,, 829 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, 830 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, 863 Letter,, 761 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, 848 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/2/18. (cm, )
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 999 ORDER granting #868 Motion to Seal Document 774 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,, 846 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, 794 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, 780 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, 837 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, 849 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, 825 Certification in Support of Motion,,,,,, 829 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, 830 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, 863 Letter,, 761 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, 848 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/2/18. (cm, )
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 998 FINDINGS OF FACTS AND ORDER granting #816 Motion to Seal to portions of Seronos October 26, 2017 letter to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. 739. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/2/18. (cm, )
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 997 FINDINGS OF FACT AND ORDER Granting #867 Motion to Seal by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/2/18. (cm, )
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 996 FINDINGS OF FACT AND ORDER Granting #854 Motion to Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording 751 Transcript,,, of Summary Judgment Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/2/18. (cm, )
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 995 FINDINGS OF FACT AND ORDER Granting #822 Motion to Redact 753 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/2/18. (cm,)
April 26, 2018 Filing 993 REDACTION to #990 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,,, for Judgment as a Matter of Law by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex. 5, #6 Ex. 6, #7 Ex. 7, #8 Ex. 8, #9 Ex. 9, #10 Ex. 10, #11 Ex. 11, #12 Ex. 12, #13 Ex. 13, #14 Ex. 14, #15 Ex. 15, #16 Ex. 16, #17 Ex. 17, #18 Ex. 18, #19 Ex. 19, #20 Ex. 20, #21 Ex. 21, #22 Ex. 22, #23 Ex. 23, #24 Ex. 24, #25 Ex. 25, #26 Ex. 26, #27 Ex. 27, #28 Ex. 28, #29 Ex. 29.1, #30 Ex. 29.2, #31 Ex. 30, #32 Ex. 31, #33 Ex. 32, #34 Ex. 33, #35 Ex. 34, #36 Ex. 35, #37 Ex. 36, #38 Ex. 37, #39 Ex. 38, #40 Ex. 39, #41 Ex. 40, #42 Ex. 41, #43 Ex. 42, #44 Ex. 43)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
April 26, 2018 Filing 992 REDACTION to #989 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, for Judgment as a Matter of Law by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
April 25, 2018 Filing 994 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on December 15, 2017, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (mfr)
April 25, 2018 Filing 991 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #980 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christine L. Ranney, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit PTX0059 (Excerpt), #30 Exhibit PTX0061 (Excerpt), #31 Exhibit PTX0227 (Excerpt), #32 Exhibit PTX0567 (Excerpt), #33 Exhibit PTX0582, #34 Exhibit PTX0659 (Excerpt), #35 Exhibit PTX0753, #36 Exhibit PTX1047, #37 Exhibit STX-0001, #38 Exhibit STX-0002, #39 Exhibit STX-0976R, #40 Exhibit STX-1078, #41 Exhibit STX-1259, #42 Exhibit STX-1314, #43 Exhibit STX-1439, #44 Exhibit STX-1587, #45 Exhibit STX-1596, #46 Exhibit STX-1810)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
April 25, 2018 Filing 990 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #982 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex. 5, #6 Ex. 6, #7 Ex. 7, #8 Ex. 8, #9 Ex. 9, #10 Ex. 10, #11 Ex, 11, #12 Ex. 12, #13 Ex. 13, #14 Ex. 14, #15 Ex. 15, #16 Ex. 16, #17 Ex. 17, #18 Ex. 18, #19 Ex. 19, #20 Ex. 20, #21 Ex. 21, #22 Ex. 22, #23 Ex. 23, #24 Ex. 24, #25 Ex. 25, #26 Ex. 26, #27 Ex. 27, #28 Ex. 28, #29 Ex. 29.1, #30 Ex. 29.2, #31 Ex. 30, #32 Ex. 31, #33 Ex. 32, #34 Ex. 33, #35 Ex. 34, #36 Ex. 35, #37 Ex. 36, #38 Ex. 37, #39 Ex. 38, #40 Ex. 39, #41 Ex. 40, #42 Ex. 41, #43 Ex. 42, #44 Ex. 43)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 25, 2018 Filing 989 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #982 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 988 TEXT ORDER ORAL ARGUMENT on the Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law (ECF Nos. 980, 982) shall be heard on Wednesday, June 6, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. before the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi in Courtroom 5B. SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/24/18. (jl, )
April 24, 2018 Filing 987 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #986 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Partial Judgment)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
April 18, 2018 Filing 986 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
March 26, 2018 Filing 985 REDACTION to #983 Brief,, in Support of Rule 50(b) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
March 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #982 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , #980 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial. Motion set for 4/16/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
March 23, 2018 Filing 983 BRIEF In Support of Serono's Rule 50(b) Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law #982 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PTX0846, #2 Exhibit STX-0166, #3 Exhibit STX-0946)(DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 23, 2018 Filing 982 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. Responses due by 4/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine L. Ranney, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit PTX0003 (excerpted), #26 Exhibit PTX0509, #27 Exhibit STX-0001, #28 Exhibit STX-0002, #29 Exhibit STX-0018, #30 Exhibit STX-0019, #31 Exhibit STX-0040, #32 Exhibit STX-0043, #33 Exhibit STX-0053, #34 Exhibit STX-0054, #35 Exhibit STX-0122, #36 Exhibit STX-0344, #37 Exhibit STX-0553, #38 Exhibit STX-0573, #39 Exhibit STX-0574, #40 Exhibit STX-0575, #41 Exhibit STX-0577, #42 Exhibit STX-0578, #43 Exhibit STX-0581, #44 Exhibit STX-0582 (excerpted), #45 Exhibit STX-0583, #46 Exhibit STX-0584, #47 Exhibit STX-0701, #48 Exhibit STX-1188, #49 Exhibit STX-1408, #50 Exhibit STX-1422, #51 Exhibit STX-1596, #52 Exhibit STX-1740, #53 Exhibit STX-1796 (excerpted), #54 Exhibit STX-1810, #55 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
March 23, 2018 Filing 981 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #980 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 23, 2018 Filing 980 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. Responses due by 4/25/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 15, 2018 Filing 984 Transcript of Pretrial Conference held on January 11, 2018, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 4/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2018. (mfr)
February 28, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MARTA CHLISTUNOFF, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, )
February 28, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Magistrate Judge James B. Clark no longer assigned to the case. (ak, )
February 27, 2018 Filing 979 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Marta Chlistunoff to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 23, 2018 Filing 978 JURY VERDICT (Unredacted). (jl, )
February 23, 2018 Filing 977 JURY VERDICT (Redacted). (jl, )
February 23, 2018 Filing 976 Jury Notes 3-7 (Redacted). (jl, )
February 23, 2018 Filing 975 Jury Notes 3-7 (Unredacted). (jl, ).
February 23, 2018 Filing 974 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial completed on 2/23/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 973 Jury Note 2 (Unredacted). (jl, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 972 Jury Note 2 (Redacted). (jl, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 971 Jury Note 1 (Unredacted). (jl, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 970 Jury Note 1 (Redacted). (jl, ) .
February 22, 2018 Filing 969 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/22/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
February 21, 2018 Filing 968 Final Jury Instructions. (jl, )
February 21, 2018 Filing 967 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/21/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
February 20, 2018 Filing 966 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/20/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI (AM) & JACKIE KASHMER (PM)) (jl, )
February 16, 2018 Filing 965 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/16/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
February 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOSH A. KREVITT, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, )
February 15, 2018 Filing 964 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/15/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI (AM) & JACKIE KASHMER (PM)) (jl, ).
February 15, 2018 Filing 963 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Josh A. Krevitt to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8481101.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 962 ORDER granting re #960 Application/Petition for pro hac vice admission as to JOSH KREVITT, ESQ. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/14/18. (DD, )
February 14, 2018 Filing 961 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/14/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI (AM) & JACKIE KASHMER (PM)) (jl, )
February 14, 2018 Filing 960 APPLICATION/PETITION for admission pro hac vice of Josh A. Krevitt for by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #2 Declaration of Josh Krevitt, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
February 13, 2018 Filing 959 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/13/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI (AM) & JACKIE KASHMER (PM)) (jl, )
February 9, 2018 Filing 958 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/9/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
February 8, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee as to MARTA CHLISTUNOFF, ESQ. for $ 150, receipt number NEW035601 (dam)
February 8, 2018 Filing 957 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/8/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI(AM) & JACKIE KASHMER (PM)) (jl, )
February 7, 2018 Filing 956 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/7/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI(AM) & JACKIE KASHMER (PM)) (jl, )
February 6, 2018 Filing 955 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/6/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI (AM) & JACKIE KASHMER (PM)) (jl, )
February 5, 2018 Filing 954 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/5/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
February 2, 2018 Filing 953 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/2/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
February 1, 2018 Filing 952 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #951 Letter. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 1, 2018 Filing 951 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. (MARINO, KEVIN)
February 1, 2018 Filing 950 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
February 1, 2018 Filing 949 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 2/1/2018. (Court Reporter: JACKIE KASMER) (jl, )
January 31, 2018 Filing 947 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 1/31/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI (AM) & JACKIE KASHMER (PM)) (jl, )
January 30, 2018 Filing 946 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Trial Subpoena served on John White by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (DAVY, EREZ)
January 29, 2018 Filing 945 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 1/29/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI (AM) & JACKIE KASHMER (Pm)). (jl, )
January 29, 2018 Filing 944 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier, Esq. to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #942 Letter,,. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 28, 2018 Filing 942 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., re #938 Letter,,. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 28, 2018 Filing 941 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 28, 2018 Filing 940 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., re #927 Letter,,. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 26, 2018 Filing 943 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 1/26/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI (AM) & JACKIE KASHMER (PM)) (jl, )
January 26, 2018 Filing 939 Exhibit to #938 Letter,, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 26, 2018 Filing 938 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER granting Deft's re #935 Letter Request to UNSEAL Deft., Serono's 1/25/18 letter [ECF NOS. 932 & 932-1]. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/26/18. (DD, )
January 25, 2018 Filing 936 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 25, 2018 Filing 935 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #932 Letter,,,. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 25, 2018 Filing 934 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 1/25/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI (AM) & JACKIE KASHMER (PM)) (jl, )
January 25, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MICHAEL F. MILEA, DEXIN DENG, JENNY C. WU and EILEEN WOO, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, )
January 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #926 MOTION for (1) a Corrective Instruction as to Seronos Cross-examination of Dr. Phillip Sharp; and (2) an Order Establishing the Procedure for Examination of the Remaining Witnesses at Trial . Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
January 25, 2018 Filing 932 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #926 MOTION for (1) a Corrective Instruction as to Seronos Cross-examination of Dr. Phillip Sharp; and (2) an Order Establishing the Procedure for Examination of the Remaining Witnesses at Trial . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 24, 2018 Filing 931 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael F. Milea to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8423926.) (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 24, 2018 Filing 930 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jenny C. Wu to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8423924.) (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 24, 2018 Filing 929 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Eileen Woo to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8423922.) (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 24, 2018 Filing 928 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Dexin Deng to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8423919.) (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 24, 2018 Filing 927 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 24, 2018 Filing 926 MOTION for (1) a Corrective Instruction as to Seronos Cross-examination of Dr. Phillip Sharp; and (2) an Order Establishing the Procedure for Examination of the Remaining Witnesses at Trial by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Letter brief in support of motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 925 CONSENT ORDER granting re #873 Application/Petition for pro hac vice admission as to JENNY C. WU, ESQ., MICHAEL F. MILEA, ESQ., EILEEN WOO, ESQ., AND DEXIN DENG, ESQ. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/23/18. (DD, )
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 924 CONSENT ORDER granting re #872 Application/Petition for pro hac vice admission as to MARTA CHLISTUNOFF, ESQ. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/23/18. (DD, )
January 23, 2018 Filing 933 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 1/23/2018. (Court Reporters: WALTER PERELLI (AM) & JACKIE KASHMER (PM)) (jl, )
January 22, 2018 Filing 923 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 1/22/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
January 22, 2018 Filing 920 Preliminary Jury Instructions. (jl, )
January 20, 2018 Filing 919 Proposed Jury Instructions by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 19, 2018 Filing 922 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial held on 1/19/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
January 19, 2018 Filing 918 REDACTION to #913 Letter,, from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. regarding selective waiver by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 19, 2018 Filing 917 REDACTION to #911 Letter,, from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., regarding selective waiver by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 916 JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/18/18. (jl, )
January 18, 2018 Filing 921 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Jury Trial Held on 1/18/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
January 18, 2018 Filing 915 Exhibit to #914 Letter by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 18, 2018 Filing 914 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #911 Letter,,. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 18, 2018 Filing 913 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., re #912 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 17, 2018 Filing 912 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 17, 2018 Filing 911 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi regarding selective waiver. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 16, 2018 Filing 910 REDACTION to #908 Letter,, from Kevin H. Marino by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 15, 2018 Filing 909 Certification on behalf of EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. Re #907 Brief. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 15, 2018 Filing 908 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 15, 2018 Filing 907 BRIEF Regarding Preliminary Jury Instruction Issues (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 906 SEALED OPINION & ORDER re #674 MOTION in Limine No. 4 Regarding Inequitable Conduct or Other Alleged Misconduct filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., #712 MOTION in Limine No. 6 filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., #686 MOTION in Limine No. 10 filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., #694 Third MOTION in Limine Regarding FDA Submissions filed by PFIZER INC., EMD SERONO, INC., #697 Sixth MOTION in Limine Regarding Biogens Prior Sworn Statements filed by PFIZER INC., EMD SERONO, INC., #710 MOTION in Limine No. 5 filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., #680 MOTION in Limine No. 7 Regarding Defendants' Patents filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., #696 Fifth MOTION in Limine Regarding Validity Evidence in Biogens Case-in-Chief filed by PFIZER INC., EMD SERONO, INC., #670 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Absence of Dr. Walter Fiers filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., #695 Fourth MOTION in Limine Regarding the Fiers Retrospective (PTX 347) filed by PFIZER INC., EMD SERONO, INC., #684 MOTION in Limine No. 9 Regarding Biogen MA Inc. Not Seeking Injunctive Relief filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., #672 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Regarding Foreign Legal Proceedings filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., #692 First MOTION in Limine Regarding Philip Sharp Opinion Testimony filed by PFIZER INC., EMD SERONO, INC., #699 MOTION in Limine Regarding Kevin Murphy Testimony filed by PFIZER INC., EMD SERONO, INC., #678 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Regarding Regulatory Standards filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., #676 MOTION in Limine No. 5 Regarding Expert Testimony on Questions of Law filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/12/18. (jl, )
January 12, 2018 Filing 905 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., re #903 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 12, 2018 Filing 904 REDACTION to #900 Trial Brief by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael F. Milea, #2 Exhibit PTX0059, #3 Exhibit PTX0061, #4 Exhibit PTX0861)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 12, 2018 Filing 903 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 12, 2018 Filing 902 REDACTION to #901 Trial Brief by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 11, 2018 Filing 948 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference held on 1/11/2018. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
January 11, 2018 Filing 901 TRIAL BRIEF by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 11, 2018 Filing 900 TRIAL BRIEF by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael F. Milea, #2 Exhibit PTX0059, #3 Exhibit PTX0061, #4 Exhibit PTX0816)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 10, 2018 Filing 899 Transcript of Proceedings of Motion Hearings held on 12/15/2017, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter/Transcriber Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 1/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/10/2018. (sm, )
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 898 FINDINGS OF FACT/ORDER granting #738 Motion to Seal Document #687 Brief in Support of Motion,, #671 Brief in Support of Motion,, #703 Declaration,,,,,,,,,, #689 Brief in Support of Motion,, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/9/18. (DD, )
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 897 FINDINGS OF FACT/ORDER granting #660 Motion to Seal Document #657 Declaration,,, Of Dexin Deng In Support Of Biogens Supplementation Of Evidence Regarding Bayers Motion No. 2 Anticipation By The Treatment References by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/9/18. (DD, )
