TIBOTEC INC. et al v. LUPIN LIMITED et al
Plaintiff: TIBOTEC INC. and TIBOTEC PHARMACEUTICALS
Defendant: LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. and MYLAN INC.
Case Number: 2:2010cv05954
Filed: November 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Claire C. Cecchi
Presiding Judge: William H. Walls
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2014 Filing 639 REDACTION of ECF No. 477 (PUBLIC VERSION) by LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (CROSS, MICHAEL)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER granting 481 Motion to Seal (ECF No. 477) by LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/23/13. (DD, )
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 393 OPINION. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 7/16/13. (DD, )
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 373 OPINION. Signed by Judge William H. Walls on 6/18/13. (DD, )
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 334 OPINION/ORDER denying 229 Motion for Leave to File to Amend Non-Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 5/9/13. (DD, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TIBOTEC INC. et al v. LUPIN LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIBOTEC INC.
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIBOTEC PHARMACEUTICALS
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?