VIRGINIA STREET FIDELCO, L.L.C. et al v. ORBIS PRODUCTS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA STREET FIDELCO, L.L.C. and THE CITY OF NEWARK
Defendant: ORBIS PRODUCTS CORPORATION, NORDA, INC., UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC., PPF NORDA, INC., PPF INTERNATIONAL, INC., ADRON, INC., QUEST INTERNATIONAL, INC., GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, INDOPCO, INC., NATIONAL STARCH AND CHEMICAL CORPORATION, JOHN DOE CORPORATION (1-50), JOHN DOE (1-50) and JOHN DOE INSURANCE COMPANY (1-100)
Case Number: 2:2011cv02057
Filed: April 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Stanley R. Chesler
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 03/20/2018. (ek)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 OPINION AND ORDER granting 166 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiffs shall have sixty (60) days from the date of this Order to serve their supplemental report;Defendants shall have sixty (60) days from the date of Plaintiffs service of their supplemental report to file any response, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 05/30/2017. (ek)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 8/3/2016. (seb)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 OPINION and ORDER denying 95 Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice; Plaintiff has 60 days from the date of entry of this Order to conduct jurisdictional discovery on its claims against the Estate; that Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of entry of this Order to properly serve the Estate.. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 12/9/14. (jd, )
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 OPINION & ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to Deft. Vernon G. Browne only. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 7/24/12. (jd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIRGINIA STREET FIDELCO, L.L.C. et al v. ORBIS PRODUCTS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA STREET FIDELCO, L.L.C.
Represented By: JAY J. RICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE CITY OF NEWARK
Represented By: DAVID L. ISABEL
Represented By: JAY J. RICE
Represented By: ERIC E. TOMASZEWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORBIS PRODUCTS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORDA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Represented By: JOSEPH F. LAGROTTERIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPF NORDA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPF INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADRON, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUEST INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDOPCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL STARCH AND CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATION (1-50)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE (1-50)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE INSURANCE COMPANY (1-100)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?