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 896 FINDINGS OF FACT/ORDER granting #644 Motion to Seal Document #637 Declaration,, of Michael R. Green in Opposition re #633 Motion for Summary Judgment No. 6 Anticipation by the Weissmann Patent by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/9/18. (DD, )
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 895 ORDER granting #655 Motion to Seal Docket Entries [626 and 627] by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/9/18. (DD, )
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 894 SEALED ORDER re #879 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. requesting a Rule 104 Hearing. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/9/2018. (jl, )
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 893 ORDER denying #501 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying #503 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying #505 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying #506 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying #509 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying #513 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying #517 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #624 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/9/2018. (jl, )
January 9, 2018 Filing 892 SEALED OPINION. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/9/2018. (jl, )
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 891 ORDER granting re #890 Letter Request for authorization for access to the Martin Luther King Jr Federal Building and United States Court House to bring in and install equipment; granting request for leave to access the Courthouse Building on January 16th, 2018 at 10:30 AM for the purpose delivering and setting up the above-listed equipment. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/8/18. (DD, )
January 8, 2018 Filing 890 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 8, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #889 MOTION to Seal portions of Biogens December 20, 2017 letter requesting a Rule 104 hearing and Exhibit Nos. 1-7 (ECF No. 879) and portions of Seronos December 22, 2017 letter response to Biogens Request for a Rule 104 Hearing and Exhibit Nos. 2-6 (E. Motion set for 2/5/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
January 5, 2018 Filing 889 MOTION to Seal portions of Biogens December 20, 2017 letter requesting a Rule 104 hearing and Exhibit Nos. 1-7 (ECF No. 879) and portions of Seronos December 22, 2017 letter response to Biogens Request for a Rule 104 Hearing and Exhibit Nos. 2-6 (ECF No. 881) by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
January 3, 2018 Filing 888 Letter from Robert M. Goodman. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
December 29, 2017 Filing 887 NOTICE of Appearance by EREZ JOSEPH DAVY on behalf of BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. (DAVY, EREZ)
December 22, 2017 Filing 886 REDACTION to #879 Letter,, Requesting Rule 104 Hearing by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 885 ORDER denying #271 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/22/17. (jl, )
December 22, 2017 Filing 884 SEALED OPINION re #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits filed by EMD SERONO, INC. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/22/17. (jl, )
December 22, 2017 Filing 883 REDACTION to #881 Letter,, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 (slipsheet), #2 Exhibit 3 (slipsheet), #3 Exhibit 4 (slipsheet), #4 Exhibit 5 (slipsheet), #5 Exhibit 6 (slipsheet))(DELORENZI, DAVID)
December 22, 2017 Filing 882 Exhibit to #881 Letter,, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
December 22, 2017 Filing 881 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #879 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6)(DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 21, 2017 Filing 880 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 20, 2017 Filing 879 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. requesting a Rule 104 Hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 15, 2017 Filing 878 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Motion Hearings continued on 12/15/2017, Final Pretrial Conference held on 12/15/2017. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 877 ORDER GRANTING DE #874 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/15/17. (jl, )
December 13, 2017 Filing 876 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Motion Hearing on various motions in limine held on 12/13/2017. (Court Reporter: JACKIE KASHMER) (jl, )
December 13, 2017 Filing 874 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
December 13, 2017 Filing 873 APPLICATION/PETITION for pro hac vice admission of Jenny C. Wu, Michael F. Milea, Eileen Woo, and Dexin Deng for by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John D. Tortorella, #2 Certification of Dexin Deng, #3 Certification of Eileen Woo, #4 Certification of Jenny C. Wu, #5 Certification of Michael F. Milea, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 12, 2017 Filing 875 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Motion Hearing on various motions in limine held on 12/12/2017. (Court Reporter: JACKIE KASHMER) (jl, ) .
December 11, 2017 Filing 872 APPLICATION/PETITION for pro hac vice admission of Marta Chlistunoff (on consent) for by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert M. Goodman, #2 Certification of Marta Chlistunoff, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
December 8, 2017 Filing 871 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re 864 Order,,. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 8, 2017 Filing 870 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #683 Brief in Support of Motion, #691 Brief in Support of Motion. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #868 MOTION to Seal Document #819 Redacted Document, #783 Declaration,, #787 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #719 Brief,, #817 Letter, #789 Declaration,, #778 Declaration,,, #785 Declaration,, #792 Declaration,, #776 Brief in Oppositio, #869 MOTION to Seal Document #774 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,, #846 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #794 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #780 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #837 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #849 , #867 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 1/2/2018 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
December 5, 2017 Filing 869 MOTION to Seal Document #774 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,, #846 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #794 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #780 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #837 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #849 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #825 Certification in Support of Motion,,,,,, #829 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #830 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, #863 Letter,, #761 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #848 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Tortorella, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 5, 2017 Filing 868 MOTION to Seal Document #819 Redacted Document, #783 Declaration,, #787 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #719 Brief,, #817 Letter, #789 Declaration,, #778 Declaration,,, #785 Declaration,, #792 Declaration,, #776 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #720 Declaration,,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert M Goodman, #2 Exhibit A to the Certification of Robert M Goodman, #3 Index, #4 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
December 5, 2017 Filing 867 MOTION to Seal by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER administratively terminating #688 Motion in Limine; administratively terminating #701 Motion in Limine; administratively terminating #706 Motion in Limine; administratively terminating #714 Motion in Limine; administratively terminating #715 Motion in Limine; administratively terminating #716 Motion in Limine; administratively terminating #718 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/5/17. (DD, )
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ORDER granting Pltf's re #863 Letter Request for permission to file (5) pg. sur-reply to address a new argument Serono raised in its reply brief. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/5/17. (DD, )
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 864 TEXT ORDER By 3 p.m. on Friday, December 8, 2017, the parties shall meet and confer in an effort to streamline the number of pending in limine and Daubert motions and shall submit a joint letter to the Court regarding resolution of any such motions. By 3 p.m. on Friday, December 8, 2017, the parties shall also submit a proposed schedule for the oral argument set for December 12 and 13, 2017, including the order of motions to be argued and expected duration of each side's argument. SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/5/17. (jl, )
December 4, 2017 Filing 863 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., requesting permission to file sur-reply re #824 Order, #699 MOTION in Limine Regarding Kevin Murphy Testimony. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 862 ORDER GRANTING #861 Letter from Kevin H. Marino. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/1/18. (jl, )
November 30, 2017 Filing 861 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., re #639 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 29, 2017 Filing 860 REDACTION to #700 Brief,, Regarding Kevin Murphy Testimony by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 27, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #854 MOTION to Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording #751 Transcript,,, of Summary Judgment Hearing. Motion set for 12/18/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
November 22, 2017 Filing 859 REDACTION to #845 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, In Limine Regarding Kevin Murphy Testimony by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jaysen S. Chung, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 22, 2017 Filing 858 REDACTION to #846 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, in Limine No. 8 Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Opinions by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 22, 2017 Filing 857 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., submitting Stipulation and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 22, 2017 Filing 856 REDACTION to #830 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, in Limine No. 3 Regarding Foreign Legal Proceedings by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 22, 2017 Filing 855 REDACTION to #825 Certification in Support of Motion,,,,,, of Dexin Deng by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 22, 2017 Filing 854 MOTION to Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording #751 Transcript,,, of Summary Judgment Hearing by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC., EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #2 Index (Serono), #3 Certification of John D. Tortorella, #4 Index (Biogen), #5 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 22, 2017 Filing 853 REDACTION to #849 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, in Limine No. 12 Regarding James M. Gould by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 22, 2017 Filing 852 REDACTION to #837 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, in Limine No. 6 Regarding Regulatory Standards by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 22, 2017 Filing 851 REDACTION to #829 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, in Limine No. 2 Regarding Absence of Dr. Walter Fiers by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 21, 2017 Filing 850 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #680 MOTION in Limine No. 7 Regarding Defendants' Patents (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 21, 2017 Filing 849 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #690 MOTION in Limine No. 12 Regarding James M. Gould (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 21, 2017 Filing 848 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #686 MOTION in Limine No. 10 (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 21, 2017 Filing 847 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #684 MOTION in Limine No. 9 Regarding Biogen MA Inc. Not Seeking Injunctive Relief (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 21, 2017 Filing 846 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #682 MOTION in Limine No. 8 Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Opinions (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 21, 2017 Filing 845 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #699 MOTION in Limine Regarding Kevin Murphy Testimony (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jaysen S. Chung, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H)(DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 21, 2017 Filing 844 Exhibit to #843 Declaration, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 5)(DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 21, 2017 Filing 843 DECLARATION of Christine L. Ranney re #832 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #841 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #838 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #840 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 9)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 21, 2017 Filing 842 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #712 MOTION in Limine No. 6 (Bayer's Motion in Limine No. 6) (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 21, 2017 Filing 841 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #710 MOTION in Limine No. 5 (Bayer's Motion in Limine No. 5) (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 21, 2017 Filing 840 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #708 MOTION in Limine No. 4 (Bayer's Motion in Limine No. 4) (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 21, 2017 Filing 839 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #704 MOTION in Limine No. 2 (Bayer's Motion in Limine No. 2) (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 21, 2017 Filing 838 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #697 Sixth MOTION in Limine Regarding Biogens Prior Sworn Statements (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 21, 2017 Filing 837 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #678 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Regarding Regulatory Standards (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 21, 2017 Filing 836 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #696 Fifth MOTION in Limine Regarding Validity Evidence in Biogens Case-in-Chief (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 21, 2017 Filing 835 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #695 Fourth MOTION in Limine Regarding the Fiers Retrospective (PTX 347) (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 21, 2017 Filing 834 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #694 Third MOTION in Limine Regarding FDA Submissions (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 21, 2017 Filing 833 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #676 MOTION in Limine No. 5 Regarding Expert Testimony on Questions of Law (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 21, 2017 Filing 832 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #692 First MOTION in Limine Regarding Philip Sharp Opinion Testimony (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 21, 2017 Filing 831 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #674 MOTION in Limine No. 4 Regarding Inequitable Conduct or Other Alleged Misconduct (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 21, 2017 Filing 830 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #672 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Regarding Foreign Legal Proceedings (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 21, 2017 Filing 829 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #670 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Absence of Dr. Walter Fiers (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 21, 2017 Filing 828 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #712 MOTION in Limine No. 6 (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 21, 2017 Filing 827 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #710 MOTION in Limine No. 5 (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 21, 2017 Filing 826 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #708 MOTION in Limine No. 4 (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 21, 2017 Filing 825 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #688 MOTION in Limine No. 11 Regarding Dr. Gordon Moore's Hybridization Experiment, #680 MOTION in Limine No. 7 Regarding Defendants' Patents, #670 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Absence of Dr. Walter Fiers, #684 MOTION in Limine No. 9 Regarding Biogen MA Inc. Not Seeking Injunctive Relief, #672 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Regarding Foreign Legal Proceedings, #678 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Regarding Regulatory Standards, #676 MOTION in Limine No. 5 Regarding Expert Testimony on Questions of Law, #674 MOTION in Limine No. 4 Regarding Inequitable Conduct or Other Alleged Misconduct, #686 MOTION in Limine No. 10, #690 MOTION in Limine No. 12 Regarding James M. Gould, #682 MOTION in Limine No. 8 Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Opinions, #668 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Regarding Congressional Investigation Into Drug Prices (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Index, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 824 ORDER GRANTING #823 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi requesting leave to file a 22 page reply brief. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/21/17. (jl, )
November 21, 2017 Filing 823 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 17, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #822 MOTION to Redact #753 Letter,, . Motion set for 12/18/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
November 16, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held on 11/16/2017. (jl, )
November 16, 2017 Filing 822 MOTION to Redact #753 Letter,, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Tortorella in Support of Motion, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 15, 2017 Filing 821 REDACTION to #753 Letter,, from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., re #739 Letter by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 15, 2017 Filing 820 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Amendment to #819 Redacted Document . (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 14, 2017 Filing 819 REDACTION to #817 Letter by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 14, 2017 Filing 818 Letter from Thomas K Murphy III re #817 Letter. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 13, 2017 Filing 817 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #686 MOTION in Limine No. 10, #684 MOTION in Limine No. 9 Regarding Biogen MA Inc. Not Seeking Injunctive Relief. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 13, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #816 MOTION to Seal portions of Seronos October 26, 2017 letter to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. #739 . Motion set for 12/4/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
November 9, 2017 Filing 816 MOTION to Seal portions of Seronos October 26, 2017 letter to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. #739 by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 815 ORDER granting Pltf's re #795 Letter Request regarding the pre-trial schedule. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/9/17. (DD, )
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 814 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: compensation of fact witnesses for their time preparing for and testifying at trial and for reasonable travel expenses; etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/9/17. (DD, )
November 8, 2017 Filing 813 REDACTION to #794 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, in Limine No. 6 by Bayer #712 , in which Serono joins by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 8, 2017 Filing 812 REDACTION to #761 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #694 Third MOTION in Limine Regarding FDA Submissions by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 8, 2017 Filing 811 REDACTION to #774 Certification in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,, of Dexin Deng by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 8, 2017 Filing 810 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction re #750 Transcript,,, #751 Transcript,,, by JOHN D. TORTORELLA (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 8, 2017 Filing 809 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction re #751 Transcript,,, by CHARLES H. CHEVALIER (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
