KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. v. HUNT CONTROL SYSTEMS, INC.
Plaintiff: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Defendant: HUNT CONTROL SYSTEMS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2011cv03684
Filed: June 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Dennis M. Cavanaugh
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. Dickson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 8/29/17. (DD, )
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting 313 Motion to Redact 306 Transcript,; that the Joint Motion to Redact and Seal be and hereby is GRANTED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following sections of the trial transcript and corresponding trial exhibit are hereby sealed; etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/31/2017. (ld, )
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 11/21/2016. (seb)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 OPINION. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 6/29/16. (DD, )
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 122 Appeal Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/7/14. (jd, )
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/16/14. (DD, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. v. HUNT CONTROL SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.
Represented By: J. BRUGH LOWER
Represented By: BRIAN J. MCMAHON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNT CONTROL SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?