CASTRO, M.D., P.A. v. SANOFI PASTEUR INC.

Plaintiff: ADRIANA CASTRO, M.D., P.A.
Defendant: SANOFI PASTEUR INC.
Case Number: 2:2011cv07178
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Referring Judge: Michael A. Hammer
Presiding Judge: Jose L. Linares
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2015 415 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 9/30/2015. (nr, )
July 2, 2015 374 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 308 Joint Motion to Seal, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/2/15. (gh, )
April 9, 2013 169 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 4/9/2013. (nr, )
August 6, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Dismiss in its entirety. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/6/2012. (mn, )
July 10, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting counterclaim-defts' 74 Motion to Strike Sanofi's counterclaim; dismissing counter-pltfs' counterclaim, w/out prejudice. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/10/2012. (nr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CASTRO, M.D., P.A. v. SANOFI PASTEUR INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIANA CASTRO, M.D., P.A.
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI PASTEUR INC.
Represented By: JOHN P. BARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?