November 8, 2017 Filing 808 REDACTION to #792 Declaration,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4- Redacted, #5 Exhibit 5- Redacted, #6 Exhibit 6- Redacted)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 8, 2017 Filing 807 REDACTION to #789 Declaration,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2- Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3- Redacted, #4 Exhibit 4- Redacted, #5 Exhibit 5)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 8, 2017 Filing 806 REDACTION to #787 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 8, 2017 Filing 805 REDACTION to #785 Declaration,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2- Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5- Redacted)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 8, 2017 Filing 804 REDACTION to #783 Declaration,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Redacted)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 8, 2017 Filing 803 REDACTION to #778 Declaration,,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7- Redacted, #8 Exhibit 8- Redacted, #9 Exhibit 9- Redacted)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 8, 2017 Filing 802 REDACTION to #776 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 8, 2017 Filing 801 REDACTION to #773 Brief,, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 8, 2017 Filing 800 REDACTION to #772 Brief,, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 8, 2017 Filing 799 REDACTION to #771 Brief,, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 8, 2017 Filing 798 REDACTION to #770 Brief,, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 8, 2017 Filing 797 REDACTION to #766 Brief,, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 8, 2017 Filing 796 REDACTION to #765 Brief,, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 8, 2017 Filing 795 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., regarding the pre-trial schedule [correcting 757]. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 7, 2017 Filing 794 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #712 MOTION in Limine No. 6 by Bayer, in which Serono joins (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 793 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #682 MOTION in Limine No. 8 Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Opinions (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 7, 2017 Filing 792 DECLARATION of Tian Huang re #790 Brief in Opposition to Motion In Limine No. 7 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 791 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #710 MOTION in Limine No. 5 by Bayer, in which Serono joins (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 7, 2017 Filing 790 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #680 MOTION in Limine No. 7 Regarding Defendants' Patents (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 7, 2017 Filing 789 DECLARATION of Seth R. Bowers re #787 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, In Limine No. 6 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 788 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #708 MOTION in Limine No. 4 by Bayer, in which Serono joins (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 7, 2017 Filing 787 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #678 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Regarding Regulatory Standards (GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 786 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #704 MOTION in Limine No. 2 by Bayer, in which Serono "Provisionally" Joins (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 7, 2017 Filing 785 DECLARATION of Tian Huang re #784 Brief in Opposition to Motion In Limine No. 5 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 784 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #676 MOTION in Limine No. 5 Regarding Expert Testimony on Questions of Law (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 7, 2017 Filing 783 DECLARATION of Seth R. Bowers re #782 Brief in Opposition to Motion In Limine No. 4 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 782 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #674 MOTION in Limine No. 4 Regarding Inequitable Conduct or Other Alleged Misconduct (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 7, 2017 Filing 781 DECLARATION of Tian Huang re #779 Brief in Opposition to Motion In Limine No. 3 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 7, 2017 Filing 780 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #699 MOTION in Limine Regarding Kevin Murphy Testimony (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 779 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #672 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Regarding Foreign Legal Proceedings (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 7, 2017 Filing 778 DECLARATION of Tian Huang re #776 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, In Limine No. 2 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 777 Exhibit to #771 Brief,, #768 Brief, #773 Brief,, #772 Brief,, #767 Brief, #770 Brief,, #765 Brief,, #769 Brief, #766 Brief,, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 22, #10 Exhibit 25, #11 Exhibit 27, #12 Exhibit 30, #13 Exhibit 31, #14 Exhibit 32, #15 Exhibit 33, #16 Exhibit 34, #17 Exhibit 35, #18 Exhibit 36, #19 Exhibit 37, #20 Exhibit 38, #21 Exhibit 39)(DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 776 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #670 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Absence of Dr. Walter Fiers (GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 775 DECLARATION of Christine L. Ranney re #771 Brief,, #768 Brief, #773 Brief,, #772 Brief,, #767 Brief, #770 Brief,, #765 Brief,, #769 Brief, #766 Brief,, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 17, #10 Exhibit 18, #11 Exhibit 20, #12 Exhibit 21, #13 Exhibit 23, #14 Exhibit 24, #15 Exhibit 26, #16 Exhibit 28, #17 Exhibit 29)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 7, 2017 Filing 774 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #712 MOTION in Limine No. 6, #694 Third MOTION in Limine Regarding FDA Submissions, #697 Sixth MOTION in Limine Regarding Biogens Prior Sworn Statements, #710 MOTION in Limine No. 5, #696 Fifth MOTION in Limine Regarding Validity Evidence in Biogens Case-in-Chief, #704 MOTION in Limine No. 2, #692 First MOTION in Limine Regarding Philip Sharp Opinion Testimony, #695 Fourth MOTION in Limine Regarding the Fiers Retrospective (PTX 347), #699 MOTION in Limine Regarding Kevin Murphy Testimony, #708 MOTION in Limine No. 4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 773 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EMD SERONO, INC. and PFIZER INC. re Biogen's MOTION in Limine No. 12 #690 (DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 772 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EMD SERONO, INC. and PFIZER INC. re Biogen's MOTION in Limine No. 10 #686 (DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 771 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EMD SERONO, INC. and PFIZER INC. re Biogen's MOTION in Limine No. 9 #684 (DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 770 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EMD SERONO, INC. and PFIZER INC. re Biogen's MOTION in Limine No. 8 #682 (DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 769 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EMD SERONO, INC. and PFIZER INC. re Biogen's MOTION in Limine No. 7 #680 (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 7, 2017 Filing 768 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EMD SERONO, INC. and PFIZER INC. re Biogen's MOTION in Limine No. 5 #676 (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 7, 2017 Filing 767 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EMD SERONO, INC. and PFIZER INC. re Biogen's MOTION in Limine No. 4 #674 (DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 7, 2017 Filing 766 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EMD SERONO, INC. and PFIZER INC. re Biogen's MOTION in Limine No. 3 #672 (DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 765 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EMD SERONO, INC. and PFIZER INC. re Biogen's MOTION in Limine No. 2 #670 and MOTION in Limine No. 6 #678 (DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 764 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #697 Sixth MOTION in Limine Regarding Biogens Prior Sworn Statements (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 7, 2017 Filing 763 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #696 Fifth MOTION in Limine Regarding Validity Evidence in Biogens Case-in-Chief (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 7, 2017 Filing 762 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #695 Fourth MOTION in Limine Regarding the Fiers Retrospective (PTX 347) (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 7, 2017 Filing 761 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #694 Third MOTION in Limine Regarding FDA Submissions (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 7, 2017 Filing 760 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #692 First MOTION in Limine Regarding Philip Sharp Opinion Testimony (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 759 ORDER re #693 Second MOTION in Limine Regarding False Claims Act Allegations, #668 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Regarding Congressional Investigation Into Drug Prices. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/7/17. (jl, )
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER GRANTING #754 Letter Request to Brief Inequitable Conduct After Trial. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/7/17. (jl, )
November 7, 2017 Filing 757 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., regarding the pre-trial schedule. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 4, 2017 Filing 756 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order regarding witness compensation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 4, 2017 Filing 755 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., enclosing Stipulation and Proposed Order re #693 Second MOTION in Limine Regarding False Claims Act Allegations, #668 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Regarding Congressional Investigation Into Drug Prices. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 3, 2017 Filing 754 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #639 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #737 Scheduling Order,. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 2, 2017 Filing 753 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., re #739 Letter,,. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 2, 2017 Filing 752 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #744 Letter. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 1, 2017 Filing 751 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on August 11, 2017, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 11/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2018. (mfr)
November 1, 2017 Filing 750 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on August 10, 2017, before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Court Reporter: Walter Perelli (973-645-2514). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 11/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2018. (mfr)
October 31, 2017 Filing 749 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 31, 2017 Filing 748 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
October 31, 2017 Filing 747 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #746 Letter,. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 31, 2017 Filing 746 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting, #624 MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 Anticipation By The Weissmann Patent, #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 745 ORDER regarding the order of presentations of proof at trial. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/27/17. (jl, )
October 27, 2017 Filing 744 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #740 Letter. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER granting #433 Bayer's Motion to Sever, joined in by Novartis, and #435 Serono's Motion to Sever; that the Biogen-Serono trial shall commence on January 18, 2018 at 9:30 a.m.; and that the Court shall hold a telephone conference with all parties on November 16, 2017 at 12 p.m. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/27/17. (DD, ) Modified on 10/27/2017 (jr).
October 27, 2017 Filing 742 OPINION. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/27/17. (DD, )
October 27, 2017 Filing 741 REDACTION to #739 Letter,, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 27, 2017 Filing 740 Letter from Robert M. Goodman. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 26, 2017 Filing 739 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #272 Declaration,. (DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 25, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #738 MOTION to Seal Document #687 Brief in Support of Motion,, #671 Brief in Support of Motion,, #703 Declaration,,,,,,,,,, #689 Brief in Support of Motion,, . Motion set for 11/20/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
October 24, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held on 10/24/2017. (jl, )
October 24, 2017 Filing 738 MOTION to Seal Document #687 Brief in Support of Motion,, #671 Brief in Support of Motion,, #703 Declaration,,,,,,,,,, #689 Brief in Support of Motion,, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Tortorella, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER amending the 7/31/17 pretrial scheduling order: scheduling a Pretrial Conference on 12/15/2017 10:30 AM before Judge Claire C. Cecchi, trial set for 1/18/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Claire C. Cecchi; etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/23/17. (sr, )
October 20, 2017 Filing 736 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. Requesting Amendment to Pre-trial Scheduling Order re #639 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 20, 2017 Filing 735 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 19, 2017 Filing 734 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re 666 Order,. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 19, 2017 Filing 733 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
October 19, 2017 Filing 732 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re 666 Order,. (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 19, 2017 Filing 731 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 17, 2017 Filing 730 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #704 MOTION in Limine No. 2. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 16, 2017 Filing 729 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #663 Letter. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 16, 2017 Filing 728 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. Regarding Payment of Fact Witnesses re #664 Letter, #667 Letter. (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 16, 2017 Filing 727 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J re #708 MOTION in Limine No. 4, #712 MOTION in Limine No. 6, #710 MOTION in Limine No. 5. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 13, 2017 Filing 726 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #697 Sixth MOTION in Limine Regarding Biogens Prior Sworn Statements, #696 Fifth MOTION in Limine Regarding Validity Evidence in Biogens Case-in-Chief, #695 Fourth MOTION in Limine Regarding the Fiers Retrospective (PTX 347), #692 First MOTION in Limine Regarding Philip Sharp Opinion Testimony. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 11, 2017 Filing 725 REDACTION to #703 Declaration,,,,,,,,,, Declaration of Dexin Deng in support of Biogen MA Inc.'s Motions In Limine Nos. 1-12 (original filed under seal) by BIOGEN IDEC INC., BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 (sealed), #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 (sealed), #12 Exhibit 12 (sealed), #13 Exhibit 13 (sealed), #14 Exhibit 14 (sealed), #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17 (sealed), #18 Exhibit 18 (sealed), #19 Exhibit 19 (sealed), #20 Exhibit 20 (sealed), #21 Exhibit 21 (sealed), #22 Exhibit 22 (sealed), #23 Exhibit 23 (sealed), #24 Exhibit 24 (sealed), #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26 (sealed), #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29 (sealed), #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32 (sealed), #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34 (sealed), #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40 (sealed), #41 Exhibit 41 (sealed), #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43 (sealed), #44 Exhibit 44 (sealed), #45 Exhibit 46, #46 Exhibit 47, #47 Exhibit 48 (sealed), #48 Exhibit 49 (sealed), #49 Exhibit 50 (sealed), #50 Exhibit 51 (sealed), #51 Exhibit 52 (sealed), #52 Exhibit 54 (sealed), #53 Exhibit 55, #54 Exhibit 56)(MARINO, KEVIN)
October 11, 2017 Filing 724 REDACTION to #720 Declaration,,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10 (Redacted))(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 11, 2017 Filing 723 REDACTION to #719 Brief,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 11, 2017 Filing 722 REDACTION to #689 Brief in Support of Motion,, Regarding Motion in Limine No. 11 (original filed under seal) by BIOGEN IDEC INC., BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 11, 2017 Filing 721 REDACTION to #671 Brief in Support of Motion,, (original filed under seal) by BIOGEN IDEC INC., BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 11, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #696 Fifth MOTION in Limine Regarding Validity Evidence in Biogens Case-in-Chief, #708 MOTION in Limine No. 4, #690 MOTION in Limine No. 12 Regarding James M. Gould, #699 MOTION in Limine Regarding Kevin Murphy Testimony, #684 MOTION in Limine No. 9 Regarding Biogen MA Inc. Not Seeking Injunctive Relief, #676 MOTION in Limine No. 5 Regarding Expert Testimony on Questions of Law, #693 Second MOTION in Limine Regarding False Claims Act Allegations, #718 MOTION in Limine No. 10, #682 MOTION in Limine No. 8 Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Opinions, #686 MOTION in Limine No. 10, #712 MOTION in Limine No. 6, #668 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Regarding Congressional Investigation Into Drug Prices, #694 Third MOTION in Limine Regarding FDA Submissions, #680 MOTION in Limine No. 7 Regarding Defendants' Patents, #692 First MOTION in Limine Regarding Philip Sharp Opinion Testimony, #672 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Regarding Foreign Legal Proceedings, #710 MOTION in Limine No. 5, #715 MOTION in Limine No. 8, #688 MOTION in Limine No. 11 Regarding Dr. Gordon Moore's Hybridization Experiment, #706 MOTION in Limine No. 3, #704 MOTION in Limine No. 2, #678 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Regarding Regulatory Standards, #714 MOTION in Limine No. 7, #716 MOTION in Limine No. 9, #674 MOTION in Limine No. 4 Regarding Inequitable Conduct or Other Alleged Misconduct, #701 MOTION in Limine No. 1, #695 Fourth MOTION in Limine Regarding the Fiers Retrospective (PTX 347), #670 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Absence of Dr. Walter Fiers, #697 Sixth MOTION in Limine Regarding Biogens Prior Sworn Statements. Motion set for 12/12/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
October 10, 2017 Filing 720 DECLARATION of Eric C. Wiener re #718 MOTION in Limine No. 10 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 10, 2017 Filing 719 BRIEF In support of Motion In Limine No. 10 of Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 10, 2017 Filing 718 MOTION in Limine No. 10 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 717 DECLARATION of Tian Huang re #716 MOTION in Limine No. 9 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 716 MOTION in Limine No. 9 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 715 MOTION in Limine No. 8 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 714 MOTION in Limine No. 7 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 713 DECLARATION of Tian Huang re #712 MOTION in Limine No. 6 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 712 MOTION in Limine No. 6 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 711 DECLARATION of Tian Huang re #710 MOTION in Limine No. 5 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 710 MOTION in Limine No. 5 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 709 DECLARATION of Kyle E. Thomason re #708 MOTION in Limine No. 4 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 708 MOTION in Limine No. 4 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 707 DECLARATION of Seth R. Bowers re #706 MOTION in Limine No. 3 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 706 MOTION in Limine No. 3 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 705 DECLARATION of Tian Huang re #704 MOTION in Limine No. 2 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 704 MOTION in Limine No. 2 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 703 DECLARATION of Dexin Deng re #688 MOTION in Limine No. 11 Regarding Dr. Gordon Moore's Hybridization Experiment, #680 MOTION in Limine No. 7 Regarding Defendants' Patents, #670 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Absence of Dr. Walter Fiers, #684 MOTION in Limine No. 9 Regarding Biogen MA Inc. Not Seeking Injunctive Relief, #672 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Regarding Foreign Legal Proceedings, #674 MOTION in Limine No. 4 Regarding Inequitable Conduct or Other Alleged Misconduct, #686 MOTION in Limine No. 10, #678 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Regarding Regulatory Standards, #676 MOTION in Limine No. 5 Regarding Expert Testimony on Questions of Law, #690 MOTION in Limine No. 12 Regarding James M. Gould, #682 MOTION in Limine No. 8 Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Opinions, #668 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Regarding Congressional Investigation Into Drug Prices by BIOGEN IDEC INC., BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 46, #46 Exhibit 47, #47 Exhibit 48, #48 Exhibit 49, #49 Exhibit 50, #50 Exhibit 51, #51 Exhibit 52, #52 Exhibit 54, #53 Exhibit 55, #54 Exhibit 56)(MARINO, KEVIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 10, 2017 Filing 702 DECLARATION of Seth R. Bowers re #701 MOTION in Limine No. 1 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 701 MOTION in Limine No. 1 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 10, 2017 Filing 700 BRIEF Regarding Kevin Murphy Testimony #699 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 10, 2017 Filing 699 MOTION in Limine Regarding Kevin Murphy Testimony by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jaysen S. Chung, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 10, 2017 Filing 698 DECLARATION of Christine L. Ranney re #694 Third MOTION in Limine Regarding FDA Submissions, #697 Sixth MOTION in Limine Regarding Biogens Prior Sworn Statements, #695 Fourth MOTION in Limine Regarding the Fiers Retrospective (PTX 347) by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 10, 2017 Filing 697 Sixth MOTION in Limine Regarding Biogens Prior Sworn Statements by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 10, 2017 Filing 696 Fifth MOTION in Limine Regarding Validity Evidence in Biogens Case-in-Chief by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 10, 2017 Filing 695 Fourth MOTION in Limine Regarding the Fiers Retrospective (PTX 347) by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 10, 2017 Filing 694 Third MOTION in Limine Regarding FDA Submissions by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 10, 2017 Filing 693 Second MOTION in Limine Regarding False Claims Act Allegations by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 10, 2017 Filing 692 First MOTION in Limine Regarding Philip Sharp Opinion Testimony by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 10, 2017 Filing 691 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #690 MOTION in Limine No. 12 Regarding James M. Gould (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 690 MOTION in Limine No. 12 Regarding James M. Gould by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 689 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #688 MOTION in Limine No. 11 Regarding Dr. Gordon Moore's Hybridization Experiment (MARINO, KEVIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 10, 2017 Filing 688 MOTION in Limine No. 11 Regarding Dr. Gordon Moore's Hybridization Experiment by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 687 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #686 MOTION in Limine No. 10 (MARINO, KEVIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 10, 2017 Filing 686 MOTION in Limine No. 10 by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 685 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #684 MOTION in Limine No. 9 Regarding Biogen MA Inc. Not Seeking Injunctive Relief (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 684 MOTION in Limine No. 9 Regarding Biogen MA Inc. Not Seeking Injunctive Relief by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 683 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #682 MOTION in Limine No. 8 Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Opinions (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 682 MOTION in Limine No. 8 Regarding Defendants' Invalidity Opinions by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 681 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #680 MOTION in Limine No. 7 Regarding Defendants' Patents (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 680 MOTION in Limine No. 7 Regarding Defendants' Patents by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 679 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #678 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Regarding Regulatory Standards (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 678 MOTION in Limine No. 6 Regarding Regulatory Standards by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 677 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #676 MOTION in Limine No. 5 Regarding Expert Testimony on Questions of Law (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 676 MOTION in Limine No. 5 Regarding Expert Testimony on Questions of Law by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 675 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #674 MOTION in Limine No. 4 Regarding Inequitable Conduct or Other Alleged Misconduct (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 674 MOTION in Limine No. 4 Regarding Inequitable Conduct or Other Alleged Misconduct by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 673 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #672 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Regarding Foreign Legal Proceedings (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 672 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Regarding Foreign Legal Proceedings by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 671 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #670 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Absence of Dr. Walter Fiers (MARINO, KEVIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 10, 2017 Filing 670 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Absence of Dr. Walter Fiers by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 669 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #668 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Regarding Congressional Investigation Into Drug Prices (MARINO, KEVIN)
October 10, 2017 Filing 668 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Regarding Congressional Investigation Into Drug Prices by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, KEVIN)
September 28, 2017 Filing 667 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 666 TEXT ORDER There shall be a telephone status conference on Tuesday, October 24, 2017 at 3 p.m. before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The parties shall submit status letters in anticipation of the conference by 5 p.m. on Thursday, October 19, 2017. SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 9/26/17. (jl, )
September 25, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held on 9/25/2017. (jl, )
September 21, 2017 Filing 665 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Clarire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #664 Letter, #663 Letter. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
September 20, 2017 Filing 664 Letter from Robert M. Goodman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
September 20, 2017 Filing 663 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re 661 Order. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
September 20, 2017 Filing 662 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 661 TEXT ORDER There shall be a telephone status conference on Monday, September 25, 2017 at 3 p.m. before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 9/13/17. (jl, )
September 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #660 MOTION to Seal Document #657 Declaration,,, Of Dexin Deng In Support Of Biogens Supplementation Of Evidence Regarding Bayers Motion No. 2 Anticipation By The Treatment References. Motion set for 10/2/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
September 5, 2017 Filing 660 MOTION to Seal Document #657 Declaration,,, Of Dexin Deng In Support Of Biogens Supplementation Of Evidence Regarding Bayers Motion No. 2 Anticipation By The Treatment References by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Tortorella, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 30, 2017 Filing 659 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth R. Bowers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
August 21, 2017 Filing 658 REDACTION to #657 Declaration,,, of Dexin Deng re #656 Response to Motion #506 for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References Supplementation of Evidence by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 21, 2017 Filing 657 DECLARATION of Dexin Deng re #656 Response to Motion #506 for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References Supplementation of Evidence by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 21, 2017 Filing 656 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References Supplementation of Evidence (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 15, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #655 MOTION to Seal Docket Entries 626 and 627. Motion set for 9/18/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
August 15, 2017 Filing 655 MOTION to Seal Docket Entries 626 and 627 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert M. Goodman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
August 11, 2017 Filing 654 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Motion Hearing held on 8/11/2017 re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., #624 MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 Anticipation By The Weissmann Patent filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. Ordered decision reserved. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
August 10, 2017 Filing 653 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Motion Hearing held on 8/10/2017 re #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 filed by PFIZER INC., EMD SERONO, INC., #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112 filed by PFIZER INC., EMD SERONO, INC., #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC., #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. Oral Argument to be continued on August 11, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
August 8, 2017 Filing 652 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., regarding proposed summary judgment argument schedule. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 7, 2017 Filing 651 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., regarding proposed summary judgment argument schedule. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 7, 2017 Filing 650 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE A. GADDIS on behalf of EMD SERONO, INC., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., PFIZER INC. (GADDIS, CHRISTINE)
August 7, 2017 Filing 649 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi, Esq. to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
August 4, 2017 Filing 648 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #647 Amended Document. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
August 4, 2017 Filing 647 AMENDED DOCUMENT by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. Amendment to #646 Amended Document . (DELORENZI, DAVID)
August 4, 2017 Filing 646 AMENDED DOCUMENT by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. Amendment to #595 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, . (DELORENZI, DAVID)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 645 TEXT ORDER - The schedule entered by the Court on July 31, 2017 [ECF No. 639] is hereby amended. Argument on motions in limine, Daubert motions, and jury instructions previously scheduled for December 8 and 11, 2017 shall instead proceed on December 12 and 13, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. on both days before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The Final Pre-Trial Conference previously scheduled for December 13, 2017 shall instead proceed on December 15, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/4/17. (jl, )
August 4, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #644 MOTION to Seal Document #637 Declaration,, of Michael R. Green in Opposition re 633 Motion for Summary Judgment No. 6 Anticipation by the Weissmann Patent. Motion set for 9/5/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 3, 2017 Filing 644 MOTION to Seal Document #637 Declaration,, of Michael R. Green in Opposition re 633 Motion for Summary Judgment No. 6 Anticipation by the Weissmann Patent by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Tortorella, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 2, 2017 Filing 643 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #624 MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 Anticipation By The Weissmann Patent (Attachments: #1 Response to Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration of Tian Huang, #3 Exhibit 1)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
August 1, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE -Pursuant to 101.1 (c)(5)a Lawyer admitted pro hac vice may not withdraw as Counsel without leave of this Court, re D.E. #640 #641 #642 (cm, )
July 31, 2017 Filing 642 NOTICE by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #373 Order of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alexander P. Swanson (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
July 31, 2017 Filing 641 NOTICE by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #234 Order of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Admission of Tracey Davies (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
July 31, 2017 Filing 640 NOTICE by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael A. Sitzman (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER granting Parties' #632 Letter request regarding scheduling deadlines. Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2017 10:30 AM before Judge Claire C. Cecchi, etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 07/28/2017. (ek)
July 20, 2017 Filing 638 REDACTION to #637 Declaration,, of Michael R. Green in support of opposition to motion by Bayer for Summary Judgment No. 6 anticipation by the Weissmann patent #624 by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 20, 2017 Filing 637 DECLARATION of Michael R. Green in support of opposition to motion by Bayer for Summary Judgment No. 6 anticipation by the Weissmann patent #624 by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 20, 2017 Filing 636 DECLARATION of Pastor Couceyro in support of opposition to motion by Bayer for Summary Judgment No. 6 anticipation by the Weissmann patent #624 by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 20, 2017 Filing 635 DECLARATION of Eileen Woo in support of opposition to Bayers motion for Summary Judgment No. 6 anticipation by the Weissmann patent #624 by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 20, 2017 Filing 634 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #624 MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 Anticipation By The Weissmann Patent (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 20, 2017 Filing 633 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #624 MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 Anticipation By The Weissmann Patent (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 12, 2017 Filing 632 Letter from Robert M. Goodman. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 7, 2017 Filing 631 Letter from Robert M. Goodman. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 3, 2017 Filing 630 Letter from Brian Kornbrek. (KORNBREK, CLIFFORD)
June 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held on 6/28/2017. (jl, )
June 23, 2017 Filing 629 REDACTION to #627 Declaration,,,,, And Brief by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 8 (Redacted), #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21 (Redacted), #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27 (Redacted), #28 Exhibit 28 (Redacted), #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30 (Redacted), #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38 (Redacted), #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Brief Redacted)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
June 23, 2017 Filing 628 REDACTION to #626 Declaration,, of Dr. Gordon P. Moore by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
June 23, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #624 MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 Anticipation By The Weissmann Patent. Motion set for 7/17/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
June 22, 2017 Filing 627 DECLARATION of Seth R. Bowers re #624 MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 Anticipation By The Weissmann Patent And Brief by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 22, 2017 Filing 626 DECLARATION of Dr. Gordon P. Moore re #624 MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 Anticipation By The Weissmann Patent by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 22, 2017 Filing 625 DECLARATION of Dr. Jeffrey V. Ravetch re #624 MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 Anticipation By The Weissmann Patent by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
June 22, 2017 Filing 624 MOTION for Summary Judgment #6 Anticipation By The Weissmann Patent by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Responses due by 7/3/2017 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER, ( Telephone/Status Conference set for 6/28/2017 02:00 PM before Judge Claire C. Cecchi.). Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 6/13/17. (DD, )
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 622 STIPULATION AND ORDER adopting the Parties' dates through 7/11/17. The remaining proposed dates will be discussed on the 6/28/17 cnf. call. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 6/13/17. (DD, )
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER granting #607 Motion to Seal Docket Entries #601 and #603 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/12/17. (DD, )
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER granting #593 Motion to Seal Document #564 Declaration,,,, #566 Declaration,, #584 Exhibit (to Document), #585 Exhibit (to Document),, #572 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,, 557 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, 562 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #590 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,, #578 Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Motion,, #588 Exhibit (to Document),, #565 Declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/12/17. (DD, )
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER granting #537 Motion to Seal Docket Entries 504, 510, 511, 514, 515, 518. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/12/17. (DD, )
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER granting #536 Motion to Seal portions of Serono's Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112, Exhibits 2, 3, and 4 and portions of Serono's Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute (ECF No. 502). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/12/17. (DD, )
June 9, 2017 Filing 617 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #615 Letter. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
June 6, 2017 Filing 616 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
June 6, 2017 Filing 615 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #556 Order on Motion to Strike,,,. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
May 25, 2017 Filing 614 Letter from Charles H. Chevalier to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
May 22, 2017 Filing 613 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #610 Letter, #612 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
May 19, 2017 Filing 612 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #610 Letter, #609 Letter. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
May 18, 2017 Filing 611 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #608 Letter. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
May 18, 2017 Filing 610 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #609 Letter. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
May 17, 2017 Filing 609 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #605 Order,. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
May 16, 2017 Filing 608 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #606 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
May 2, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #607 MOTION to Seal Docket Entries 601 and 603. Motion set for 6/5/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
May 1, 2017 Filing 607 MOTION to Seal Docket Entries 601 and 603 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert M. Goodman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
May 1, 2017 Filing 606 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Letter)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER re #594 Letter Request for motions for summary jgm. - the hrg. previously scheduled for May 11-12, 2017 is adjourned w/out date. A revised schedule will follow. The hrg. will not be set on the proposed alternative dates. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/21/17. (DD, )
April 18, 2017 Filing 604 REDACTION to #601 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts (Redacted))(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
April 17, 2017 Filing 603 Exhibit to #602 Declaration, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 17, 2017 Filing 602 DECLARATION of Seth R. Bowers re #597 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #598 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #600 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, #599 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 (redacted))(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
April 17, 2017 Filing 601 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages (Attachments: #1 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 17, 2017 Filing 600 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent (Attachments: #1 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
April 17, 2017 Filing 599 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description (Attachments: #1 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
April 17, 2017 Filing 598 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References (Attachments: #1 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
April 17, 2017 Filing 597 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting (Attachments: #1 Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
April 17, 2017 Filing 596 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112 re: Opposition #558 (Attachments: #1 Statement OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO BIOGENS RESPONSE TO SERONOS STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS, #2 Statement EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO BIOGENS DECLARATIONS AND OTHER EVIDENCE)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
April 17, 2017 Filing 595 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 re: Opposition #557 (Attachments: #1 Statement OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO BIOGENS RESPONSE TO SERONOS STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS, #2 Statement EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO BIOGENS DECLARATIONS AND OTHER EVIDENCE)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
April 7, 2017 Filing 594 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
April 3, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #593 MOTION to Seal Document #564 Declaration,,,, #566 Declaration,, #584 Exhibit (to Document), #585 Exhibit (to Document),, #572 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,, #557 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, #562 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #590 D. Motion set for 5/1/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
March 31, 2017 Filing 593 MOTION to Seal Document #564 Declaration,,,, #566 Declaration,, #584 Exhibit (to Document), #585 Exhibit (to Document),, #572 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,, #557 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, #562 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #590 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,, #578 Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Motion,, #588 Exhibit (to Document),, #565 Declaration,, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Tortorella in support of Motion to Seal, #2 Index in the form of Appendix U, #3 Text of Proposed Order with proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 29, 2017 Filing 592 NOTICE by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. of withdrawal of pro hac vice appearances of Raymond LaMagna, Blaine Evanson, and Minae Yu (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
March 26, 2017 Filing 591 DECLARATION of Steven M. Balcof in Opposition [CORRECTED] re #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103, #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112, #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting, #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References, #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description, #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent, #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit, #82 Exhibit, #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit, #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit, #87 Exhibit, #88 Exhibit, #89 Exhibit, #90 Exhibit, #91 Exhibit, #92 Exhibit, #93 Exhibit, #94 Exhibit, #95 Exhibit, #96 Exhibit, #97 Exhibit, #98 Exhibit, #99 Exhibit, #100 Exhibit, #101 Exhibit, #102 Exhibit, #103 Exhibit, #104 Exhibit, #105 Exhibit, #106 Exhibit, #107 Exhibit, #108 Exhibit, #109 Exhibit, #110 Exhibit, #111 Exhibit, #112 Exhibit, #113 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 26, 2017 Filing 590 DECLARATION of Steven M. Balcof in Opposition [CORRECTED] re #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103, #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112, #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting, #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References, #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description, #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent, #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit, #82 Exhibit, #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit, #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit, #87 Exhibit, #88 Exhibit, #89 Exhibit, #90 Exhibit, #91 Exhibit, #92 Exhibit, #93 Exhibit, #94 Exhibit, #95 Exhibit, #96 Exhibit, #97 Exhibit, #98 Exhibit, #99 Exhibit, #100 Exhibit, #101 Exhibit, #102 Exhibit, #103 Exhibit, #104 Exhibit, #105 Exhibit, #106 Exhibit, #107 Exhibit, #108 Exhibit, #109 Exhibit, #110 Exhibit, #111 Exhibit, #112 Exhibit, #113 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 26, 2017 Filing 589 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC INC. re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting [CORRECTED] (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 21, 2017 Filing 588 Exhibit to #572 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 21, 2017 Filing 587 Exhibit to #572 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 21, 2017 Filing 586 Exhibit to #572 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 21, 2017 Filing 585 Exhibit to #572 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 21, 2017 Filing 584 Exhibit to #572 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 20, 2017 Filing 583 REDACTION to #572 Declaration,,,,,,,,,,, of Steven M. Balcof in Opposition re #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103, #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112, #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting, #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References, #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description, #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent, #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit (under seal), #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit (under seal), #64 Exhibit (redacted), #65 Exhibit (redacted), #66 Exhibit (under seal), #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit (under seal), #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit (under seal), #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit (under seal), #82 Exhibit (redacted), #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit (under seal), #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit, #87 Exhibit, #88 Exhibit, #89 Exhibit, #90 Exhibit, #91 Exhibit, #92 Exhibit, #93 Exhibit, #94 Exhibit, #95 Exhibit, #96 Exhibit, #97 Exhibit, #98 Exhibit, #99 Exhibit, #100 Exhibit, #101 Exhibit (under seal), #102 Exhibit, #103 Exhibit, #104 Exhibit, #105 Exhibit, #106 Exhibit, #107 Exhibit (under seal), #108 Exhibit, #109 Exhibit, #110 Exhibit, #111 Exhibit (under seal), #112 Exhibit, #113 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 20, 2017 Filing 582 REDACTION to #564 Declaration,,,, of Michael R. Green in Opposition re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting, #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103, #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References, #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112, #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description, #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B (Redacted), #3 Exhibit C)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 20, 2017 Filing 581 REDACTION to #557 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, re #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 580 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112 (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 579 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 578 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 18, 2017 Filing 577 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 576 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 575 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 574 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 573 DECLARATION of K. Christopher Garcia, Ph.D. in Opposition re #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103, #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References, #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112, #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description, #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 572 DECLARATION of Steven M. Balcof in Opposition re #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112, #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent, #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting, #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References, #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages, #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103, #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit, #82 Exhibit, #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit, #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit, #87 Exhibit, #88 Exhibit, #89 Exhibit, #90 Exhibit, #91 Exhibit, #92 Exhibit, #93 Exhibit, #94 Exhibit, #95 Exhibit, #96 Exhibit, #97 Exhibit, #98 Exhibit, #99 Exhibit, #100 Exhibit, #101 Exhibit, #102 Exhibit, #103 Exhibit, #104 Exhibit, #105 Exhibit, #106 Exhibit, #107 Exhibit, #108 Exhibit, #109 Exhibit, #110 Exhibit, #111 Exhibit, #112 Exhibit, #113 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 18, 2017 Filing 571 DECLARATION of Hidde L. Ploegh in Opposition re #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 570 DECLARATION of T.J. Murray in Opposition re #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 569 DECLARATION of Robert E. Mitchell in Opposition re #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 568 DECLARATION of Randal Kaufman, Ph.D. in Opposition re #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112, #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 567 DECLARATION of John Doll in Opposition re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting, #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 566 DECLARATION of Eric Tisch in Opposition re #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 18, 2017 Filing 565 DECLARATION of Dr. Kevin Murphy in Opposition re #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 18, 2017 Filing 564 DECLARATION of Michael R. Green in Opposition re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting, #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103, #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References, #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112, #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description, #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 18, 2017 Filing 563 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 562 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 18, 2017 Filing 561 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 560 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 559 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2017 Filing 558 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112 (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 17, 2017 Filing 557 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER denying #457 Motion to Strike ; denying #486 Motion to Strike. Bayers application for production of communications between counsel for Biogen and Lofstrand Laboratories (Lofstrand) regarding the hybridization studies on which Dr. Couceyro relied is GRANTED. Biogens application for production of communications between counsel for Bayer and Mann Biologics regarding the protocol for Dr. Moores experiment is DENIED; etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/16/17. (DD, )
March 15, 2017 Filing 555 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re Status Conference. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 10, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held on 3/10/2017. (jl, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 554 DECLARATION of Seth R. Bowers re #553 Letter by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
March 9, 2017 Filing 553 Letter from Robert M. Goodman. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
March 9, 2017 Filing 552 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 551 AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER: Oppositions to MSJs due 3/17/17, replies due 4/17/17, MSJ hrg. on 5/11/17 @ 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/8/17. (DD, )
March 7, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, TIAN HUANG,ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
March 6, 2017 Filing 550 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #447 Stipulation and Order, #442 Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
March 2, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held on 3/2/2017. (jl, )
February 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 2/28/2017. (mw, )
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 549 TEXT ORDER - The conference call set for 3/14/2017 has been ADJOURNED to 6/27/2017 at 10:00AM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/28/2017. (mw, )
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 548 LETTER-ORDER that with respect to the expert/testing discovery dispute raised by Bayer during todays call, the parties are to submit a joint letter of no more than eight (8) pages outlining their respective positions. Said letter shall be filed no later than March 14, 2017. ( Status Conference set for 3/14/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark.). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/28/17. (DD, )
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 547 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for February 27, 2017, is rescheduled to March 2, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. The time to file opposition to the motions for summary judgment is stayed pending the conference call. SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/24/17. (jl, )
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 546 FINDINGS OF FACT/ORDER granting #480 Motion to Seal portions of the Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (ECF No. 462). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/23/17. (DD, )
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 545 FINDINGS OF FACT/ORDER granting #474 Motion to Seal portions of the letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. dated November 17, 2016, and Exhibits A-C to that letter [ECF No. 467]. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/23/17. (DD, )
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER granting #498 Motion to Seal Docket Entry #495 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/23/17. (DD, )
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER granting #497 Motion to Seal Document #489 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, #491 Declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/23/17. (DD, )
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER granting #484 Motion to Seal Portions of the letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. dated November 30, 2016 (ECF No. 472). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/23/17. (DD, )
February 23, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ROBERT E. COUNIHAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, )
February 22, 2017 Filing 541 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robert E. Counihan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7665096.) (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER granting re #538 Application/Petition for the Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert E. Counihan, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/21/17. (DD, )
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 539 TEXT ORDER - There shall be a telephone conference call on February 27, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. before Judge Claire C. Cecchi to discuss summary judgment briefing. (Plaintiff to initiate the call). So Ordered by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/21/17. (jl, )
February 21, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #537 MOTION to Seal Docket Entries 504, 510, 511, 514, 515, 518. Motion set for 3/20/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
February 17, 2017 Filing 538 APPLICATION/PETITION for the Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert E. Counihan for by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert E. Counihan, #2 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
February 17, 2017 Filing 537 MOTION to Seal Docket Entries 504, 510, 511, 514, 515, 518 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert M. Goodman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 17, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #536 MOTION to Seal portions of Seronos Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112, Exhibits 2, 3, and 4 and portions of Seronos Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute (ECF No. 502). Motion set for 3/20/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
February 16, 2017 Filing 536 MOTION to Seal portions of Seronos Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112, Exhibits 2, 3, and 4 and portions of Seronos Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute (ECF No. 502) by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 16, 2017 Filing 535 NOTICE by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Counsel Leslie Morioka (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
February 13, 2017 Filing 534 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #532 Letter. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 13, 2017 Filing 533 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #532 Letter. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 9, 2017 Filing 532 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. requesting conference regarding summary judgment briefing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
February 8, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #530 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY No. 3 LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION (ECF NO. 509) Joined, #531 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY No. 4 ANTICIPATION BY THE GOEDDEL PATENT (ECF NO. 513) Joined, #529 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY No. 2 ANTICIPATION BY THE TREATMENT REFERENCES (ECF NO. 506) Joined. Motion set for 5/3/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
February 7, 2017 Filing 531 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY No. 4 ANTICIPATION BY THE GOEDDEL PATENT (ECF NO. 513) Joined by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 7, 2017 Filing 530 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY No. 3 LACK OF WRITTEN DESCRIPTION (ECF NO. 509) Joined by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 7, 2017 Filing 529 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY No. 2 ANTICIPATION BY THE TREATMENT REFERENCES (ECF NO. 506) Joined by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 6, 2017 Filing 528 REDACTION to #502 Brief in Support of Motion,, Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute, by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 6, 2017 Filing 527 REDACTION to #502 Brief in Support of Motion,, for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112 by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 6, 2017 Filing 526 REDACTION to #515 Declaration,,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 6, 2017 Filing 525 REDACTION to #518 Declaration,,,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Declaration of Kristopher A. Boushie, #27 Brief, #28 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #29 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 6, 2017 Filing 524 REDACTION to #514 Declaration,,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Brief, #16 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 6, 2017 Filing 523 REDACTION to #510 Declaration,,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Brief, #8 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 6, 2017 Filing 522 REDACTION to #511 Declaration,,,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Text of Proposed Order, #18 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #19 Brief)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 6, 2017 Filing 521 REDACTION to #504 Declaration,,,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Brief, #23 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References, #507 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity No. 1-Obvious-Type Double Patenting (ECF No. 503) Joined, #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent, #508 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity No. 2-Anticipation by the Treatment References (ECF No. 506) Joined, #516 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4 - Anticipation by the Goeddel Patent Joined, #512 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3-Lack of Written Description (ECF No. 509) Joined, #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description, #519 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages (ECF No. 517) Joined, #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages, #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting, #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112, #505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103. Motion set for 5/3/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
February 3, 2017 Filing 520 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting, #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References, #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages, #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description, #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 3, 2017 Filing 519 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages (ECF No. 517) Joined by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 3, 2017 Filing 518 DECLARATION of Kyle E. Thomason re #517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Declaration of Kristopher A. Boushie, #27 Brief, #28 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #29 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 3, 2017 Filing 517 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Limiting Damages by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Responses due by 3/3/2017 (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 3, 2017 Filing 516 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4 - Anticipation by the Goeddel Patent Joined by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 3, 2017 Filing 515 DECLARATION of Dr. Jeffrey V. Ravetch re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting, #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References, #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent, #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 3, 2017 Filing 514 DECLARATION of Thomas S. Fletcher re #513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Brief, #16 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 3, 2017 Filing 513 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 4- Anticipation by Goeddel Patent by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Responses due by 3/3/2017 (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 3, 2017 Filing 512 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3-Lack of Written Description (ECF No. 509) Joined by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 3, 2017 Filing 511 DECLARATION of Tian Huang re #506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Brief, #18 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 3, 2017 Filing 510 DECLARATION of David M. Krinsky re #509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Brief, #8 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 3, 2017 Filing 509 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 3- Lack of Written Description by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Responses due by 3/3/2017 (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 3, 2017 Filing 508 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity No. 2-Anticipation by the Treatment References (ECF No. 506) Joined by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 3, 2017 Filing 507 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity No. 1-Obvious-Type Double Patenting (ECF No. 503) Joined by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 3, 2017 Filing 506 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 2- Anticipation by the Treatment References by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Responses due by 3/3/2017 (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 3, 2017 Filing 505 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 103 by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. Responses due by 3/3/2017 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Jaysen S. Chung, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #7 Appendix A, #8 Appendix B, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 3, 2017 Filing 504 DECLARATION of Seth Bowers re #503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Brief, #23 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 3, 2017 Filing 503 MOTION for Summary Judgment No. 1- Obviousness- Type Double Patenting by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Responses due by 3/3/2017 (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 3, 2017 Filing 502 BRIEF in Support filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute)(DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 3, 2017 Filing 501 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 112 by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. Responses due by 3/3/2017 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine L. Ranney, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
January 27, 2017 Filing 500 Letter from Robert M. Goodan re response to Proposed Sur-Reply re #499 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Proposed Response to Sur-Reply, #2 Declaration of Thomas Fletcher, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J, #6 Exhibit K, #7 Exhibit L, #8 Exhibit M)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
January 20, 2017 Filing 499 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #495 Declaration,, #494 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sur-Reply, #2 Declaration of Steven M. Balcof)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 19, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #498 MOTION to Seal Docket Entry 495. Motion set for 2/21/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
January 19, 2017 Filing 498 MOTION to Seal Docket Entry 495 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert M. Goodman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
January 19, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #497 MOTION to Seal Document #489 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, #491 Declaration,, . Motion set for 2/21/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
January 19, 2017 Filing 497 MOTION to Seal Document #489 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, #491 Declaration,, by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Tortorella, #2 Index, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
January 5, 2017 Filing 496 REDACTION to #495 Declaration,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F (redacted), #7 Exhibit G)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
January 5, 2017 Filing 495 DECLARATION of Thomas S. Fletcher re #494 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 5, 2017 Filing 494 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #486 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Pastor Couceyro, Ph.D. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER granting #466 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/29/16. (sr, )
December 30, 2016 Filing 492 REDACTION to #491 Declaration,, of Steven M. Balcof in Opposition of Motion to Strike Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Pastor Couceyro, Ph.D. by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 30, 2016 Filing 491 DECLARATION of Steven M. Balcof re #489 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, to Strike Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Pastor Couceyro, Ph.D. by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 30, 2016 Filing 490 REDACTION to #489 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,, to Strike Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Pastor Couceyro, Ph.D. by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 30, 2016 Filing 489 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #486 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Pastor Couceyro, Ph.D. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER granting Bayer's re #487 Letter Request on an accelerated briefing schedule whereby Biogen will file its opposition to the motion to strike by 12/30/16 & Bayer will file its reply by 1/5/17. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/29/16. (DD, )
December 27, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #486 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Pastor Couceyro, Ph.D.. Motion set for 1/17/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
December 23, 2016 Filing 487 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #486 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Pastor Couceyro, Ph.D.. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
December 23, 2016 Filing 486 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Pastor Couceyro, Ph.D. by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Responses due by 1/3/2017 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas S. Fletcher, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Brief, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
December 23, 2016 Filing 485 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #482 Letter,. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 15, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #484 MOTION to Seal Portions of the letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. dated November 30, 2016 (ECF No. 472). Motion set for 1/17/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
December 14, 2016 Filing 484 MOTION to Seal Portions of the letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. dated November 30, 2016 (ECF No. 472) by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Index in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
December 14, 2016 Filing 483 REDACTION to #472 Letter,, from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
December 14, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #480 MOTION to Seal portions of the Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (ECF No. 462). Motion set for 1/17/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
December 13, 2016 Filing 482 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #457 MOTION to Strike the Report of Bayer's Expert, Gordon P. Moore, and to Preclude Bayer from Using a Previously Undisclosed Invalidity Contention and Information on Which it is Based. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth R. Bowers, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
December 13, 2016 Filing 481 REDACTION to #462 Redacted Document by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 13, 2016 Filing 480 MOTION to Seal portions of the Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (ECF No. 462) by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Tortorella in support of motion to seal, #2 Index in support of motion to seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 13, 2016 Filing 479 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #457 MOTION to Strike the Report of Bayer's Expert, Gordon P. Moore, and to Preclude Bayer from Using a Previously Undisclosed Invalidity Contention and Information on Which it is Based. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 2, 2016 Filing 477 Letter from Robert M. Goodman. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
December 2, 2016 Filing 476 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
December 2, 2016 Filing 475 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. regarding consolidation. (Attachments: #1 Joint Discovery Plan and Proposed Pretrial Scheduling Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 2, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #474 MOTION to Seal portions of the letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. dated November 17, 2016, and Exhibits A-C to that letter [ECF No. 467]. Motion set for 1/3/2017 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
December 1, 2016 Filing 474 MOTION to Seal portions of the letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. dated November 17, 2016, and Exhibits A-C to that letter [ECF No. 467] by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Tortorella in support of motion to seal, #2 Index in support of motion to seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER denying re #469 Letter Appl. to publicly file the attached version of the October 31 letter in place of the provisionally sealed version currently filed as ECF No. 462. Counsel shall file a Motion to Seal as required by Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/30/16. (DD, )
November 30, 2016 Filing 472 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 29, 2016 Filing 471 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Unredacted without confidential attachment) re #470 Letter,,. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 29, 2016 Filing 470 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: #1 Confidential excerpts from the expert report of Carol Ashe)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 22, 2016 Filing 478 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Motion Hearing held on 11/22/2016 re #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits filed by EMD SERONO, INC.. (Court Reporter: WALTER PERELLI) (jl, )
November 21, 2016 Filing 469 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. enclosing proposed redacted letter re #462 Redacted Document. (Attachments: #1 Proposed revised redaction)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 18, 2016 Filing 468 REDACTION to #467 Letter,, from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
November 17, 2016 Filing 467 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #461 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 15, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #466 MOTION to Seal portions of the letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. dated October 31, 2016 and Exhibits A-D attached thereto (ECF No. 461). Motion set for 12/19/2016 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
November 14, 2016 Filing 466 MOTION to Seal portions of the letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. dated October 31, 2016 and Exhibits A-D attached thereto (ECF No. 461) by EMD SERONO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Index in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
November 10, 2016 Filing 465 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tian Huang to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
November 8, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee as to TIAN HUANG, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW031424 (DD, )
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 464 TEXT ORDER - the Oral Argument scheduled for NOVEMBER 15, 2016 is hereby RESCHEDULED TO NOVEMBER 22, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Claire C. Cecchi in Newark - Courtroom 5B. SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 11/8/16. (jl, )
November 1, 2016 Filing 463 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #457 MOTION to Strike the Report of Bayer's Expert, Gordon P. Moore, and to Preclude Bayer from Using a Previously Undisclosed Invalidity Contention and Information on Which it is Based (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Steven M. Balcof)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
October 31, 2016 Filing 462 REDACTION to #461 Letter,, from David E. De Lorenzi to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. by EMD SERONO, INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 31, 2016 Filing 461 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(DELORENZI, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/1/2016) (mfr).
October 25, 2016 Filing 460 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #457 MOTION to Strike the Report of Bayer's Expert, Gordon P. Moore, and to Preclude Bayer from Using a Previously Undisclosed Invalidity Contention and Information on Which it is Based (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tian Huang, #2 Exhibit A - B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-H, #5 Exhibit I Part 1, #6 Exhibit I Part 2, #7 Exhibit I Part 3, #8 Exhibit I Part 4, #9 Exhibit I Part 5, #10 Exhibit J Part 1, #11 Exhibit J Part 2, #12 Exhibit J Part 3, #13 Exhibit K - R, #14 Exhibit S Part 1, #15 Exhibit S Part 2, #16 Exhibit S Part 3, #17 Exhibit T - U, #18 Declaration of Gordon P Moore)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 459 CONSENT ORDER granting re #458 Application/Petition for pro hac vice admission of Tian Huang, Esq. filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/21/16. (DD, )
October 20, 2016 Filing 458 APPLICATION/PETITION for pro hac vice admission of Tian Huang (on consent) for by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert M. Goodman, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification of Tian Huang)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
October 12, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #457 MOTION to Strike the Report of Bayer's Expert, Gordon P. Moore, and to Preclude Bayer from Using a Previously Undisclosed Invalidity Contention and Information on Which it is Based. Motion set for 11/21/2016 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
October 11, 2016 Filing 457 MOTION to Strike the Report of Bayer's Expert, Gordon P. Moore, and to Preclude Bayer from Using a Previously Undisclosed Invalidity Contention and Information on Which it is Based by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. Responses due by 10/25/2016 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Steven M. Balcof, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 456 TEXT ORDER - Scheduling a conference call for 2/28/2016 at 10:00am. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/6/2016. (mw, )
October 5, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 10/5/2016. (mw, )
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER re #454 Letter setting forth briefing schedule; etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/5/16. (sr, )
October 4, 2016 Filing 454 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting #450 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/4/16. (sr, )
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER granting #437 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/4/16. (sr, )
September 23, 2016 Filing 451 REDACTION to #449 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion to Sever #445 by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
September 23, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #450 MOTION to Seal portions of Seronos Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Severance of Claims Against Serono and Pfizer (ECF No. 449). Motion set for 10/17/2016 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
September 22, 2016 Filing 450 MOTION to Seal portions of Seronos Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Severance of Claims Against Serono and Pfizer (ECF No. 449) by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
September 22, 2016 Filing 449 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #435 MOTION to Sever #445 (DELORENZI, DAVID)
September 22, 2016 Filing 448 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #433 MOTION to Sever (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 447 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER modifying deadlines in the Courts AmendedScheduling Order [ECF No. 442]; etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 9/12/16. (DD, )
September 9, 2016 Filing 446 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 30, 2016 Filing 445 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #435 MOTION to Sever , #433 MOTION to Sever (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting re #443 Letter Request that Biogen's time to respond to the motions to sever fld. by Bayer Healthcare Pharm. & EMD Serono, Inc. & Pfizer Inc. be extended until 8/30/16 & Defts' time to reply be extended until 9/22/16. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/23/16. (DD, )
August 22, 2016 Filing 443 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #435 MOTION to Sever , #433 MOTION to Sever . (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 19, 2016 Reset Hearings: Hearing on Motions rescheduled for 11/15/2016 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5B before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. (jl, )
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 442 AMENDED CASE SCHEDULING ORDER: Hrg. on motions 11/4/16 @ 10:00 a.m.; Expert Disc. 12/20/16; Motions-in-limine & Daubert Motion due 7/11/17; Pretrial Cnf. 9/15/17; Trial begins 9/18/17; etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/12/16. (DD, )
August 10, 2016 Filing 441 NOTICE by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. of withdrawal of appearance of pro hac vice counsel Rebecca Fett (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 440 AMENDED CASE SCHEDULE/ORDER, Expert Discovery due by 12/20/2016, hearing on Motions 10/14/2016 at 10:00 a.m., Final Pretrial Conference on 9/15/2017, trial beginning 9/18/2017 Judge Claire C. Cecchi; etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/3/16. (sr, )
August 3, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #435 MOTION to Sever , #437 MOTION to Seal Serono's Brief in Support of its Motion for Severance of Claims Against Serono and Pfizer [436-13], the Declaration of Timothy P. Best #436 and Exhibits 1, 8 and 11 to the Declaration of Timothy P. Best [436-1], [436-9], [436-1. Motion set for 9/6/2016 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
August 3, 2016 Filing 439 REDACTION to #436 Declaration, of Timothy P. Best by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (slip sheet - filed under seal), #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6a, #7 Exhibit 6b, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8 (slip sheet - filed under seal), #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11 (slip sheet - filed under seal), #13 Brief in Support of Motion for Severance of Claims Against Serono and Pfizer [REDACTED])(DELORENZI, DAVID)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER adjourning the Telephone Status Conference originally set for 8/9/16 to 10/5/2016 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/2/16. (cm )
August 2, 2016 Filing 437 MOTION to Seal Serono's Brief in Support of its Motion for Severance of Claims Against Serono and Pfizer [436-13], the Declaration of Timothy P. Best #436 and Exhibits 1, 8 and 11 to the Declaration of Timothy P. Best [436-1], [436-9], [436-12] by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
August 2, 2016 Filing 436 DECLARATION of Timothy P. Best re #435 MOTION to Sever by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6a, #7 Exhibit 6b, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Brief in Support of Motion for Severance of Claims Against Serono and Pfizer)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
August 2, 2016 Filing 435 MOTION to Sever by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
August 2, 2016 Filing 434 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #433 MOTION to Sever . (DELORENZI, DAVID)
August 2, 2016 Filing 433 MOTION to Sever by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
August 1, 2016 Filing 432 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #425 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 28, 2016 Pro Hac Vice counsel, KATHERINE Q. DOMINGUEZ, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 431 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Katherine Q. Dominguez, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
July 25, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee as to KATHERINE Q. DOMINGUEZ, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW030310 (DD, )
July 25, 2016 Filing 430 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #414 MOTION for Disclosure of Bayer Agreements to Dr. Kathleen Denis. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 20, 2016 Filing 429 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER granting re #426 Application/Petition for KATHERINE Q. DOMINGUEZ, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice filed by PFIZER INC., EMD SERONO, INC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/20/16. (DD, )
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting #419 Motion to Seal EMD Serono, Inc's June 16, 2016 letter and Exhibits 1, 2, and 6 (ECF Nos. 417, 417-1, 417-2, and 417-3). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/19/16. (DD, )
July 19, 2016 Filing 426 APPLICATION/PETITION for the Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine Q. Dominguez for by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine Q. Dominguez, #2 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER, ( Telephone/Status Conference set for 8/9/2016 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark.) Counsel for Pltf. shall initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/13/16. (DD, )
June 28, 2016 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JAYSEN S. CHUNG, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, )
June 27, 2016 Filing 424 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jaysen S. Chung to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
June 23, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee as to JAYSEN S. CHUNG, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW030011 (DD, )
June 21, 2016 Filing 423 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to Hon. James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #417 Letter, #420 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER granting re #421 Application/Petition for pro hac vice of JAYSEN S. CHUNG, ESQ. filed by PFIZER INC., EMD SERONO, INC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/20/16. (DD, )
June 17, 2016 Filing 421 APPLICATION/PETITION for the Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jaysen S. Chung for by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of Jaysen S. Chung in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
June 17, 2016 Filing 420 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #417 Letter. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
June 17, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #419 MOTION to Seal EMD Serono, Inc.s June 16, 2016 letter and Exhibits 1, 2, and 6 (ECF Nos. 417, 417-1, 417-2, and 417-3). Motion set for 7/18/2016 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, )
June 16, 2016 Filing 419 MOTION to Seal EMD Serono, Inc.s June 16, 2016 letter and Exhibits 1, 2, and 6 (ECF Nos. 417, 417-1, 417-2, and 417-3) by EMD SERONO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
June 16, 2016 Filing 418 Exhibit to #417 Letter by EMD SERONO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
June 16, 2016 Filing 417 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to The Honorable James B. Clark, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 6)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
May 27, 2016 Filing 416 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #414 MOTION for Disclosure of Bayer Agreements to Dr. Kathleen Denis (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric C. Wiener, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Certification of Service)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
May 20, 2016 Filing 415 NOTICE by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. of withdrawal of appearance of pro hac vice counsel Nathanial J. McPherson (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
May 19, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #414 MOTION for Disclosure of Bayer Agreements to Dr. Kathleen Denis. Motion set for 6/20/2016 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
May 18, 2016 Filing 414 MOTION for Disclosure of Bayer Agreements to Dr. Kathleen Denis by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of John D. Tortorella, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
May 13, 2016 Filing 413 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
May 10, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 5/10/2016. (mw, )
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 412 LETTER-ORDER that the Court shall decide the issues raised in the parties letters by formal motion. Biogen shall submit a formal brief, no more than 12 pages in length, by May 18, 2016. Bayer shall submit its responsive brief, no more than 12 pages in length, by May 27, 2016. The Court will advise the parties whether oral argument is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/10/16. (DD, )
May 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held on 5/6/2016. (jl, )
May 3, 2016 Filing 411 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #405 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,. (Attachments: #1 Joint Submission On Proposed Amended Case Schedules)(MARINO, KEVIN)
April 14, 2016 Filing 410 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #409 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REBIF Label)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
April 6, 2016 Filing 409 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 408 TEXT ORDER - Scheduling a conference call for 5/19/2016 at 11:30am. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/6/2016. (mw, )
April 5, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 150 received as to Sheryn George, Esq., receipt number TRE067819 (mps)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 407 CONSENT ORDER amending Discovery Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/1/16. (DD, )
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER Granting #402 Application/Petition for the pro hac vice admission of Sheryn George filed by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 03/31/2016. (ek)
March 29, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Status Conference call held on 3/29/2016. (jl, )
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER, ( Telephone/Status Conference set for 5/6/2016 11:00 AM before Judge Claire C. Cecchi.); that the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed amended scheduling order by May 3, 2016; that Defendants Motion for Leave to Appeal (ECF No. 351) and Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision (ECF No. 359) are hereby denied as moot; that EMD Serono, Inc. and Pfizer Inc's Motion to Set a Case Schedule (ECF No. 386) is hereby denied as moot; that the parties shall contact the mediator in this litigation, Stephen M. Greenberg, to discuss mediation. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/29/16. (DD, )
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER re Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/28/16. (jl, )
March 28, 2016 Filing 403 OPINION re Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/28/16. (jl, )
March 25, 2016 Filing 402 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sheryn George for by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #2 Declaration of Sheryn George, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
March 23, 2016 Filing 401 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to Honorable James B. Clark, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 400 TEXT ORDER - The conference call set for 4/11/2016 before Judge James Clark has been RESCHEDULED to 5/10/2016 at 11:00am. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/14/2016. (mw, )
March 9, 2016 Filing 399 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #398 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
March 2, 2016 Filing 398 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #394 Order,,. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 397 TEXT ORDER - A telephone conference is scheduled for MARCH 29, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. before the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi. (Plaintiff to initiate the call). SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/29/16. (jl, )
February 26, 2016 Filing 396 Transcript of Proceedings of Telephone Conference held on February 24, 2016, before Judge JAMES B. CLARK, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/ Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 3/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2016. (ek)
February 24, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 2/24/2016. (mw, )
February 24, 2016 Filing 395 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to The Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #386 MOTION to Set Case Schedule , #393 Letter. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 394 LETTER-ORDER directing Biogen to present a corporate representative in response to the August 10, 2015 deposition notice served by Serono and Pfizer, maintaining its right to object as necessary. Biogen shall comply with the August 10, 2015 deposition notice no later than March 23, 2016. With regards to the disclosure of documents designated as confidential to Dr. Kathleen Denis, Biogen shall submit a letter briefing the issue to the Court on or before March 2, 2016. Bayer shall submit its response no later than March 9, 2016; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/24/16. (DD, )
February 24, 2016 Filing 393 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #386 MOTION to Set Case Schedule . (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 22, 2016 Filing 392 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #386 MOTION to Set Case Schedule (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 391 LETTER-ORDER, ( Status/Telephone Conference set for 2/24/2016 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark.); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/17/16. (DD, )
February 10, 2016 Filing 390 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #389 Letter, #387 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
February 9, 2016 Filing 389 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #388 Letter, #384 Letter, #387 Letter. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 9, 2016 Filing 388 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to The Honorable James B. Clark, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 8, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #386 MOTION to Set Case Schedule . Motion set for 3/7/2016 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, )
February 5, 2016 Filing 387 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #384 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
February 5, 2016 Filing 386 MOTION to Set Case Schedule by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support Of Defendants EMD Serono, Inc.s and Pfizer Inc.s Motion to Set Case Schedule, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 5, 2016 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The (MOTION TO SET CASE SCHEDULE - D.E. 385) filed by (DAVID E. DELORENZI) on (2/5/16) was submitted incorrectly as a (NOTICE). PLEASE RESUBMIT USING (MOTION*Available Event - Miscellaneous Relief). This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (DD, )
February 5, 2016 Filing 385 NOTICE by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. of Motion to Set Case Schedule (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support Of Defendants EMD Serono, Inc.s and Pfizer Inc.s Motion to Set Case Schedule, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 2, 2016 Filing 384 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to Hon. James B. Clark, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
February 1, 2016 Pro Hac Vice counsel, SETH R. BOWERS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, )
January 29, 2016 Filing 383 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Seth R. Bowers to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
January 29, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee as to SETH BOWERS, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW028417 (DD, )
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to SETH R. BOWERS, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/7/16. (DD, )
January 6, 2016 Filing 381 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Seth R. Bowers (On Consent) for by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert M. Goodman, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification of Seth R. Bowers)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
January 5, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 1/5/2016. (mw, )
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 380 TEXT ORDER - Scheduling a conference call for 4/11/2016 at 11:30am. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/5/2016. (mw, )
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 379 CONSENT ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY SCHEDULE - that the supplemental period of fact discovery as to certain issues ordered by the Court on July 7, 2015 [ECF No. 346], and September 10, 2015 [ECF No. 367], shall conclude on December 11, 2015; the parties shall exchange privilege logs w/in (30) days after the issuance of the Court's Markman decision; the parties will have sixty (60) days following exchange of such production to conduct discovery related to such advice of counsel; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/18/15. (DD, )
November 12, 2015 Filing 378 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
October 29, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ALEXANDER P. SWANSON and CHRISTINE RANNEY, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, )
October 29, 2015 Filing 377 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alexander P. Swanson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 29, 2015 Filing 376 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christine Ranney to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 29, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, LEON MINIOVICH, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, )
October 29, 2015 Filing 375 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Leon Miniovich to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 29, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee as to CHRISTINE RANNEY, ESQ. & ANDREW P. SWANSON, ESQ.: $ 300, receipt number NEW027691 (DD, )
October 28, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee as to LEON MINIOVICH, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW027678 (DD, )
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting re #370 Application/Petition for Leon Miniovich, Esq. to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/27/15. (DD, )
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting re #372 Application/Petition for Alexander P. Swanson, Esq. and Christine Ranney, Esq. to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/27/15. (DD, )
October 26, 2015 Filing 372 APPLICATION/PETITION for admission pro hac vice of Christine Ranney and Alexander P. Swanson for by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #2 Declaration of Christine Ranney, #3 Declaration of Alexander P. Swanson, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 19, 2015 Filing 371 Redaction of #335 Transcript. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 07/27/2015. (ek)
October 12, 2015 Filing 370 APPLICATION/PETITION for admission pro hac vice of Leon Miniovich for by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, #2 Declaration of Leon Miniovich, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 369 TEXT ORDER - Scheduling a conference call for 1/5/2016 at 11:30 am. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/7/2015. (mw, )
October 5, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 10/5/2015. (mw, )
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 368 TEXT ORDER - EMD SERONO, INC.s MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits [DE#271] is hereby administratively terminated without prejudice to allow the Court to address the pending applications regarding Claim Construction. Motions terminated: #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits filed by EMD SERONO, INC. SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 9/30/15. (jl, )
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 CONSENT ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DEADLINES - The supplemental period of fact discovery as to certain issues ordered by the Court on September 7, 2015 (Docket No. 346) shall conclude on November 13, 2015; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/10/15. (DD, )
September 8, 2015 Filing 366 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #346 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
August 17, 2015 Filing 365 NOTICE by EMD SERONO, INC., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., PFIZER INC. to Withdraw Appearance of Pro Hac Vice attorney David Glandorf (DELORENZI, DAVID)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting #356 Motion to Seal re: Docket Entries #352 and #354 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/13/15. (DD, )
August 10, 2015 Filing 363 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. re #351 MOTION for Leave to Appeal /Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Amending the Scheduling Order, #359 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #350 Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
August 3, 2015 Filing 362 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #359 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #350 Order (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 3, 2015 Filing 361 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #351 MOTION for Leave to Appeal /Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Amending the Scheduling Order (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 27, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #359 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #350 Order. Motion set for 8/17/2015 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
July 24, 2015 Filing 360 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #357 Order on Motion to Stay, #359 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #350 Order. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 24, 2015 Filing 359 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #350 Order (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Eric C. Wiener, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 23, 2015 Filing 358 RESPONSE to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #351 MOTION for Leave to Appeal /Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Amending the Scheduling Order (DELORENZI, DAVID)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER denying #353 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/22/15. (sr, )
July 22, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #351 MOTION for Leave to Appeal /Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Amending the Scheduling Order, #353 MOTION to Stay re #346 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, , #356 MOTION to Seal re Docket Entries 352 and 354. Motion set for 8/17/2015 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
July 21, 2015 Filing 356 MOTION to Seal re Docket Entries 352 and 354 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 21, 2015 Filing 355 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #353 MOTION to Stay re #346 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, . (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 21, 2015 Filing 354 Letter from Thomas K. Murphy III re #353 MOTION to Stay re #346 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 (unredacted))(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 21, 2015 Filing 353 MOTION to Stay re #346 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration of Eric Wiener, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Certificate of Service)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 21, 2015 Filing 352 Letter from Thomas K. Murphy III re #351 MOTION for Leave to Appeal /Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Amending the Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 21, 2015 Filing 351 MOTION for Leave to Appeal /Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order Amending the Scheduling Order by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 LETTER-ORDER denying Bayer's request to stay discovery pending an appeal of the Court's July 7th Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/16/15. (DD, )
July 10, 2015 Filing 349 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #348 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 9, 2015 Filing 348 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #346 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 8, 2015 Filing 347 NOTICE by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. of Name Change to Biogen MA Inc. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 LETTER-ORDER granting re #309 MOTION for Discovery Scheduling Order Amendment filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.; ( Status/Telephone Conference set for 10/5/2015 11:30 AM before Judge Claire C. Cecchi.). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/7/15. (DD, )
June 25, 2015 Filing 345 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
June 24, 2015 Filing 344 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #339 Order. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting #337 Motion to Redact #335 Transcript held on 02/25/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on June 15, 2015. (ek)
June 2, 2015 Filing 342 Letter from Nicholas Groombridge to Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #340 Letter, #341 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
May 26, 2015 Filing 341 Letter from David E. De Lorenzi to Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
May 22, 2015 Filing 340 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #239 Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting Biogen's re #338 Letter Request to reinstate #309 MOTION for Discovery Scheduling Order Amendment. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/20/15. (DD, )
May 19, 2015 Filing 338 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #331 Order on Motion for Discovery. (MARINO, KEVIN)
May 19, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #337 MOTION to Redact #335 Transcript, of February 25, 2015 Hearing before Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J.. Motion set for 6/15/2015 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
May 18, 2015 Filing 337 MOTION to Redact #335 Transcript, of February 25, 2015 Hearing before Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. by EMD SERONO, INC., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles H. Chevalier, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DELORENZI, DAVID)
May 13, 2015 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Sheila McShane, Esq. does not have a correct e-mail address listed with the court and is not receiving his/her notices of electronic filing in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1 and court procedures, counsel and unrepresented parties are required to notify the court of any mailing or e-mail address changes. The court has deleted the invalid e-mail address. Attorneys should review the ECF link on our web site for information on maintaining your account and unrepresented parties, or those attorneys without access to maintaining their account, should notice the Clerk. (gxh)
May 4, 2015 Filing 336 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction re #335 Transcript, by DAVID E. DELORENZI (DELORENZI, DAVID)
April 27, 2015 Filing 335 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 25, 2015, before Judge CLAIRE C. CECCHI SEALED pursuant to Order #343 . Court Reporter/Transcriber Yvonne Davion (908-656-1221). MOTION HEARING. "CLERK'S NOTE: This is the complete unredacted/sealed version of the transcript and is unavailable for public viewing." (ek).
March 23, 2015 Filing 334 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney JAMES JUNE-HO KANG terminated. (KANG, JAMES)
March 19, 2015 Filing 333 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES H. CHEVALIER on behalf of EMD SERONO, INC., NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP., PFIZER INC. (CHEVALIER, CHARLES)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting Pltf's re #330 Letter Request to seal the unredacted versions of the Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Biogen IDEC MAs Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and the Declaration of Eric C. Weiner with accompanying exhibits [Docket Entry 318]. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/9/15. (DD, )
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 LETTER-ORDER administratively terminating #309 Motion for Discovery; to be reinstated, if necessary, upon the disposition of the mediation of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/9/15. (DD, )
March 6, 2015 Filing 330 Letter from Thomas K. Murphy III re #327 Order on Motion to Seal Document,. (Attachments: #1 Brief (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Eric C. Weiner (Redacted), #3 Exhibit A-H (Redacted))(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 TEXT ORDER - As a result of the Parties hearing before the Court on February 25, 2015, EMD SERONO, INC.s MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits [DE#271] shall be administratively terminated without prejudice to allow the parties to continue with mediation. The motion is deemed reinstated as of this date. re #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits filed by EMD SERONO, INC.. SO ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/26/25. (jl, )
February 25, 2015 Filing 328 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claire C. Cecchi: Motion Hearing held on 2/25/2015 re #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits filed by EMD SERONO, INC.. ORDERED Decision reserved. (Court Reporter: YVONNE DAVION) (jl, )
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 327 LETTER-ORDER denying w/out prejudice #319 Motion to Seal Document #318 Response in Opposition to Motion, pending Bayers submission of a proposed redacted copy of the aforementioned materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/20/15. (DD, )
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #322 Motion to Seal ECF No. #321 Unredacted Declaration of Peter Sandel.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/20/15. (DD, )
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 TEXT ORDER - ORAL ARGUMENT on the motion for summary judgment by EMD SERONO, INC. [Docket Entry 271] shall be heard on FEBRUARY 25, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi in Courtroom 5B. ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 1/29/15. (jl, )
January 16, 2015 Filing 324 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. (KANG, JAMES)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting #313 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 1/6/15. (sr, )
December 23, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #322 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 1/20/2015 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
December 22, 2014 Filing 322 MOTION to Seal by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John D. Tortorella, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 22, 2014 Filing 321 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #309 MOTION for Discovery Scheduling Order Amendment -- Unredacted Declaration of Peter Sandel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 22, 2014 Filing 320 BRIEF in Support filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #309 MOTION for Discovery Scheduling Order Amendment (Attachments: #1 Redacted Declaration of Peter Sandel)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 16, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #319 MOTION to Seal Document #318 Response in Opposition to Motion . Motion set for 1/20/2015 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
December 15, 2014 Filing 319 MOTION to Seal Document #318 Response in Opposition to Motion by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert M. Goodman, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
December 15, 2014 Filing 318 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #309 MOTION for Discovery Scheduling Order Amendment (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric C. Weiner, #2 Exhibit A-H)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
December 15, 2014 Filing 317 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. re #309 MOTION for Discovery Scheduling Order Amendment (DELORENZI, DAVID)
December 4, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 12/4/2014. (mw, )
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 316 LETTER ORDER - Any opposition to the motion shall be filed by December 15, 2014. Any reply briefing shall be filed by December 22, 2014. The motion shall be made returnable by the Clerk of the Court on January 5, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 12/4/2014. (anr)
December 4, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #313 MOTION to Seal Document #311 Letter . Motion set for 1/5/2015 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
December 4, 2014 Filing 315 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES JUNE-HO KANG on behalf of NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. (KANG, JAMES)
December 4, 2014 Filing 314 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID E. DELORENZI on behalf of NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
December 3, 2014 Filing 313 MOTION to Seal Document #311 Letter by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert M. Goodman, #2 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
December 3, 2014 Filing 312 Letter from David De Lorenzi re #309 MOTION for Discovery Scheduling Order Amendment. (DELORENZI, DAVID)
December 3, 2014 Filing 311 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #309 MOTION for Discovery Scheduling Order Amendment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
December 2, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #309 MOTION for Discovery Scheduling Order Amendment. Motion set for 1/5/2015 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
December 1, 2014 Filing 310 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #309 MOTION for Discovery Scheduling Order Amendment. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 1, 2014 Filing 309 MOTION for Discovery Scheduling Order Amendment by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of John D. Tortorella pursuant to L. Civ. R. 37.1(b), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
December 1, 2014 Filing 308 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES JUNE-HO KANG on behalf of EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. (KANG, JAMES)
November 7, 2014 Filing 307 NOTICE by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. of Withdrawal of Sheila F. McShane (MCSHANE, SHEILA)
November 7, 2014 Filing 306 NOTICE by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC. of Withdrawal of Sheila F. McShane (MCSHANE, SHEILA)
September 23, 2014 Filing 305 REDACTION to #297 Letter from Sheila McShane as per Order (D.E. 304) by EMD SERONO, INC.. (MCSHANE, SHEILA)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting #299 Motion to Seal Portions of D.E. 297 (With Consent) by EMD SERONO, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/23/14. (DD, )
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER granting #294 Motion to Seal Biogen's Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Serono's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits [ECF No. 290-1 and 292]; the redacted copy of the Sur-Reply [ECF No. 293] shall remain publicly available on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/17/14. (DD, )
September 10, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 9/10/2014. (mw, )
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 302 LETTER-ORDER, ( Status/Telephone Conference set for 12/4/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark.). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/10/2014. (ld, )
September 3, 2014 Filing 301 REDACTION to #286 Reply to Response to Motion, #300 Order on Motion to Seal D.I. 286/287 by EMD SERONO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Responses to Supplemental Statement of Material Facts (Redacted - D.I. 286-1))(MCSHANE, SHEILA)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting #287 Motion to Seal Portions of D.E. 286 (With Consent) by EMD SERONO, INC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/3/14. (DD, )
August 26, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #299 MOTION to Seal Portions of D.E. 297 (With Consent). Motion set for 10/6/2014 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jd, )
August 26, 2014 Filing 299 MOTION to Seal Portions of D.E. 297 (With Consent) by EMD SERONO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheila F. McShane, #2 Attachment A to Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MCSHANE, SHEILA)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting #280 Motion to Seal Document #277 Response in Opposition to Motion, #279 Declaration, #278 Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Motion by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/19/14. (DD, )
August 19, 2014 Filing 297 Letter from Sheila McShane Re: Summary Judgment Motion re #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits, #290 Letter, #292 Brief. (MCSHANE, SHEILA)
August 12, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #294 MOTION to Seal Biogen's Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Serono's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits [ECF No. 290-1 and 292]. Motion set for 9/15/2014 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
August 12, 2014 Filing 296 REDACTION to #272 Declaration, #289 Order on Motion to Seal D.I. 272 by EMD SERONO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief (Redacted - D.I. 272-9), #2 Statement of Facts (Redacted - D.I. 272-10))(MCSHANE, SHEILA)
August 12, 2014 Filing 295 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #294 MOTION to Seal Biogen's Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Serono's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits [ECF No. 290-1 and 292]. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 12, 2014 Filing 294 MOTION to Seal Biogen's Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Serono's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits [ECF No. 290-1 and 292] by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John D. Tortorella, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 12, 2014 Filing 293 BRIEF [Redacted] Biogen's Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Serono's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits [re ECF No. 286] (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 12, 2014 Filing 292 BRIEF Biogen's Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Serono's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits [re ECF No. 286] (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting Biogen's re #290 Letter Request to file the Sur-Reply in Opposition to Serono's Motion for Summary Jgm. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 8/8/14. (DD, )
August 8, 2014 Filing 290 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J., Requesting Permission to File a Sur-Reply re #286 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sur-Reply In Further Opposition To Seronos Motion For Summary Judgment As To Biogens Claim Of Lost Profits)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting #274 Motion to Seal Portions of D.E. 272 (With Consent); EMD Serono, Inc. shall file a redacted version of the materials that have been sealed by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/5/14. (DD, )
August 4, 2014 Filing 288 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J., in Further Support of Biogen's Motion to Seal [ECF No. 280] with Consent. (Attachments: #1 [Redacted] Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Serono's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Biogens Claim of Lost Profits and in Response to Bayers Response to Serono's Motion [ECF No. 277], #2 [Redacted] Statement of Material Facts in Opposition [ECF No. 278], #3 [Redacted] Declaration of Peter Sandel and supporting exhibits [ECF No. 279])(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
August 4, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #287 MOTION to Seal Portions of D.E. 286 (With Consent). Motion set for 9/2/2014 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
August 4, 2014 Filing 287 MOTION to Seal Portions of D.E. 286 (With Consent) by EMD SERONO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheila F. McShane, #2 Attachment A to Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MCSHANE, SHEILA)
July 28, 2014 Filing 286 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by EMD SERONO, INC. re #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits (Attachments: #1 Response to Biogen's Supplemental Statement of Facts)(MCSHANE, SHEILA)
July 22, 2014 Pro Hac Vice counsel, NATHANIAL J. MCPHERSON, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (DD, )
July 22, 2014 Filing 285 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Nathanial J. McPherson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-5823358.) (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting #270 Motion to Seal D.E. #269 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/22/14. (DD, )
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting #268 Motion to Seal Unredacted Copy of Letter from Kevin H. Marino to Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. [ECF No. 267]. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/22/14. (DD, )
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting #265 Motion to Seal Docket Entry #264 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/22/14. (DD, )
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 281 CONSENT ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to NATHANIAL J. MCPHERSON, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/22/14. (DD, )
July 22, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #280 MOTION to Seal Document #277 Response in Opposition to Motion, #279 Declaration, #278 Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Motion . Motion set for 8/18/2014 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
July 21, 2014 Filing 280 MOTION to Seal Document #277 Response in Opposition to Motion, #279 Declaration, #278 Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Motion by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John D. Tortorella, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 21, 2014 Filing 279 DECLARATION of Peter Sandel in Support of Biogen's Opposition to Serono's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits re #277 by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 21, 2014 Filing 278 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 21, 2014 Filing 277 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits and re #275 Bayer's Response (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 21, 2014 Filing 276 APPLICATION/PETITION for admission pro hac vice of Nathanial J. McPherson for by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Nathanial J. McPherson, #2 Certification of John D. Tortorella, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
July 14, 2014 Filing 275 RESPONSE to Motion filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
July 8, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #274 MOTION to Seal Portions of D.E. 272 (With Consent). Motion set for 8/4/2014 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
July 7, 2014 Filing 274 MOTION to Seal Portions of D.E. 272 (With Consent) by EMD SERONO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheila F. McShane, #2 Attachment A to Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MCSHANE, SHEILA)
July 2, 2014 Filing 273 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. re #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
June 30, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits. Motion set for 7/21/2014 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
June 27, 2014 Filing 272 DECLARATION of Sheila F. McShane re #271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits by EMD SERONO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Brief, #10 Statement of Facts Not in Dispute)(MCSHANE, SHEILA)
June 27, 2014 Filing 271 MOTION for Summary Judgment As To Biogen's Claim of Lost Profits by EMD SERONO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCSHANE, SHEILA)
June 23, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #270 MOTION to Seal D.E. 269. Motion set for 7/21/2014 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
June 23, 2014 Filing 270 MOTION to Seal D.E. 269 by EMD SERONO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sheila F. McShane, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MCSHANE, SHEILA)
June 23, 2014 Filing 269 Letter from Sheila F. McShane. (MCSHANE, SHEILA)
June 20, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #268 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Copy of Letter from Kevin H. Marino to Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. [ECF No. 267]. Motion set for 7/21/2014 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
June 19, 2014 Filing 268 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Copy of Letter from Kevin H. Marino to Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. [ECF No. 267] by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John D. Tortorella, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
June 19, 2014 Filing 267 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. (Unredacted) re #264 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
June 19, 2014 Filing 266 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to Honorable Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #264 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
June 18, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #265 MOTION to Seal Docket Entry #264 . Motion set for 7/21/2014 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
June 17, 2014 Filing 265 MOTION to Seal Docket Entry #264 by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
June 17, 2014 Filing 264 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re 263 Order,. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 TEXT ORDER - Defendant EMD SERONO, INC.'s request to file a motion for partial summary judgment [DE 219] is GRANTED. Defendant's motion shall be filed no later than June 30, 2014. Responsive papers shall be filed in accordance with the Rules of Court. ORDERED by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 6/10/14. (jl, )
June 9, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark: Telephone Conference held on 6/9/2014. (mw, )
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 LETTER-ORDER, ( Status/Telephone Conference set for 9/10/2014 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark.);etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/9/2014. (ld, )
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 261 LETTER-ORDER, ( Status/Telephone Conference set for 6/9/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark.); etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/17/14. (DD, )
April 16, 2014 Filing 260 Letter from Kevin H. Marino on behalf of all parties to the Honorable James B. Clark, III, U.S.M.J. re #258 Order. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
April 11, 2014 Filing 259 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #255 Letter, #257 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 258 LETTER-ORDER instructing parties to submit a brief joint status letter on the progress of the parties mediation efforts by April 16, 2014; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/8/14. (DD, )
April 9, 2014 Filing 257 Letter from Sheila F. McShane. (MCSHANE, SHEILA)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting #253 Motion to Seal Exh. A to the ltr. dated 3/28/14 from Robert M. Goodman, Esq. as well as redacted portions of Mr. Goodman's ltr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 4/8/14. (DD, )
April 8, 2014 Filing 255 Letter from Sheila F. McShane. (MCSHANE, SHEILA)
April 8, 2014 Magistrate Judge James B. Clark added. Magistrate Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to case. (spc, )
April 3, 2014 Filing 254 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #252 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 30, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #253 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 4/21/2014 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
March 28, 2014 Filing 253 MOTION to Seal by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert M. Goodman, #2 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
March 28, 2014 Filing 252 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #248 Letter, #249 Letter, #250 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
March 28, 2014 Filing 251 Letter from Robert M. Goodman re #248 Letter, #249 Letter, #250 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal))(GOODMAN, ROBERT)
March 21, 2014 Filing 250 Letter from Kevin H. Marino to the Hon. Claire C. Cecchi, U.S.D.J. re #248 Letter, #249 Letter. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 11, 2014 Filing 249 Letter from Sheila F. McShane. (MCSHANE, SHEILA)
March 11, 2014 Filing 248 Letter from Sheila F. McShane. (MCSHANE, SHEILA)
February 4, 2014 Filing 247 NOTICE by NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS CORP. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Pro Hac Vice Counsel (MCSHANE, SHEILA)
September 23, 2013 Filing 246 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to STEPHEN M. GREENBERG (DD, )
September 16, 2013 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to the case. (jd, )
September 11, 2013 Filing 245 Court's Letter Re: case management responsibilities; and directing parties to submit a case summary within 7 days. (sr, )
June 14, 2013 Filing 244 NOTICE by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Pro Hac Vice Counsel Monika Wrobel, Esq. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
June 10, 2013 Filing 243 NOTICE by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. of withdrawal of appearance of Hannah M. Stott-Bumsted, Esq. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Order Appointing Mediator, "Referring to Mediation" STEPHEN M. GREENBERG appointed.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 4/29/13. (DD, )
April 18, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Status Conference held on 4/18/2013. (nm, )
April 10, 2013 Pro Hac Vice fee as to TRACEY B. DAVIES, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW016580 (DD, )
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER granting #225 Motion to Seal ltr. from Sheila F. McShane dated 1/9/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/8/13. (DD, )
April 8, 2013 Filing 240 BRIEF Defendants' Supplemental Claim Construction Brief (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
April 8, 2013 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The (BRIEF - Doc. #239) submitted by (R. GOODMAN) on (4/5/13) contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (DD, )
April 5, 2013 Filing 239 BRIEF Defendants' Supplemental Claim Construction Brief (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
April 5, 2013 Filing 238 DECLARATION of Monika Wrobel re #237 Brief by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
April 5, 2013 Filing 237 BRIEF Summarizing Biogen's Claim Construction Position (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as REBECCA FETT, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/3/13. (DD, )
March 29, 2013 Filing 235 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca Fett for by BIOGEN IDEC MA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Rebecca Fett, #2 Certification of John D. Tortorella, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 CONSENT ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to TRACEY B. DAVIES, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/20/13. (DD, )
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER, that by 4/5/13, each side shall submit a brief, limited to 15 pages in length, summarizing its final position on claim construction and scheduling a Telephone Status Conference for 4/19/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 3/13/13. (sr, )
March 13, 2013 Filing 232 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Tracey B. Davies for by EMD SERONO, INC., PFIZER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracey B. Davies, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MCSHANE, SHEILA)
March 6, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: The parties are advised that an in person Status Conference is set for 4/18/2013 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (nm, )
February 19, 2013 Filing 231 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (GOODMAN, ROBERT)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #220 Motion to Seal Letter from Sheila F. McShane (ECF No. 219). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/8/13. (DD, )
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting #223 Motion to Seal Document #222 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/8/13. (DD, )
January 17, 2013 Filing 228 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Blaine H. Evanson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MCSHANE, SHEILA)
January 14, 2013 Filing 227 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/10/2013, before Judge JOSEPH A. DICKSON. Court Reporter/Transcriber KLJ TRANSCRIPTION SERVICE/ TERRY L. DEMARCO (201-703-1670). Tape Number: STATUS CONFERENCE. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 2/4/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/14/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2013. (mw)
January 14, 2013 Pro Hac Vice fee as to BLAINE H. EVANSON, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW015711 (DD, )
January 10, 2013 Set Deadlines as to #225 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 2/4/2013 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (DD, )
January 10, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Status Conference held on 1/10/2013. Order to be submitted. (CD #ECR.) (nm).
January 9, 201